Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2523761 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2523761



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 2806
05.10.2018 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
01.10.2018 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
21.09.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.08.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
27.08.2018 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
27.08.2018 Claims Opposition 4
27.08.2018 Description Opposition 2
27.08.2018 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
27.08.2018 French translation of claims Opposition 5
27.08.2018 German translation of the claims Opposition 5
27.08.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
03.08.2018 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 2
03.08.2018 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
20.07.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.07.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
16.07.2018 General enquiry Opposition 1
16.07.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
12.07.2018 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
12.07.2018 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
13.06.2018 OPPODREX with handwritten amendments Opposition 17
01.06.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
30.05.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.05.2018 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 17
28.05.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
23.04.2018 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
23.04.2018 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 4
15.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
15.04.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
15.04.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
13.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
13.04.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 37
13.04.2018 Claims Appeal 33
13.04.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
13.04.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
13.03.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.03.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.03.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.03.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.03.2018 Refund of fees Appeal 1
09.03.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.03.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.03.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.03.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.03.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
07.03.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
07.03.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
07.03.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
07.03.2018 Withdrawal of an opposition Appeal 1
07.03.2018 Withdrawal of an opposition Appeal 1
06.03.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
06.03.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
06.03.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
06.03.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
06.03.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
06.03.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
28.02.2018 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
28.02.2018 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
28.02.2018 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
22.02.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.02.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
16.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
16.02.2018 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
16.02.2018 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 7
16.02.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
16.02.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
16.02.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
16.02.2018 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
26.01.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.01.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.01.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.01.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.01.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
23.01.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
23.01.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
23.01.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
23.01.2018 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
23.01.2018 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
19.01.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
19.01.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
16.01.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
16.01.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
15.01.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
15.01.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.01.2018 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
12.01.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
12.01.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
12.01.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
12.01.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.01.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.01.2018 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 22
09.01.2018 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
22.12.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.12.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.12.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
18.12.2017 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Appeal 5
18.12.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
18.12.2017 Request for change of name -opponent Appeal 2
27.10.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.10.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.10.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.10.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.10.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
23.10.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
23.10.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
23.10.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
23.10.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 55
23.10.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 54
23.10.2017 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
23.10.2017 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
23.10.2017 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
23.10.2017 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
23.10.2017 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
23.10.2017 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
25.09.2017 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
03.08.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
03.08.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
28.07.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 3
28.07.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
28.07.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
28.07.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
28.07.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
28.07.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
28.07.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
28.07.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
28.07.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
28.07.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
28.07.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
28.07.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
28.07.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
28.07.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
28.07.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
28.07.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
28.07.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 5
28.07.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.07.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.07.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.07.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 6
28.07.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.07.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 5
28.07.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 19
28.07.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 3
28.07.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.07.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 16
28.07.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.07.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.07.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 4
28.07.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.07.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 8
28.07.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.07.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 27
28.07.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 3
28.07.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 24
28.07.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 7
28.07.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 33
28.07.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
28.07.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
28.07.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 5
28.07.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
28.07.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.07.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.07.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 3
28.07.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 4
28.07.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 3
28.07.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
28.07.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 52
28.07.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
20.07.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.07.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.07.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.07.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.07.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
19.07.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
17.07.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
17.07.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
14.07.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.07.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.07.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
10.07.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 28
10.07.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
10.07.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 9
10.07.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 3
10.07.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
10.07.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 3
10.07.2017 Claims Appeal 25
10.07.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
10.07.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 23
14.03.2017 Refund of fees Appeal 1
10.03.2017 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
10.03.2017 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
10.03.2017 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
28.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 3
28.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
28.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 3
28.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
28.02.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Opposition 3
28.02.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
28.02.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
28.02.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Opposition 8
28.02.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
28.02.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Opposition 2
28.02.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 8
28.02.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
28.02.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 37
28.02.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Opposition 4
28.02.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Opposition 37
28.02.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
28.02.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
28.02.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Opposition 4
28.02.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Opposition 4
28.02.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Opposition 4
28.02.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
28.02.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Opposition 4
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Opposition 4
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Opposition 27
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Opposition 1
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 30
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Opposition 3
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 24
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Opposition 1
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Opposition 1
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 3
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 6
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Opposition 1
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Opposition 1
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Opposition 1
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Opposition 2
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Opposition 5
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 27
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 4
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Opposition 12
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Opposition 18
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Opposition 3
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 9
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Opposition 4
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 5
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Opposition 1
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Opposition 1
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 4
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Opposition 1
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 3
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Opposition 1
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Opposition 9
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 18
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Opposition 2
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Opposition 1
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Opposition 6
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 5
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Opposition 5
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 12
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 5
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 6
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Opposition 1
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Opposition 30
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Opposition 1
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 6
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Opposition 5
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 5
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Opposition 1
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Opposition 5
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Opposition 1
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Opposition 6
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Opposition 24
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Opposition 1
28.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Opposition 6
28.02.2017 Intervention of the assumed infringer Appeal 1
28.02.2017 Intervention of the assumed infringer Appeal 79
28.02.2017 Intervention of the assumed infringer Opposition 1
28.02.2017 Intervention of the assumed infringer Opposition 79
28.02.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
28.02.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
28.02.2017 Notice of opposition Appeal 10
28.02.2017 Notice of opposition Opposition 10
28.02.2017 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Opposition 11
28.02.2017 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
13.02.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.02.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
03.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
03.02.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 20
03.02.2017 Claims Appeal 20
03.02.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
03.02.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
03.02.2017 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
03.02.2017 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
03.02.2017 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
03.02.2017 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
03.02.2017 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
03.02.2017 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
03.02.2017 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
03.02.2017 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 24
03.02.2017 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
03.02.2017 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
03.02.2017 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
03.02.2017 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 18
03.02.2017 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
03.02.2017 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
03.02.2017 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
03.02.2017 Reply to appeal Appeal 65
03.02.2017 Reply to appeal Appeal 15
26.01.2017 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
26.01.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.01.2017 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
20.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
20.01.2017 Authorisation of representative Appeal 2
20.01.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
20.01.2017 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
16.01.2017 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
21.12.2016 Document concerning representation Search / examination 3
20.10.2016 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
23.09.2016 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
23.09.2016 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
16.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
16.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
16.09.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
16.09.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
16.09.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
16.09.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
16.09.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
16.09.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
16.09.2016 Claims Appeal 5
16.09.2016 Claims Appeal 2
16.09.2016 Claims Appeal 5
16.09.2016 Claims Appeal 2
16.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
16.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
16.09.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
16.09.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
16.09.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
16.09.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
16.09.2016 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 11
16.09.2016 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 53
08.07.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
08.07.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
06.07.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
06.07.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
05.07.2016 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
05.07.2016 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
04.07.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
04.07.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
04.07.2016 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
01.07.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 10
01.07.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
01.07.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
01.07.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
01.07.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
01.07.2016 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
01.07.2016 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
01.07.2016 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
01.07.2016 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
01.07.2016 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
01.07.2016 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 14
17.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
12.05.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.05.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.05.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
09.05.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.05.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 10
06.05.2016 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
06.05.2016 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 18
06.05.2016 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 24
06.05.2016 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
06.05.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
06.05.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
06.05.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
06.05.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
06.05.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
06.05.2016 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.05.2016 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 14
06.05.2016 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 7
28.04.2016 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
28.04.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
11.02.2016 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.02.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.02.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.02.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.01.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 6
15.01.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.01.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
11.01.2016 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 5
11.01.2016 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 5
11.01.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
11.01.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 9
08.01.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.01.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
30.12.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.12.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.12.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
15.12.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 11
10.12.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
01.12.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.08.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.07.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.07.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.07.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.07.2015 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
10.07.2015 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
10.07.2015 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
10.07.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.07.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.07.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.07.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
02.07.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
02.07.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
26.06.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
26.06.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
21.05.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.05.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
12.05.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
17.03.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
17.03.2015 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
24.02.2015 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
02.02.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.01.2015 Claims Opposition 4
27.01.2015 Claims Opposition 4
27.01.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
27.01.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
27.01.2015 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 12
23.01.2015 Claims Opposition 4
23.01.2015 Claims Opposition 4
23.01.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
23.01.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
23.01.2015 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 12
24.09.2014 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
24.09.2014 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 2
28.08.2014 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
21.08.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
21.08.2014 Citation for the examination procedure Opposition 12
21.08.2014 Citation for the examination procedure Opposition 19
21.08.2014 Citation for the examination procedure Opposition 10
21.08.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
21.08.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
21.08.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
21.08.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
21.08.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 24
21.08.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
21.08.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 66
21.08.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 40
21.08.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 30
21.08.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
21.08.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
21.08.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
21.08.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 31
21.08.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
21.08.2014 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
19.08.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 27
19.08.2014 Citation for the examination procedure Opposition 1
19.08.2014 Citation for the examination procedure Opposition 1
19.08.2014 Citation for the examination procedure Opposition 1
19.08.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
19.08.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
19.08.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
19.08.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
19.08.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
19.08.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
19.08.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
19.08.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
19.08.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
19.08.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
19.08.2014 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
19.08.2014 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
22.11.2013 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
24.10.2013 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
05.10.2013 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
05.10.2013 French translation of claims Search / examination 6
05.10.2013 German translation of the claims Search / examination 6
05.10.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
24.06.2013 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
24.06.2013 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
24.06.2013 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
24.06.2013 Text intended for grant Search / examination 25
16.03.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
16.03.2013 Claims Search / examination 4
16.03.2013 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
14.03.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
14.03.2013 Claims Search / examination 4
14.03.2013 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
06.11.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
06.11.2012 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
24.10.2012 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
20.08.2012 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
16.08.2012 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 4
08.08.2012 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
06.08.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
06.08.2012 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
06.08.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
06.08.2012 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
31.07.2012 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
25.05.2012 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
27.09.2011 Notification of the recording of a change PCT receiving Office 1
27.09.2011 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
08.08.2011 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 27
21.07.2011 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
21.07.2011 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 27
10.03.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
10.03.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
10.03.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
17.01.2011 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
17.01.2011 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
17.01.2011 Claims PCT receiving Office 5
17.01.2011 Description PCT receiving Office 15
17.01.2011 Drawings PCT receiving Office 6