Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2496114

EP2496114 - STABILIZER SHOE FOR A RACK FOR SUPPORTING OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.01.2014
Database last updated on 19.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Scholz, Gottfried
3, rue des Vergers
68480 Biederthal / FR
[2012/37]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2012/37]
Representative(s)Aue, Hans-Peter
Patentanwälte
Becker & Aue
Tannenring 79
65207 Wiesbaden / DE
[2013/11]
Former [2012/37]Aue, Hans-Peter
Patentanwälte Becker & Aue Tannenring 79
65207 Wiesbaden / DE
Application number, filing date11702800.103.01.2011
WO2011EP50001
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012092955
Date:12.07.2012
Language:DE
[2012/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2496114
Date:12.09.2012
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2012
[2012/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2496114
Date:13.03.2013
Language:DE
[2013/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.07.2012
ClassificationInternational:A47B57/40
[2012/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/37]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:STABILISATOR-SCHUH FÜR EIN REGAL ZUR LAGERUNG VON GEGENSTÄNDEN[2012/37]
English:STABILIZER SHOE FOR A RACK FOR SUPPORTING OBJECTS[2012/37]
French:PATIN STABILISATEUR POUR RAYONNAGE DESTINÉ À STOCKER DES OBJETS[2012/37]
Entry into regional phase02.03.2012National basic fee paid 
02.03.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
02.03.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.03.2012Examination requested  [2012/37]
16.10.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.12.2012Fee for grant paid
04.12.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.10.2012
Opposition(s)16.12.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2014/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU03.01.2011
AL13.03.2013
CY13.03.2013
CZ13.03.2013
DK13.03.2013
EE13.03.2013
FI13.03.2013
HR13.03.2013
LT13.03.2013
LV13.03.2013
MC13.03.2013
MK13.03.2013
MT13.03.2013
PL13.03.2013
RO13.03.2013
RS13.03.2013
SE13.03.2013
SI13.03.2013
SK13.03.2013
SM13.03.2013
BG13.06.2013
NO13.06.2013
GR14.06.2013
IS13.07.2013
PT15.07.2013
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU03.01.2011
CY13.03.2013
CZ13.03.2013
DK13.03.2013
EE13.03.2013
FI13.03.2013
HR13.03.2013
LT13.03.2013
LV13.03.2013
MC13.03.2013
MK13.03.2013
MT13.03.2013
PL13.03.2013
RO13.03.2013
RS13.03.2013
SE13.03.2013
SI13.03.2013
SK13.03.2013
SM13.03.2013
BG13.06.2013
NO13.06.2013
GR14.06.2013
IS13.07.2013
PT15.07.2013
Former [2016/32]HU03.01.2011
CY13.03.2013
CZ13.03.2013
DK13.03.2013
EE13.03.2013
FI13.03.2013
HR13.03.2013
LT13.03.2013
LV13.03.2013
MC13.03.2013
MT13.03.2013
PL13.03.2013
RO13.03.2013
RS13.03.2013
SE13.03.2013
SI13.03.2013
SK13.03.2013
SM13.03.2013
BG13.06.2013
NO13.06.2013
GR14.06.2013
IS13.07.2013
PT15.07.2013
Former [2016/31]CY13.03.2013
CZ13.03.2013
DK13.03.2013
EE13.03.2013
FI13.03.2013
HR13.03.2013
LT13.03.2013
LV13.03.2013
MC13.03.2013
MT13.03.2013
PL13.03.2013
RO13.03.2013
RS13.03.2013
SE13.03.2013
SI13.03.2013
SK13.03.2013
SM13.03.2013
BG13.06.2013
NO13.06.2013
GR14.06.2013
IS13.07.2013
PT15.07.2013
Former [2016/22]CZ13.03.2013
DK13.03.2013
EE13.03.2013
FI13.03.2013
HR13.03.2013
LT13.03.2013
LV13.03.2013
MC13.03.2013
MT13.03.2013
PL13.03.2013
RO13.03.2013
RS13.03.2013
SE13.03.2013
SI13.03.2013
SK13.03.2013
SM13.03.2013
BG13.06.2013
NO13.06.2013
GR14.06.2013
IS13.07.2013
PT15.07.2013
Former [2016/12]CZ13.03.2013
DK13.03.2013
EE13.03.2013
FI13.03.2013
HR13.03.2013
LT13.03.2013
LV13.03.2013
MC13.03.2013
MT13.03.2013
PL13.03.2013
RO13.03.2013
RS13.03.2013
SE13.03.2013
SI13.03.2013
SK13.03.2013
BG13.06.2013
NO13.06.2013
GR14.06.2013
IS13.07.2013
PT15.07.2013
Former [2015/21]CZ13.03.2013
DK13.03.2013
EE13.03.2013
FI13.03.2013
HR13.03.2013
LT13.03.2013
LV13.03.2013
MC13.03.2013
PL13.03.2013
RO13.03.2013
RS13.03.2013
SE13.03.2013
SI13.03.2013
SK13.03.2013
BG13.06.2013
NO13.06.2013
GR14.06.2013
IS13.07.2013
PT15.07.2013
Former [2014/09]CZ13.03.2013
DK13.03.2013
EE13.03.2013
FI13.03.2013
HR13.03.2013
LT13.03.2013
LV13.03.2013
PL13.03.2013
RO13.03.2013
RS13.03.2013
SE13.03.2013
SI13.03.2013
SK13.03.2013
BG13.06.2013
NO13.06.2013
GR14.06.2013
IS13.07.2013
PT15.07.2013
Former [2013/50]CZ13.03.2013
EE13.03.2013
FI13.03.2013
HR13.03.2013
LT13.03.2013
LV13.03.2013
PL13.03.2013
RO13.03.2013
RS13.03.2013
SE13.03.2013
SI13.03.2013
SK13.03.2013
BG13.06.2013
NO13.06.2013
GR14.06.2013
IS13.07.2013
PT15.07.2013
Former [2013/49]CZ13.03.2013
EE13.03.2013
FI13.03.2013
HR13.03.2013
LT13.03.2013
LV13.03.2013
RO13.03.2013
RS13.03.2013
SE13.03.2013
SI13.03.2013
SK13.03.2013
BG13.06.2013
NO13.06.2013
GR14.06.2013
IS13.07.2013
PT15.07.2013
Former [2013/48]EE13.03.2013
FI13.03.2013
HR13.03.2013
LT13.03.2013
LV13.03.2013
RS13.03.2013
SE13.03.2013
SI13.03.2013
BG13.06.2013
NO13.06.2013
GR14.06.2013
IS13.07.2013
PT15.07.2013
Former [2013/47]FI13.03.2013
HR13.03.2013
LT13.03.2013
LV13.03.2013
RS13.03.2013
SE13.03.2013
SI13.03.2013
BG13.06.2013
NO13.06.2013
GR14.06.2013
PT15.07.2013
Former [2013/43]FI13.03.2013
HR13.03.2013
LT13.03.2013
LV13.03.2013
RS13.03.2013
SE13.03.2013
SI13.03.2013
BG13.06.2013
NO13.06.2013
GR14.06.2013
Former [2013/41]FI13.03.2013
HR13.03.2013
LT13.03.2013
LV13.03.2013
SE13.03.2013
SI13.03.2013
BG13.06.2013
NO13.06.2013
GR14.06.2013
Former [2013/38]FI13.03.2013
LT13.03.2013
LV13.03.2013
SE13.03.2013
SI13.03.2013
BG13.06.2013
NO13.06.2013
GR14.06.2013
Former [2013/37]FI13.03.2013
LT13.03.2013
SE13.03.2013
SI13.03.2013
BG13.06.2013
NO13.06.2013
GR14.06.2013
Former [2013/34]LT13.03.2013
SE13.03.2013
BG13.06.2013
NO13.06.2013
Former [2013/33]LT13.03.2013
NO13.06.2013
Cited inInternational search[AD]DE10148174  (SCHOLZ GOTTFRIED [DE]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *;
 [AD]DE10160364  (SCHOLZ GOTTFRIED [DE]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE1178564  (STRASBOURG FORGES) [A] 1 * figure 4 *
by applicantDE10148174
 DE10160364