Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2455267

EP2455267 - Installation for conveying people and method for operating same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.09.2013
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.09.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
25.09.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Innova Patent GmbH
Konrad-Doppelmayr-Strasse 1
6922 Wolfurt / AT
[2017/31]
Former [2012/21]For all designated states
Innova Patent GmbH
Rickenbacherstrasse 8-10
6960 Wolfurt / AT
Inventor(s)01 / Czaloun, Johann
Kirchsteig 3
39012 Meran / IT
 [2012/21]
Representative(s)Beer & Partner Patentanwälte KG
Lindengasse 8
1070 Wien / AT
[2013/21]
Former [2012/21]Hehenberger, Reinhard , et al
Beer & Partner Patentanwälte KG Lindengasse 8
1070 Wien / AT
Application number, filing date11450110.901.09.2011
[2012/21]
Priority number, dateAT2010000193122.11.2010         Original published format: AT 19312010
[2012/21]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2455267
Date:23.05.2012
Language:DE
[2012/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2455267
Date:30.10.2013
Language:DE
[2013/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.02.2012
ClassificationInternational:B61B9/00, B61B12/12, B61B13/12
[2012/21]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/21]
TitleGerman:Anlage zur Beförderung von Personen und Verfahren zum Betrieb dieser Anlage[2012/21]
English:Installation for conveying people and method for operating same[2012/21]
French:Installation de transport de personnes et procédé de fonctionnement de cette installation[2012/21]
Examination procedure28.03.2012Examination requested  [2012/21]
24.05.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.08.2013Fee for grant paid
21.08.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.05.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  30.07.2014   
LEITNER S.p.A.
Via Brennero 34
39049 Vipiteno (BZ) / IT
Opponent's representative
Eccetto, Mauro, et al
Studio Torta S.p.A.
Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
 [2014/37]
10.09.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
20.03.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
15.04.2016Date of oral proceedings
26.04.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
26.04.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition23.06.2016Appeal received No.  T1480/16
06.09.2016Statement of grounds filed
22.06.2016Appeal received No.  T1480/16
29.08.2016Statement of grounds filed
05.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU01.09.2011
AL30.10.2013
BG30.10.2013
CY30.10.2013
CZ30.10.2013
DK30.10.2013
EE30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
MC30.10.2013
MK30.10.2013
MT30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
PL30.10.2013
RO30.10.2013
RS30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
SI30.10.2013
SK30.10.2013
SM30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
GR31.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
IE01.09.2014
LU01.09.2014
BE30.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU01.09.2011
BG30.10.2013
CY30.10.2013
CZ30.10.2013
DK30.10.2013
EE30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
MC30.10.2013
MK30.10.2013
MT30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
PL30.10.2013
RO30.10.2013
RS30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
SI30.10.2013
SK30.10.2013
SM30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
GR31.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
IE01.09.2014
LU01.09.2014
BE30.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
Former [2016/32]HU01.09.2011
BG30.10.2013
CY30.10.2013
CZ30.10.2013
DK30.10.2013
EE30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
MC30.10.2013
MT30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
PL30.10.2013
RO30.10.2013
RS30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
SI30.10.2013
SK30.10.2013
SM30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
GR31.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
IE01.09.2014
LU01.09.2014
BE30.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
Former [2016/31]BG30.10.2013
CY30.10.2013
CZ30.10.2013
DK30.10.2013
EE30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
MC30.10.2013
MT30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
PL30.10.2013
RO30.10.2013
RS30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
SI30.10.2013
SK30.10.2013
SM30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
GR31.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
IE01.09.2014
LU01.09.2014
BE30.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
Former [2016/28]CY30.10.2013
CZ30.10.2013
DK30.10.2013
EE30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
MC30.10.2013
MT30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
PL30.10.2013
RO30.10.2013
RS30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
SI30.10.2013
SK30.10.2013
SM30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
GR31.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
IE01.09.2014
LU01.09.2014
BE30.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
Former [2016/22]CY30.10.2013
CZ30.10.2013
DK30.10.2013
EE30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
MC30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
PL30.10.2013
RO30.10.2013
RS30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
SI30.10.2013
SK30.10.2013
SM30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
IE01.09.2014
LU01.09.2014
BE30.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
Former [2015/37]CY30.10.2013
CZ30.10.2013
DK30.10.2013
EE30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
MC30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
PL30.10.2013
RO30.10.2013
RS30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
SI30.10.2013
SK30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
IE01.09.2014
LU01.09.2014
BE30.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
Former [2015/33]CY30.10.2013
CZ30.10.2013
DK30.10.2013
EE30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
MC30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
PL30.10.2013
RO30.10.2013
RS30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
SI30.10.2013
SK30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
LU01.09.2014
BE30.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
Former [2015/30]CY30.10.2013
CZ30.10.2013
DK30.10.2013
EE30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
MC30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
PL30.10.2013
RO30.10.2013
RS30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
SI30.10.2013
SK30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
LU01.09.2014
BE30.09.2014
Former [2015/22]CY30.10.2013
CZ30.10.2013
DK30.10.2013
EE30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
MC30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
PL30.10.2013
RO30.10.2013
RS30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
SI30.10.2013
SK30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
LU01.09.2014
Former [2015/20]CY30.10.2013
CZ30.10.2013
DK30.10.2013
EE30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
MC30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
PL30.10.2013
RO30.10.2013
RS30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
SI30.10.2013
SK30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
Former [2015/14]CY30.10.2013
CZ30.10.2013
DK30.10.2013
EE30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
PL30.10.2013
RO30.10.2013
RS30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
SI30.10.2013
SK30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
Former [2014/41]CY30.10.2013
CZ30.10.2013
DK30.10.2013
EE30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
PL30.10.2013
RO30.10.2013
RS30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
SK30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
Former [2014/37]CY30.10.2013
CZ30.10.2013
EE30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
PL30.10.2013
RO30.10.2013
RS30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
SK30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
Former [2014/36]CY30.10.2013
EE30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
RS30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
Former [2014/28]CY30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
RS30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
Former [2014/26]CY30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
RS30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
Former [2014/25]FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
RS30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
Former [2014/24]FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
RS30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
Former [2014/23]FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
Former [2014/22]FI30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
Former [2014/20]LT30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0461098  (DOPPELMAYR & SOHN [AT]) [A] 1,8 * page 3, line 54 - page 4, line 24; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0673817  (DOPPELMAYR & SOHN [AT]) [A] 5,6 * page 2, line 51 - page 3, line 20; figures 1-3 *
by applicantEP0611220
 EP1193153