Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2498250

EP2498250 - Client and server system for natural language-based control of a digital network of devices [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.07.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.03.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Accenture Global Services Limited
3 Grand Canal Plaza
Grand Canal Street Upper
Dublin 4 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2012/37]For all designated states
Accenture Global Services Limited
3 Grand Canal Plaza Grand Canal Street Upper
Dublin 4 / IE
Inventor(s)01 / Capuozzo, Giuseppe
Via Pellegrino Matteucci 41
00154 Rome / IT
02 / Mammoliti, Fabio
Via Elia Scaldaferri 29
87020 Santa Domenica Talao / IT
03 / d'Errico, Daniele
Via Grattoni 1
00185 Rome / IT
04 / Borghini, marco
Viale Baccelli 174
00053 Civitavecchia / IT
 [2012/37]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/37]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Straße 2
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date11425055.807.03.2011
[2012/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2498250
Date:12.09.2012
Language:EN
[2012/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.09.2011
ClassificationInternational:G10L15/26, G06F3/048, H04L29/08
[2012/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/37]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Client/Server Architektur zur Steuerung eines digitalen Netzwerks von Geräten auf Grundlage natürlicher Sprache[2012/37]
English:Client and server system for natural language-based control of a digital network of devices[2012/37]
French:Système client -serveur pour le contrôle de dispositifs connectés par un réseau numérique basé sur le langage naturel[2012/37]
Examination procedure15.01.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.01.2013Examination requested  [2013/09]
21.03.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.07.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.11.2014Date of oral proceedings
19.01.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
26.01.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination11.03.2015Appeal received No.  T0929/15
21.04.2015Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.03.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
12.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
10.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
10.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
10.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
13.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
13.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2010151889  (CHEN CHUN-YANG [US] ET AL) [X] 1,7-9,13,15 * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0053] * [Y] 2-6,10-12;
 [XY]US2009043404  (MOOR CRISLER TERRILL [US] ET AL) [X] 14 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0052]; figure 4 * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0046] * [Y] 2-6,10-12;
 [A]US6198479  (HUMPLEMAN RICHARD JAMES [US] ET AL) [A] 2-6,10-12 * column 2, line 18 - column 3, line 8 * * column 4, line 12 - line 28 * * column 6 - line 9 * * column 6, line 39 - column 10, line 44 * * column 13, line 1 - column 20, line 22 *;
 [A]US2004100492  (MERCS JAMES S [US]) [A] 2-6,10-12 * paragraphs [0025] - [0031]; figure 1 *