Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2537126

EP2537126 - METHOD, COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT AND COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM FOR THE GENERIC CREATION OF A TREE STRUCTURE FOR DESCRIBING AN IT METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.09.2014
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2019New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DB Systel GmbH
Kleyerstrasse 27
60326 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[2012/52]
Inventor(s)01 / BERMUTH, Klaus
Hinkelsteinerstrasse 20
55128 Mainz / DE
 [2012/52]
Representative(s)2s-ip Schramm Schneider Bertagnoll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Part mbB
Postfach 86 02 67
81629 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/52]Zinken-Sommer, Rainer
Deutsche Bahn AG Patentabteilung Völckerstrasse 5
80939 München / DE
Application number, filing date11702941.303.02.2011
WO2011EP00501
Priority number, dateDE2010100796715.02.2010         Original published format: DE102010007967
[2012/52]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2011098231
Date:18.08.2011
Language:DE
[2011/33]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2537126
Date:26.12.2012
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.2011
[2012/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.02.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06Q10/00
[2012/52]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/52]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN, COMPUTERPROGRAM-PRODUKT SOWIE COMPUTERLESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM ZUR GENERISCHEN ERSTELLUNG EINES STRUKTURBAUMS ZUR BESCHREIBUNG EINES IT-VERFAHRENS[2012/52]
English:METHOD, COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT AND COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM FOR THE GENERIC CREATION OF A TREE STRUCTURE FOR DESCRIBING AN IT METHOD[2012/52]
French:PROCÉDÉ, PRODUIT PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR POUR PRODUIRE DE MANIÈRE GÉNÉRIQUE UNE STRUCTURE ARBORESCENTE SERVANT À DÉCRIRE UN PROCÉDÉ INFORMATIQUE[2012/52]
Entry into regional phase17.09.2012National basic fee paid 
Examination procedure13.09.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.08.2013Examination requested  [2013/38]
06.05.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.09.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.03.2015Date of oral proceedings
20.03.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
20.03.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination20.05.2015Appeal received No.  T1526/15
21.07.2015Statement of grounds filed
08.09.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.05.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
27.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
26.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
26.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
28.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
26.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
28.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 09