Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2542584

EP2542584 - METHODS FOR TREATING PANCREATIC CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.08.2018
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.11.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 26.12.2018  [2018/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Progastrine et Cancers S.à r.l.
11, Côte d'Eich
1450 Luxembourg / LU
For all designated states
INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA SANTE ET DE LA RECHERCHE MEDICALE (INSERM)
101, rue de Tolbiac
75654 Paris Cédex 13 / FR
For all designated states
Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (C.N.R.S.)
3 rue Michel-Ange
75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR
[2017/44]
Former [2017/43]For all designated states
Les Laboratoires Servier
50 rue Carnot
92284 Suresnes cedex / FR
For all designated states
INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA SANTE ET DE LA RECHERCHE MEDICALE (INSERM)
101, rue de Tolbiac
75654 Paris Cédex 13 / FR
For all designated states
Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (C.N.R.S.)
3 rue Michel-Ange
75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR
Former [2013/09]For all designated states
Les Laboratoires Servier
50 rue Carnot
92284 Suresnes cedex / FR
For all designated states
INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA SANTE ET DE LA RECHERCHE MEDICALE (INSERM)
101, rue de Tolbiac
75654 Paris Cédex 13 / FR
For all designated states
Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (CNRS)
3, rue Michel-Ange
75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR
Former [2013/02]For all designated states
Bioréalités
35, rue de Verdun
92284 Suresnes Cedex / FR
For all designated states
INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA SANTE ET DE LA RECHERCHE MEDICALE (INSERM)
101, rue de Tolbiac
75654 Paris Cédex 13 / FR
For all designated states
Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (CNRS)
3, rue Michel-Ange
75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR
Inventor(s)01 / HOUHOU, Leïla
2 rue Renaud de Villeneuve
34090 Montpellier / FR
02 / JOUBERT, Dominique
10 rue Gabriel Péri
34200 Sète / FR
03 / HOLLANDE, Frédéric
9, rue des Capries
34790 Grabels / FR
 [2013/02]
Representative(s)Regimbeau
La Coupole Sud
379, rue Léon Blum
34000 Montpellier / FR
[2017/43]
Former [2013/02]Bestel, Delphine
BIOREALITES
Direction Brevets
35 rue de Verdun
92284 Suresnes Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date11700115.607.01.2011
[2017/43]
WO2011EP00049
Priority number, dateUS20100293612P08.01.2010         Original published format: US 293612 P
[2013/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2011083091
Date:14.07.2011
Language:EN
[2011/28]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2542584
Date:09.01.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.2011
[2013/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2542584
Date:25.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/43]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP2542584
Date:13.12.2017
[2017/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.09.2011
ClassificationInternational:C07K16/26, A61K39/395, A61P35/00
[2013/02]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/02]
Extension statesBA21.08.2012
ME21.08.2012
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON BAUCHSPEICHELDRÜSENKREBS[2013/02]
English:METHODS FOR TREATING PANCREATIC CANCER[2013/02]
French:MÉTHODES DE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER DU PANCRÉAS[2013/02]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase21.08.2012National basic fee paid 
21.08.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
21.08.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.08.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.08.2012Examination requested  [2013/02]
31.10.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time
04.12.2013Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01)
31.12.2013Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments
17.07.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.11.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.05.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.11.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.03.2017Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.04.2017
06.04.2017Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
15.05.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.09.2017Fee for grant paid
13.09.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.09.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.07.2014
Opposition(s)26.07.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/40]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee
23.11.2012Request for further processing filed
23.11.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
11.12.2012Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee
23.11.2012Request for further processing filed
23.11.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
11.12.2012Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees
TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, BG, BE, AT, AL, LV, LU, LT, CH
23.11.2012Request for further processing filed
23.11.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
11.12.2012Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
23.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
28.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
03.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
26.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201606   M06   Fee paid on   23.02.2016
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SI25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
LU07.01.2018
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
[2018/52]
Former [2018/47]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
LU07.01.2018
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/40]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/37]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/35]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/24]AT25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/22]FI25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
NO25.01.2018
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO2008076454  (UNIV TEXAS [US]) [X] 1,20 * the whole document * [Y] 16-19,21-23;
 [XYI]WO2006032980  (APHTON CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-5,10,11,24,25,28 * the whole document * [Y] 16-19,21-23,26 [I] 6-9,12-15,27;
 [A]US6548066  (MICHAELI DOV [US], et al) [A] 1-28 * the whole document * * in particular, column 6, 4th paragraph. *;
 [YA]WO2008063479  (HUTCHINSON FRED CANCER RES [US], et al) [Y] 26 * the whole document * [A] 27
 [Y]  - GOETZE J P ET AL, "Closing the gastrin loop in pancreatic carcinoma: coexpression of gastrin and its receptor in solid human pancreatic adenocarcinoma.", CANCER 1 JUN 2000 LNKD- PUBMED:10861424, (20000601), vol. 88, no. 11, ISSN 0008-543X, pages 2487 - 2494, XP002625535 [Y] 16-19,21-23 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1097-0142(20000601)88:11<2487::AID-CNCR9>3.0.CO;2-E
 [Y]  - CAPLIN M ET AL, "Expression and processing of gastrin in pancreatic adenocarcinoma.", THE BRITISH JOURNAL OF SURGERY AUG 2000 LNKD- PUBMED:10931047, (200008), vol. 87, no. 8, ISSN 0007-1323, pages 1035 - 1040, XP002625536 [Y] 16-19,21-23 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2168.2000.01488.x
 [Y]  - MATTERS GAIL L ET AL, "Growth of human pancreatic cancer is inhibited by down-regulation of gastrin gene expression.", PANCREAS JUL 2009 LNKD- PUBMED:19465883, (200907), vol. 38, no. 5, ISSN 1536-4828, pages E151 - E161, XP002625537 [Y] 16-19,21-23 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/MPA.OB013E3181A66FDC
 [Y]  - SMITH J P ET AL, "Identification of gastrin as a growth peptide in human pancreatic cancer.", THE AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PHYSIOLOGY JAN 1995 LNKD- PUBMED:7840313, (199501), vol. 268, no. 1 Pt 2, ISSN 0002-9513, pages R135 - R141, XP009145263 [Y] 16-19,21-23 * the whole document *
 [YA]  - SIDDHESHWAR R K ET AL, "Plasma levels of progastrin but not amidated gastrin or glycine extended gastrin are elevated in patients with colorectal carcinoma", GUT, BRITISH MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, LONDON, UK, (20010101), vol. 48, no. 1, doi:DOI:10.1136/GUT.48.1.47, ISSN 0017-5749, pages 47 - 52, XP002398546 [Y] 26 * the whole document * [A] 27

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1136/gut.48.1.47
 [YA]  - PETER C KONTUREK ET AL, "Effects of Cyclooxygenase-2 Inhibition on Serum and Tumor Gastrins and Expression of Apoptosis-Related Proteins in Colorectal Cancer", DIGESTIVE DISEASES AND SCIENCES, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS-PLENUM PUBLISHERS, NE, (20060401), vol. 51, no. 4, ISSN 1573-2568, pages 779 - 787, XP019277199 [Y] 26 * the whole document * [A] 27
 [YA]  - BARDRAM L, "PROGASTRIN IN SERUM FROM ZOLLINGER-ELLISON PATIENTS AN INDICATOR OF MALIGNANCY?", GASTROENTEROLOGY, ELSEVIER, PHILADELPHIA, PA, (19900101), vol. 98, no. 6, ISSN 0016-5085, pages 1420 - 1426, XP001053157 [Y] 26 * the whole document * [A] 27
by applicantWO2007135542
 WO2008076454
 US5530101
 US5585089
 US5693761
 US5693762
 US6180370
 EP0239400
 WO9109967
 US5225539
 EP0592106
 EP0519596
 US5565332
 US5168062
 US4510245
 US4968615
 US4399216
 US4634665
 US5179017
    - JEMAL ET AL., CA CANCER J. CLIN., (2008), vol. 58, no. 2, pages 71 - 96,
    - JEMAL ET AL., CA CANCER J. CLIN., (2010), vol. 60, no. 5, pages 277 - 300,
    - GHANEH ET AL., GUT, (2007), vol. 56, no. 8, pages 1134 - 1152,
    - STATHIS; MOORE, NAT. REV. CLIN. ONCOL., (2010), vol. 7, no. 3, pages 163 - 172,
    - JEMAL ET AL., CANCER J. CLIN., (2007), vol. 57, no. 1, pages 43 - 46,
    - SOHN ET AL., J. GASTROINTEST. SURG., (2000), vol. 4, no. 6, pages 567 - 579,
    - SATHIS; MOORE, NAT. REV. CLIN. ONCOL., (2000), vol. 7, no. 3, pages 163 - 172,
    - GOETZE ET AL., CANCER, (2000), vol. 88, no. 11, pages 2487 - 2494,
    - CHAU ET AL., BR. J. CANCER, (2006), vol. 94, pages 1107 - 1115,
    - BRETT ET AL., J. CLIN. ONCOL., (2002), vol. 20, pages 4225 - 4231,
    - CAPLIN ET AL., BR. J. SURG., (2000), vol. 87, no. 8, pages 1035 - 1040,
    - MAISONNEUVE; LOWENFELS, DIG. DIS., (2010), vol. 28, no. 4-5, pages 645 - 656,
    - YAO ET AL., ONCOLOGY, (2007), vol. 14, no. 12, pages 3492 - 3450,
    - KALLURI ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (2009), vol. 119, no. 6, pages 1420 - 28,
    - HOWARD, CURR. PROB.L CANCER, (1996), vol. 20, no. 5, pages 281 - 328,
    - BORAD ET AL., YALE J. BIOL. MED., (2009), vol. 82, no. 1, pages 1 - 6,
    - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, (1980),
    - STATHIS; MOORE, NAT REV CLIN ONCOL., (2010), vol. 7, no. 3, pages 163 - 72,
    - PHILIP ET AL., J. CLIN. ONCOL., (2009), vol. 24, no. 33, pages 5660 - 5669,
    - Goodman and Gilman's The Pharmacological Basis of Therapeutics, MCGRAW-HILL,
    - LAUNE ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (2002), vol. 267, pages 53 - 70,
    - LAUNE, J. BIOL. CHEM., (1997), vol. 272, pages 30937 - 30944,
    - KABAT ET AL., Sequences of Proteins of Immunological Interest, NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF HEALTH, (1987),
    - LEFRANC ET AL., DEV. COMP. IMMUNOL., (2003), vol. 27, pages 55 - 77,
    - LEFRANC ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (2009), vol. 37, pages D1006 - 1012,
    - LEFRANC, MOL. BIOTECHNOL., (2008), vol. 40, pages 101 - 111,
    - RIECHMANN ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 332, pages 323 - 7,
    - PADLAN, MOL. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 28, pages 489 - 498,
    - STUDNICKA ET AL., PROT. ENG., (1994), vol. 7, pages 805 - 814,
    - ROGUSKA ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1994), vol. 91, pages 969 - 973,
    - GOEDDEL, Gene Expression Technology: Methods in Enzymology, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1990), vol. 185,
    - URLAUB; CHASIN, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1980), vol. 77, pages 4216 - 4220,
    - KAUFMAN; SHARP, MOL. BIOL., (1982), vol. 159, pages 601 - 621,
    - Solid Phase Peptide Synthesis, THE PIERCE CHEMICAL CO., (1984),
    - CHU ET AL., Biochemia, ROCHE MOLECULAR BIOLOGICALS, (2001),
    - NAKANE ET AL., J. HISTOCHEM. CYTOCHEM., (1974), vol. 22, no. 12, pages 1084 - 1091,
    - NAHSHOL ET AL., ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (2008), vol. 383, pages 52 - 60,
 WO2010EP06329
 US20100906041