Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2539091

EP2539091 - CASTING CORE FOR TURBINE ENGINE COMPONENTS AND METHOD OF MAKING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.06.2018
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.05.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Siemens Energy, Inc.
4400 Alafaya Trail
Orlando, FL 32826-2399 / US
For all designated states
Mikro Systems, Inc.
1180 Seminole Trail, Suite 220
Charlottesville, VA 22901 / US
[N/P]
Former [2013/01]For all designated states
Siemens Energy, Inc.
4400 Alafaya Trail
Orlando, FL 32826-2399 / US
For all designated states
Mikro Systems Inc.
1180 Seminole Trail, Suite 220
Charlottesville, VA 22901 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KAMEL, Ahmed
2439 Guiana Plum Drive
Orlando Florida 32828 / US
02 / JOUINI, Dhafer
16109 Bristol Lake Circle
Orlando Florida 32828 / US
03 / MERRILL, Gary B.
2413 Flowering Dogwood Drive
Orlando Florida 32828 / US
04 / PAULUS, John R.
978 Smith Road
Afton Virginia 22920 / US
05 / APPLEBY, Michael P.
3435 Carr's Ridge Road
Crozet Virginia 22932 / US
06 / FRASER, Iain Alasdair
158 Greene Court
Ruckersville Virginia 22968 / US
07 / KLINGER, Jill
201 Palatine Avenue
Charlottesville Virginia 22902 / US
08 / ORSINGER, Gabriel Victor
3201 E. Seneca Street Apt. 126
Tucson Arizona 85716 / US
09 / ELLGASS, Daniel
13896 Lee Jackson Highway
Big Island Virginia 24526 / US
 [2013/01]
Representative(s)Maier, Daniel Oliver , et al
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/19]McGowan, Nigel George , et al
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
Former [2013/01]Brocklehurst, Adam Jeffrey
Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
Application number, filing date11702904.101.02.2011
WO2011US23262
Priority number, dateUS2010071263225.02.2010         Original published format: US 712632
[2013/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011106131
Date:01.09.2011
Language:EN
[2011/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2539091
Date:02.01.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2011
[2013/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.09.2011
ClassificationInternational:B22C9/10
[2013/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/01]
TitleGerman:GIESSKERN FÜR TURBINENMOTORKOMPONENTEN UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2013/01]
English:CASTING CORE FOR TURBINE ENGINE COMPONENTS AND METHOD OF MAKING THE SAME[2013/01]
French:NOYAU DE COULÉE POUR COMPOSANTS DE MOTEUR DE TURBINE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CEUX-CI[2013/01]
Entry into regional phase11.09.2012National basic fee paid 
11.09.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
11.09.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.09.2012Examination requested  [2013/01]
11.04.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.06.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
14.08.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.05.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.02.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.05.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.11.2015
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
15.08.2016Request for further processing filed
15.08.2016Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
26.08.2016Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
19.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
20.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
19.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
20.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
19.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
18.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP0715913  (HOWMET CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,9,11-13,15,17-22 * page 2, line 54 - page 7, line 31 * * claims 33,36,39 * * figures 3-6 * [Y] 5,10,16,23;
 [XY]EP1854567  (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,7-9,11,13-15,17-22 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0034] * * figures 2-22 * [Y] 10,16,23;
 [XYI]WO0032331  (HOWMET RES CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,4,7,9,11,13,15,17-22 * page 1 - page 8 * * figures 1-6 * [Y] 10,16,23 [I] 5;
 [X]EP1652603  (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,7,9,11,13-15,17-19,21,22 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0025] * * figures 1-8 *;
 [X]EP1930098  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,2,7,9,19,21,22 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0033] * * figures 1-4 *;
 [Y]US2007221359  (REILLY P B [US]) [Y] 5 * figures 1-5 * * paragraph [0025] *;
 [Y]US2008164001  (MORRIS MARK C [US], et al) [Y] 10,16,23 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0035] * * figures 7-9 *;
 [A]US2007025851  (GUERCHE DIDIER [FR], et al) [A] 3 * the whole document *
by applicantUS7411204
 US7410606
 US7141812
 US2004156478
 US2008053638
 US2009084933
 US2961751
 US3957715
 US4190450
 US4284121
 US4837187
 US5394932
 US6588484
 US7413001
 US2008169081
 US3090691
 US3108985