Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2525691

EP2525691 - CAPSULE FOR THE PREPARATION OF A BEVERAGE COMPRISING AN IDENTIFICATION CODE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.12.2016
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.06.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
19.06.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Société des Produits Nestlé S.A.
Entre-deux-Villes
1800 Vevey / CH
[2019/28]
Former [2012/48]For all designated states
Nestec S.A.
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Inventor(s)01 / ROGNON, Vincent
Grand'rue 12
1417 Essertines-sur-Yverdon / CH
02 / EPARS, Yann
Le Cheminet 4
1305 Penthalaz / CH
03 / DENISART, Jean-Luc
Ch. du Vigny 2
1096 Cully / CH
 [2013/52]
Former [2012/48]01 / ROGNON, Vincent
Grand'rue 12
CH-1417 Essertines-sur-Yverdon / CH
02 / EPARS, Yann
Le Cheminet 4
CH-1305 Penthalaz / CH
03 / DENISART, Jean-Luc
Ch. du Vigny 2
CH-1096 Cully / CH
Representative(s)D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/47]Schuller, Cornelis , et al
Nestec S.A.
CT-IAM
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Former [2012/48](deleted)
...
Application number, filing date11700261.812.01.2011
WO2011EP50322
Priority number, dateEP2010015103019.01.2010         Original published format: EP 10151030
[2012/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011089048
Date:28.07.2011
Language:EN
[2011/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2525691
Date:28.11.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2011
[2012/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2525691
Date:16.04.2014
Language:EN
[2014/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.07.2011
ClassificationInternational:A47J31/36, B65D85/804
[2012/48]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/48]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:KAPSEL ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES GETRÄNKS MIT EINEM IDENTIFIKATIONSCODE[2013/52]
English:CAPSULE FOR THE PREPARATION OF A BEVERAGE COMPRISING AN IDENTIFICATION CODE[2012/48]
French:CAPSULE POUR LA PRÉPARATION D'UNE BOISSON COMPORTANT UN CODE D'IDENTIFICATION[2013/52]
Former [2012/48]KAPSEL ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES GETRÄNKS MIT IDENTIFIZIERUNGSCODE
Former [2012/48]CAPSULE POUR LA PRÉPARATION D'UNE BOISSON COMPORTANT UN CODE D'IDENTIFICATION
Entry into regional phase20.08.2012National basic fee paid 
20.08.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
20.08.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.08.2012Examination requested  [2012/48]
21.06.2013Observations by third parties
05.07.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.10.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.11.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.11.2013Observations by third parties
03.03.2014Fee for grant paid
03.03.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.07.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  14.01.2015  21.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Krüger GmbH & Co. KG
Senefelderstr. 44
51469 BERGISCH GLADBACH / DE
Opponent's representative
Loock, Jan Pieter
Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner
Waidmarkt 11
50676 Köln / DE
 02  16.01.2015  27.01.2015  WITHDRAWN
Koninklijke Douwe Egberts BV
Vleutensevaart 35
3532 AD Utrecht / NL
Opponent's representative
V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
 [N/P]
Former [2017/46]
Opponent(s)01  14.01.2015  21.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Krüger GmbH & Co. KG
Senefelderstr. 44
D-51469 BERGISCH GLADBACH / DE
Opponent's representative
Loock, Jan Pieter
Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner
Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23
50668 Köln / DE
 02  16.01.2015  27.01.2015  WITHDRAWN
Koninklijke Douwe Egberts BV
Vleutensevaart 35
3532 AD Utrecht / NL
Opponent's representative
V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
Former [2015/47]
Opponent(s)01  14.01.2015  21.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Krüger GmbH & Co. KG
Senefelderstr. 44
D-51469 BERGISCH GLADBACH / DE
Opponent's representative
Loock, Jan Pieter
Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner
Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23
50668 Köln / DE
 02  16.01.2015  27.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Koninklijke Douwe Egberts BV
Vleutensevaart 35
3532 AD Utrecht / NL
Opponent's representative
V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
Former [2015/09]
Opponent(s)01  14.01.2015  21.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Krüger GmbH & Co. KG
Senefelderstr. 44
D-51469 BERGISCH GLADBACH / DE
Opponent's representative
Loock, Jan Pieter
Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner
Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23
50668 Köln / DE
 02  16.01.2015   
Koninklijke Douwe Egberts BV
Vleutensevaart 35
3532 AD Utrecht / NL
Opponent's representative
Jansen, Cornelis Marinus
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Former [2015/08]
Opponent(s)01  14.01.2015   
Krüger GmbH & Co. KG
Senefelderstr. 44
D-51469 BERGISCH GLADBACH / DE
Opponent's representative
Loock, Jan Pieter
Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner
Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23
50668 Köln / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
24.02.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
04.09.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
21.10.2016Date of oral proceedings
05.12.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
05.12.2016Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition12.01.2017Appeal received No.  T0102/17
18.04.2017Statement of grounds filed
19.01.2017Appeal received No.  T0102/17
11.04.2017Statement of grounds filed
09.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
21.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL16.04.2014
CY16.04.2014
EE16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
LV16.04.2014
MC16.04.2014
MK16.04.2014
MT16.04.2014
RS16.04.2014
SM16.04.2014
IS16.08.2014
LU12.01.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]CY16.04.2014
EE16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
LV16.04.2014
MC16.04.2014
MK16.04.2014
MT16.04.2014
RS16.04.2014
SM16.04.2014
IS16.08.2014
LU12.01.2015
Former [2017/38]CY16.04.2014
EE16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
LV16.04.2014
MC16.04.2014
MT16.04.2014
RS16.04.2014
SM16.04.2014
IS16.08.2014
LU12.01.2015
Former [2017/03]CY16.04.2014
EE16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
LV16.04.2014
MC16.04.2014
MT16.04.2014
RS16.04.2014
IS16.08.2014
LU12.01.2015
Former [2015/43]CY16.04.2014
EE16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
LV16.04.2014
MC16.04.2014
RS16.04.2014
IS16.08.2014
LU12.01.2015
Former [2015/39]CY16.04.2014
EE16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
LV16.04.2014
RS16.04.2014
IS16.08.2014
LU12.01.2015
Former [2015/10]CY16.04.2014
EE16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
LV16.04.2014
RS16.04.2014
IS16.08.2014
Former [2014/52]CY16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
LV16.04.2014
RS16.04.2014
IS16.08.2014
Former [2014/50]CY16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
LV16.04.2014
IS16.08.2014
Former [2014/49]CY16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
IS16.08.2014
Former [2014/48]CY16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
Former [2014/47]CY16.04.2014
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2005044067  (RUCHONNET JEAN-FRANCOIS [CH]) [A] 1-13 * page 4, line 22 - page 7, line 17; figure - *;
 [AD]EP1593329  (DATALOGIC SPA [IT]) [AD] 1-13 * paragraphs [0042] - [0070]; figure - *;
 [A]US2008173718  (IBE YUKIYASU [JP]) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0023] - [0053]; figure - *;
 [A]EP0972481  (THERMOPLAN AG [CH]) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0007] - [0021]; figure - *;
 [AD]WO02078498  (EUGSTER FRISMAG AG [CH], et al) [AD] 1-13 * pages 8-10; figure - *;
 [AD]WO0228241  (BOYD COFFEE CO [US]) [AD] 1-13 * pages 4-12; figure - *;
 [A]US6203069  (OUTWATER CHRIS [US], et al) [A] 6 * column 3, line 51 - column 9, line 4; figure - *;
 [A]EP0300729  (EMPIRE AIRPORT SERVICE KK [JP]) [A] 6 * column 2, line 27 - column 6, line 8; figure - *
ExaminationDE102007032287
 EP1593329
by applicantWO0228241
 WO02074144
 WO02078498
 EP1593329
 EP1440640
 EP1715778
 WO2009007292
 EP1472156
 EP1593326
otherDE102007032287
 EP1593329