Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2563862

EP2563862 - CURABLE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.01.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.01.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.02.2018  [2018/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huntsman Advanced Materials Licensing (Switzerland) GmbH
Klybeckstrasse 200
4057 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2016/52]For all designated states
Huntsmann Advanced Materials Licensing (Switzerland) GmbH
Klybeckstrasse 200
4057 Basel / CH
Former [2013/10]For all designated states
Huntsman Advanced Materials (Switzerland) GmbH
Klybeckstrasse 200
4057 Basel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / CHERKAOUI, Zoubair
Sandweg 63
CH-4123 Allschwill / CH
02 / FRANTZ, Richard
37 Rue des Jardins
68128 Village Neuf / FR
03 / GALAND, Emilie
14 rue Victor Coste
F-68300 St. Louis / FR
04 / GRAEBER, Matthias
c/o Bühler AG
Gupfenstr. 5
CH-9240 Uzwil / CH
05 / KOTZEV, Dimiter
Markgräflerstr. 44
CH-4057 Basel / CH
 [2013/10]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2014/25]
Former [2013/12]Hoffmann, Daniele , et al
Huntsman Advanced Materials (Switzerland) GmbH Intellectual Property Department Klybeckstrasse 200
4057 Basel / CH
Application number, filing date11702272.309.02.2011
WO2011EP51907
Priority number, dateEP2010016145229.04.2010         Original published format: EP 10161452
[2013/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011134686
Date:03.11.2011
Language:EN
[2011/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2563862
Date:06.03.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2011
[2013/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.11.2011
ClassificationInternational:C08L83/06, H01L51/50
[2013/10]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/10]
TitleGerman:HÄRTBARE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG[2013/10]
English:CURABLE COMPOSITION[2013/10]
French:COMPOSITION DURCISSABLE[2013/10]
Entry into regional phase29.11.2012National basic fee paid 
29.11.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
29.11.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.11.2012Examination requested  [2013/10]
18.06.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.09.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/06]
28.09.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2018/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
07.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
13.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
08.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.201707   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO2006085839  (POLYSET COMP INC [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0017] - [0049]; example 7; claims 1-28 * [Y] 1-14;
 [Y]JP2007009086  (TOAGOSEI CO LTD) [Y] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP1576045  (RHODIA CHIMIE SA [FR]) [Y] 1-14 * paragraphs [0177] - [0185] * * paragraphs [0340] - [0353] *
 [Y]  - SUZUKI H ET AL, "Cation-curable composition for sealing material of semiconductor element, contains preset amount of specific epoxy silicone, polyfunctional epoxy silicone, polydimethyl siloxane, aluminum compound and epoxy compound", WPI / THOMSON,, (20070118), vol. 2007, no. 18, XP002586433 [Y] 1-14
 [Y]  - CRIVELLO J V ET AL, "THE SYNTHESIS, CHARACTERIZATION, AND PHOTOINITIATED CATIONIC POLYMERIZATION OF SILICON-CONTAINING EPOXY RESINS", JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE, POLYMER CHEMISTRY EDITION, INTERSCIENCE PUBLISHERS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19900201), vol. 28, no. 3, ISSN 0360-6376, pages 479 - 503, XP000141356 [Y] 1-14 * the whole document *
by applicantUS2003127973
 US7109651
 EP0562922
 US4336363
 EP0379464
 EP0580552
 US4058401
 EP0066543
 EP0673104