Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2678981

EP2678981 - ASSOCIATING COMPUTING RESOURCES AND COMMUNICATION RESOURCES WITH A SERVICE IN A RESOURCE MANAGEMENT ARCHITECTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.10.2014
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip03.10.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.11.2014  [2014/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Solutions and Networks GmbH & Co. KG
St.-Martin-Strasse 76
81541 Munich / DE
[2014/01]
Inventor(s)01 / HOFFMANN, Klaus
Franz-Sperr-Weg 51
80995 München / DE
02 / HOFFMANN, Marco
Pennstr. 6
81549 München / DE
03 / SCHMIDT-SCHYKOWSKI, Klaus
Maximilianstr. 62
86150 Augsburg / DE
 [2014/01]
Representative(s)Weidel, Gottfried , et al
Nokia Solutions and Networks GmbH & Co. KG
CEF T&I IPR Patent Administration
80240 Munich / DE
[2014/01]
Application number, filing date11706517.722.02.2011
WO2011EP52621
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012113446
Date:30.08.2012
Language:EN
[2012/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2678981
Date:01.01.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2012
[2014/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.08.2012
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/56, H04L12/24
[2014/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/01]
TitleGerman:ZUORDNUNG VON COMPUTERRESSOURCEN UND KOMMUNIKATIONSRESSOURCEN MIT EINES DIENST IN EINER RESSOURCENVERWALTUNGSARCHITEKTUR[2014/01]
English:ASSOCIATING COMPUTING RESOURCES AND COMMUNICATION RESOURCES WITH A SERVICE IN A RESOURCE MANAGEMENT ARCHITECTURE[2014/01]
French:ASSOCIATION DE RESSOURCES INFORMATIQUES ET DE RESSOURCES DE COMMUNICATION À UN SERVICE DANS UNE ARCHITECTURE DE GESTION DE RESSOURCES[2014/01]
Entry into regional phase23.09.2013National basic fee paid 
23.09.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
23.09.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.09.2013Examination requested  [2014/01]
18.04.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/45]
20.06.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time  [2014/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
20.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]US2004205101  (RADHAKRISHNAN RAKESH [US]) [X] 1-11 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0044] *;
 [X]  - KARSTEN OBERLE ET AL, "The network aspect of Infrastructure-as-a-Service", INTELLIGENCE IN NEXT GENERATION NETWORKS (ICIN), 2010 14TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20101011), ISBN 978-1-4244-7443-1, pages 1 - 6, XP031805038 [X] 1-11 * abstract; sections I, III and IV *
 [X]  - BUYYA R ET AL, "Market-Oriented Cloud Computing: Vision, Hype, and Reality for Delivering IT Services as Computing Utilities", HIGH PERFORMANCE COMPUTING AND COMMUNICATIONS, 2008. HPCC '08. 10TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080925), ISBN 978-0-7695-3352-0, pages 5 - 13, XP031344187 [X] 1-11 * sections 1, 1.1 and 2 *
 [A]  - ATTILA KERTESZ ET AL, "Autonomic SLA-Aware Service Virtualization for Distributed Systems", PARALLEL, DISTRIBUTED AND NETWORK-BASED PROCESSING (PDP), 2011 19TH EUROMICRO INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20110209), doi:10.1109/PDP.2011.17, ISBN 978-1-4244-9682-2, pages 503 - 510, XP031932851 [A] 1-11 * page 503, column left - page 505, column left *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PDP.2011.17
 [A]  - GAMBI A ET AL, "SLA Protection models for virtualized data centers", SOFTWARE ENGINEERING FOR ADAPTIVE AND SELF-MANAGING SYSTEMS, 2009. SEAMS '09. ICSE WORKSHOP ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090518), ISBN 978-1-4244-3724-5, pages 10 - 19, XP031471094 [A] 1-11 * the whole document *