Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2525692 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201180006330 EP10151020 EP11701040



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9980596Global Dossier 29.05.2018B2
US2012295234 22.11.2012A1
Priority number Date
WO2011EP50323 12.01.2011
EP10151020 19.01.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR102054656BGlobal Dossier 11.12.2019B1
KR20120121902 06.11.2012A
Priority number Date
WO2011EP50323 12.01.2011
EP10151020 19.01.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR101910761BGlobal Dossier 22.10.2018B1
KR20170124628 10.11.2017A
Priority number Date
WO2011EP50323 12.01.2011
EP10151020 19.01.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP5793151BGlobal Dossier 14.10.2015B2
JP2013517028 16.05.2013A
Priority number Date
WO2011EP50323 12.01.2011
EP10151020 19.01.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN102711566BGlobal Dossier 25.11.2015B
CN102711566 03.10.2012A
Priority number Date
WO2011EP50323 12.01.2011
EP10151020 19.01.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2786499Global Dossier 20.02.2018C
CA2786499 28.07.2011A1
Priority number Date
WO2011EP50323 12.01.2011
EP10151020 19.01.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2525692Global Dossier 05.03.2014B1
EP2525692 28.11.2012A1
Priority number Date
WO2011EP50323 12.01.2011
EP10151020 19.01.2010
EP11701040 12.01.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2011208837C 14.12.2017C1
AU2011208837B 05.11.2015B2
AU2011208837 19.07.2012A1
Priority number Date
WO2011EP50323 12.01.2011
EP10151020 19.01.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112012017862 19.04.2016A2
Priority number Date
WO2011EP50323 12.01.2011
EP10151020 19.01.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK2525692T 05.05.2014T3
Priority number Date
WO2011EP50323 12.01.2011
EP10151020 19.01.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2457597T 28.04.2014T3
Priority number Date
WO2011EP50323 12.01.2011
EP10151020 19.01.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HRP20140388T 06.06.2014T1
Priority number Date
WO2011EP50323 12.01.2011
EP10151020 19.01.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL220643 30.07.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2011EP50323 12.01.2011
EP10151020 19.01.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IN6208DELNP2012 25.09.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2011EP50323 12.01.2011
EP10151020 19.01.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX2012008249 03.08.2012A
Priority number Date
WO2011EP50323 12.01.2011
EP10151020 19.01.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PL2525692T 29.08.2014T3
Priority number Date
WO2011EP50323 12.01.2011
EP10151020 19.01.2010
EP11701040 12.01.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RU2012135554 27.02.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2011EP50323 12.01.2011
EP10151020 19.01.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SG181948 30.07.2012A1
Priority number Date
WO2011EP50323 12.01.2011
EP10151020 19.01.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SI2525692T 30.04.2014T1
Priority number Date
WO2011EP50323 12.01.2011
EP10151020 19.01.2010
EP11701040 12.01.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
UA108228 10.04.2015C2
Priority number Date
WO2011EP50323 12.01.2011
EP10151020 19.01.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2011089049Global Dossier 28.07.2011A1
Priority number Date
EP10151020 19.01.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2345352Global Dossier 20.07.2011A1
Priority number Date
EP10151020 19.01.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AR079927 29.02.2012A1
Priority number Date
EP10151020 19.01.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CL2012002011 23.11.2012A1
Priority number Date
EP10151020 19.01.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
MY160660 15.03.2017A
Priority number Date
EP10151020 19.01.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PT2525692E 10.04.2014E
Priority number Date
EP10151020 19.01.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
SG10201503100V 29.06.2015A
Priority number Date
EP10151020 19.01.2010