Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2545548

EP2545548 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING AN INPUT AUDIO SIGNAL USING CASCADED FILTERBANKS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  11.10.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Refusal of applicationpublished on 13.11.2019  [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastrasse 27c
80686 München / DE
For all designated states
Dolby International AB
Apollo Building, 3E
Herikerbergweg 1-35
1101 CN Amsterdam Zuid-Oost / NL
[2013/03]
Inventor(s)01 / VILLEMOES, Lars
Mandolinvaegen 22
175 56 Jaerfaella / SE
02 / EKSTRAND, Per
Soedermannagatan 45
116 40 Stockholm / SE
03 / DISCH, Sascha
Wilhelmstr. 70
90766 Fürth / DE
04 / NAGEL, Frederik
Wilhelmshavener Strasse 72
90425 Nürnberg / DE
05 / WILDE, Stephan
Geranienweg 17
90530 Wendelstein / DE
 [2013/28]
Former [2013/03]01 / VILLEMOES, Lars
Mandolinvaegen 22
175 56 Jaerfaella / SE
02 / EKSTRAND, Per
Soedermannagatan 45
116 40 Stockholm / SE
03 / DISCH, Sascha
Turnstrasse 7
90763 Fürth / DE
04 / NAGEL, Frederik
Wilhelmshavener Strasse 72
90425 Nürnberg / DE
05 / WILDE, Stephan
Geranienweg 17
90530 Wendelstein / DE
Representative(s)Zinkler, Franz , et al
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler
Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Radlkoferstrasse 2
81373 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/03]Zinkler, Franz , et al
Patentanwälte Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler
Zinkler & Partner
Postfach 246
82043 Pullach / DE
Application number, filing date11707400.504.03.2011
WO2011EP53315
Priority number, dateUS20100312127P09.03.2010         Original published format: US 312127 P
[2013/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011110500
Date:15.09.2011
Language:EN
[2011/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2545548
Date:16.01.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2011
[2013/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.09.2011
ClassificationInternational:G10L19/02, G10L21/02, G10L21/04
[2013/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/03]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG EINES EINGANGSTONSIGNALS MIT KASKADIERTEN FILTERBÄNKEN[2013/03]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING AN INPUT AUDIO SIGNAL USING CASCADED FILTERBANKS[2013/03]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'UN SIGNAL D'ENTRÉE AUDIO À L'AIDE DE BANCS DE FILTRES EN CASCADE[2013/03]
Entry into regional phase18.09.2012National basic fee paid 
18.09.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
18.09.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.12.2011Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
18.09.2012Examination requested  [2013/03]
24.04.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.06.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.12.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.04.2015Date of oral proceedings
15.07.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/46]
15.07.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
19.06.2019Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/46]
Appeal following examination25.09.2015Appeal received No.  T2239/15
23.11.2015Statement of grounds filed
19.06.2019Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
19.06.2019Date of oral proceedings
22.07.2019Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)EP19179788.5
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.06.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
20.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
11.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
09.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
02.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
19.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Cited inInternational search[I]EP1940023  (THALES SA [FR]) [I] 1,18,20-22 * page 4, paragraph 25 - page 5, paragraph 34; figure 3 *;
 [XPI]  - HUAN ZHOU ET AL, "Finalization of CE on QMF based harmonic transposer", 93. MPEG MEETING; 26-7-2010 - 30-7-2010; GENEVA; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, (20100722), XP030046397 [XP] 1,2,4-11,13-22 * pages 2,3; figures 1,2 * [I] 3,12
 [XPI]  - HAISHAN ZHONG ET AL, "Finalization of CE on QMF based harmonic transposer", 94. MPEG MEETING; 11-10-2010 - 15-10-2010; GUANGZHOU; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, (20101028), XP030046976 [XP] 1,2,4-11,13-22 * pages 1,2; figures 1,2 * [I] 3,12
 [A]  - ZHOU HUAN ET AL, "Core Experiment on the eSBR module of USAC", 90. MPEG MEETING; 26-10-2009 - 30-10-2009; XIAN; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, (20091023), XP030045523 [A] 1-22 * figure 2 *
 [A]  - FREDERIK NAGEL ET AL, "A HARMONIC BANDWIDTH EXTENSION METHOD FOR AUDIO CODECS", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING 2009, TAIPEI, (20090419), pages 145 - 148, XP002527507 [A] 1-22 * pages 146,147; figure 5 *
by applicantWO9857436
 US6895375
 US6549884
    - J. MAKHOUL, "Spectral Analysis of Speech by Linear Prediction", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON AUDIO AND ELECTROACOUSTICS, (197306), vol. AU-21, no. 3
    - LAROCHE L.; DOLSON M., "Improved phase vocoder timescale modification of audio", IEEE TRANS. SPEECH AND AUDIO PROCESSING, vol. 7, no. 3, pages 323 - 332