Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2525692


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
14.10.2019 Change: Date of oral proceedings
14.10.2019 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
07.06.2019 Change - applicant published on  10.07.2019  [2019/28]
12.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
29.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.08.2018  [2018/31]
18.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.09.2017  [2017/38]
07.08.2017 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
16.06.2017 Change: Appeal number
15.06.2017 New entry: Appeal number
15.06.2017 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
11.04.2017 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
11.04.2017 New entry: Despatch of communication that opposition is rejected
16.12.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.01.2017  [2017/03]
11.07.2016 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
27.06.2016 Deletion: Date of oral proceedings
04.01.2016 New entry: Reply by parties involved to observations of proprietor
23.10.2015 Change: Despatch of observations of proprietor to parties involved + time limit
16.10.2015 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  18.11.2015  [2015/47]
18.09.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.10.2015  [2015/43]
21.08.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.09.2015  [2015/39]
13.08.2015 New entry: Despatch of observations of proprietor to parties involved + time limit
07.08.2015 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.07.2015 Change - representative
13.05.2015 Change - representative
13.05.2015 Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
20.01.2015 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
10.01.2015 Change - representative
12.12.2014 Opposition filed published on  14.01.2015  [2015/03]
05.12.2014 Opposition filed published on  07.01.2015  [2015/02]
31.10.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.12.2014  [2014/49]
24.10.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.11.2014  [2014/48]
05.09.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.10.2014  [2014/41]
08.08.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.09.2014  [2014/37]
01.08.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.09.2014  [2014/36]
31.01.2014 (Expected) grant published on  05.03.2014  [2014/10]
30.01.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.12.2013 Change - inventor published on  08.01.2014  [2014/02]
03.12.2013 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
03.12.2013 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
18.10.2013 Change - representative published on  20.11.2013  [2013/47]
27.09.2013 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
20.09.2013 Change - German title published on  23.10.2013  [2013/43]
20.09.2013 Change - French title published on  23.10.2013  [2013/43]
13.09.2013 Change - German title published on  16.10.2013  [2013/42]
13.09.2013 Change - French title published on  16.10.2013  [2013/42]
02.09.2013 New entry: Reply to examination report
06.05.2013 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
03.05.2013 First examination report
22.03.2013 Change - extension states published on  24.04.2013  [2013/17]
15.03.2013 Amendment by applicant
18.01.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.10.2012 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  28.11.2012  [2012/48]
26.10.2012 Request for examination filed published on  28.11.2012  [2012/48]
14.09.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
27.08.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
10.08.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
29.07.2011 PCT data prior to European publication