Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2525692

EP2525692 - METHOD FOR PROVIDING INFORMATION TO A USER FROM A CAPSULE FOR THE PREPARATION OF A BEVERAGE USING A CODE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.04.2017
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
14.10.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Société des Produits Nestlé S.A.
Entre-deux-Villes
1800 Vevey / CH
[2019/28]
Former [2012/48]For all designated states
Nestec S.A.
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Inventor(s)01 / ROGNON, Vincent
Grand'rue 12
1417 Essertines-sur-Yverdon / CH
02 / EPARS, Yann
Le Cheminet 4
1305 Penthalaz / CH
03 / DENISART, Jean-Luc
Ch. du Vigny 2
1096 Cully / CH
 [2014/02]
Former [2012/48]01 / ROGNON, Vincent
Grand'rue 12
CH-1417 Essertines-sur-Yverdon / CH
02 / EPARS, Yann
Le Cheminet 4
CH-1305 Penthalaz / CH
03 / DENISART, Jean-Luc
Ch. du Vigny 2
CH-1096 Cully / CH
Representative(s)D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/47]Schuller, Cornelis , et al
Nestec S.A.
CT-IAM
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Former [2012/48](deleted)
...
Application number, filing date11701040.512.01.2011
WO2011EP50323
Priority number, dateEP2010015102019.01.2010         Original published format: EP 10151020
[2012/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011089049
Date:28.07.2011
Language:EN
[2011/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2525692
Date:28.11.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2011
[2012/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2525692
Date:05.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.07.2011
ClassificationInternational:A47J31/36, B65D85/804, G06K19/06
[2012/48]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/48]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON INFORMATION FÜR EINEN BENUTZER VON EINER KAPSEL ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES GETRÄNKS UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES CODES[2013/43]
English:METHOD FOR PROVIDING INFORMATION TO A USER FROM A CAPSULE FOR THE PREPARATION OF A BEVERAGE USING A CODE[2012/48]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR FOURNIR DES INFORMATIONS À UN UTILISATEUR À PARTIR D'UNE CAPSULE POUR LA PRÉPARATION D'UNE BOISSON UTILISANT UN CODE[2013/43]
Former [2012/48]VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON INFORMATIONEN AN EINEN BENUTZER AUS DER KAPSEL FÜR DIE ZUBEREITUNG EINES GETRÄNKS MIT EINEM CODE
Former [2012/48]PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION D'INFORMATIONS À UN UTILISATEUR À PARTIR D'UNE CAPSULE DE PRÉPARATION D'UNE BOISSON À L'AIDE D'UN CODE
Entry into regional phase20.08.2012National basic fee paid 
20.08.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
20.08.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.08.2012Examination requested  [2012/48]
13.03.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.05.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.08.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.09.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.11.2013Fee for grant paid
29.11.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.05.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  03.12.2014  15.12.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Krüger GmbH & Co. KG
Senefelderstr. 44
51469 BERGISCH GLADBACH / DE
Opponent's representative
Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner, et al
Waidmarkt 11
50676 Köln / DE
 02  05.12.2014  15.12.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Koninklijke Douwe Egberts BV
Vleutensevaart 35
3532 AD Utrecht / NL
Opponent's representative
V.O., et al
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
 [N/P]
Former [2015/47]
Opponent(s)01  03.12.2014  15.12.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Krüger GmbH & Co. KG
Senefelderstr. 44
D-51469 BERGISCH GLADBACH / DE
Opponent's representative
Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner, et al
Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23
50668 Köln / DE
 02  05.12.2014  15.12.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Koninklijke Douwe Egberts BV
Vleutensevaart 35
3532 AD Utrecht / NL
Opponent's representative
V.O., et al
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
Former [2015/03]
Opponent(s)01  03.12.2014   
Krüger GmbH & Co. KG
Senefelderstr. 44
D-51469 BERGISCH GLADBACH / DE
Opponent's representative
Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner, et al
Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23
50668 Köln / DE
 02  05.12.2014   
Koninklijke Douwe Egberts BV
Vleutensevaart 35
3532 AD Utrecht / NL
Opponent's representative
Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Former [2015/02]
Opponent(s)01  03.12.2014   
Krüger GmbH & Co. KG
Senefelderstr. 44
D-51469 BERGISCH GLADBACH / DE
Opponent's representative
Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner, et al
Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23
50668 Köln / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
19.01.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
29.07.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
14.08.2015Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
22.12.2015Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
06.02.2017Date of oral proceedings
12.04.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
12.04.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition12.06.2017Appeal received No.  T1367/17
07.08.2017Statement of grounds filed
25.06.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
21.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL05.03.2014
CY05.03.2014
EE05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
MC05.03.2014
MK05.03.2014
MT05.03.2014
RS05.03.2014
SM05.03.2014
IS05.07.2014
LU12.01.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]CY05.03.2014
EE05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
MC05.03.2014
MK05.03.2014
MT05.03.2014
RS05.03.2014
SM05.03.2014
IS05.07.2014
LU12.01.2015
Former [2017/38]CY05.03.2014
EE05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
MC05.03.2014
MT05.03.2014
RS05.03.2014
SM05.03.2014
IS05.07.2014
LU12.01.2015
Former [2017/03]CY05.03.2014
EE05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
MC05.03.2014
MT05.03.2014
RS05.03.2014
IS05.07.2014
LU12.01.2015
Former [2015/43]CY05.03.2014
EE05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
MC05.03.2014
RS05.03.2014
IS05.07.2014
LU12.01.2015
Former [2015/39]CY05.03.2014
EE05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
RS05.03.2014
IS05.07.2014
LU12.01.2015
Former [2014/49]CY05.03.2014
EE05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
RS05.03.2014
IS05.07.2014
Former [2014/48]CY05.03.2014
EE05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
RS05.03.2014
Former [2014/41]CY05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
RS05.03.2014
Former [2014/37]CY05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
Former [2014/36]LT05.03.2014
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP2085000  (KRAFT FOODS R & D INC [DE]) [Y] 1,2,4,6,8,11,13,14 * column 4, line 45; figure 1; claim 19 *;
 [YD]EP1593329  (DATALOGIC SPA [IT]) [YD] 1,2,4,6,8,11,13,14 * paragraph [0009] *;
 [A]WO2007107533  (CONNVISION AG [CH], et al) [A] 3,5,6,9,10,12,14 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1387560  (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 3,5,14 * the whole document *
by applicantWO0228241
 WO02074144
 WO02078498
 EP1593329
 EP1440640
 EP1715778
 WO2009007292
 EP1472156
 EP1593326