Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2525692 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2525692



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1648
19.11.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
11.11.2019 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
23.10.2019 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
22.10.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
17.10.2019 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
17.10.2019 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
17.10.2019 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
14.10.2019 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
11.06.2019 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
31.05.2019 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Appeal 33
27.07.2018 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
22.12.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.12.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.12.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
19.12.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
19.12.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
19.12.2017 Claims Appeal 2
19.12.2017 Claims Appeal 2
19.12.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
19.12.2017 Reply to appeal Appeal 10
10.08.2017 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
10.08.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.08.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
07.08.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
07.08.2017 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 16
03.07.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
21.06.2017 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
21.06.2017 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
21.06.2017 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
16.06.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
16.06.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
16.06.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
16.06.2017 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
16.06.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.06.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.06.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.06.2017 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 1
13.06.2017 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
12.06.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
12.06.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
12.06.2017 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
15.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
15.05.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
15.05.2017 Request for correction Opposition 2
03.05.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.05.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
24.04.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.04.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.04.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.04.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
12.04.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
12.04.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
12.04.2017 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
12.04.2017 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
12.04.2017 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
12.04.2017 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 17
12.04.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
12.04.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
12.04.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
12.04.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
12.04.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
12.04.2017 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
12.04.2017 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
08.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.02.2017 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
31.01.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
31.01.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
27.01.2017 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 28
27.01.2017 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
27.01.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
12.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
06.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
06.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
06.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
06.12.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
06.12.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
06.12.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
06.12.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
06.12.2016 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
06.12.2016 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
06.12.2016 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
06.12.2016 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
06.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
06.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
06.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
06.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
06.12.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.12.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.12.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 7
06.12.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 5
06.12.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 8
05.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
05.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
05.12.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.12.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.07.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
14.07.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.07.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.07.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.07.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.07.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
04.07.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
04.07.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
04.07.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
04.07.2016 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
04.07.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.07.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.07.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.06.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.06.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.06.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
23.06.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
23.06.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
20.06.2016 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
17.02.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.02.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
11.02.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
11.02.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
11.02.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.02.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
08.01.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.01.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.12.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
22.12.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
22.12.2015 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 6
27.10.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.10.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.10.2015 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
19.10.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
19.10.2015 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
15.10.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
15.10.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.10.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.10.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
15.10.2015 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
09.10.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
09.10.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
09.10.2015 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 6
29.09.2015 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
14.08.2015 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
14.08.2015 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
29.07.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 24
29.07.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
29.07.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
29.07.2015 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 24
09.07.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
02.07.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
18.05.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
18.05.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 6
18.05.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
18.05.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 6
18.05.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
18.05.2015 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
07.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
07.05.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
07.05.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
06.05.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
19.01.2015 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
19.01.2015 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 100
19.01.2015 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 23
14.01.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
14.01.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
14.01.2015 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Opposition 2
14.01.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
19.12.2014 General authorisation Opposition 1
19.12.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
18.12.2014 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
09.12.2014 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
05.12.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
05.12.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 51
05.12.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
05.12.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.12.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
05.12.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 27
05.12.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
05.12.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
05.12.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 49
05.12.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
05.12.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
05.12.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 27
05.12.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
05.12.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
05.12.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 30
05.12.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 38
05.12.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
05.12.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 29
05.12.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
03.12.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
03.12.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
03.12.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 15
03.12.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
03.12.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 44
03.12.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 129
03.12.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 33
03.12.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
03.12.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
03.12.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
03.12.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 93
03.12.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
03.12.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
03.12.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
07.03.2014 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
06.02.2014 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
29.11.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.11.2013 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
29.11.2013 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
29.11.2013 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
29.11.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
16.10.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
08.10.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
30.09.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
27.09.2013 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
27.09.2013 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
27.09.2013 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
27.09.2013 Text intended for grant Search / examination 29
10.09.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 38
04.09.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 38
30.08.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
30.08.2013 Claims Search / examination 3
30.08.2013 Description Search / examination 1
30.08.2013 Description Search / examination 2
30.08.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
30.08.2013 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.05.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
07.05.2013 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
13.03.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.03.2013 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
13.03.2013 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
13.03.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
31.10.2012 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
04.09.2012 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
31.08.2012 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
31.08.2012 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
31.08.2012 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
28.08.2012 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 4
07.08.2012 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 4
29.06.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.06.2012 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
04.06.2012 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
16.08.2011 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 32
28.07.2011 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
28.07.2011 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 30
11.03.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
11.03.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
11.03.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
12.01.2011 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
12.01.2011 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
12.01.2011 Claims PCT receiving Office 3
12.01.2011 Description PCT receiving Office 16
12.01.2011 Drawings PCT receiving Office 9
12.01.2011 Priority document (RO-procedure) PCT receiving Office 31