Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2547903

EP2547903 - METHOD FOR DIAGNOSING THE STRUCTURAL CONDITION OF WIND GENERATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2013/04]METHOD FOR TESTING THE STRUCTURAL CONDITION OF WIND GENERATORS
[2013/16]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.01.2017
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LV
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rolawind GmbH
Am Wambach 12
45481 Mülheim a.d. Ruhr / DE
[2017/51]
Former [2015/12]For all designated states
HGZ Patentvermarktungs GmbH
Am Wambach 12
45481 Mühlheim / DE
Former [2015/04]For all designated states
Zell, Gabriele
Am Wambach 12
45481 Mülheim / DE
Former [2014/15]For all designated states
Zell, Horst
Am Wambach 12
45481 Mülheim / DE
Former [2013/04]For all designated states
Zell, Horst
Düsseldorfer Strasse 171
45481 Mülheim an der Ruhr / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Zell Horst
Am Wambach 12
45481 Mühlheim / DE
 [2015/04]
Former [2013/04]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Sparing Röhl Henseler
Patentanwälte
Rethelstrasse 123
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/04]Braun-Dullaeus, Karl-Ulrich
Braun-Dullaeus Pannen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Platz der Ideen 2
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date11707994.715.01.2011
WO2011DE00041
Priority number, dateDE2010103514823.08.2010         Original published format: DE102010035148
DE2010104840013.10.2010         Original published format: DE102010048400
DE2010103475619.08.2010         Original published format: DE102010034756
DE2010102497724.06.2010         Original published format: DE102010024977
DE2010101140315.03.2010         Original published format: DE102010011403
[2013/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011113402
Date:22.09.2011
Language:DE
[2011/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2547903
Date:23.01.2013
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2011
[2013/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2547903
Date:19.03.2014
Language:DE
[2014/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.09.2011
ClassificationInternational:F03D1/00, F03D11/00, F03D11/04
[2013/16]
Former International [2013/04]F03D7/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/04]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERPRÜFUNG DES BAULICHEN ZUSTANDS VON WINDKRAFTANLAGEN[2013/04]
English:METHOD FOR DIAGNOSING THE STRUCTURAL CONDITION OF WIND GENERATORS[2013/16]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE CONTRÔLE DE L'ÉTAT STRUCTURAL D'ÉOLIENNES[2013/04]
Former [2013/04]METHOD FOR TESTING THE STRUCTURAL CONDITION OF WIND GENERATORS
Entry into regional phase14.09.2012National basic fee paid 
14.09.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
14.09.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.09.2011Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.09.2012Examination requested  [2013/04]
11.04.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.08.2013Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
07.10.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.01.2014Fee for grant paid
31.01.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.04.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  16.12.2014  12.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1
80333 München / DE
 02  17.12.2014  12.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastrasse 27c
80686 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Stornebel, Kai
Gramm, Lins & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1
38122 Braunschweig / DE
 03  19.12.2014  14.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Bundesrepublik Deutschland, vertreten durch den Bu ndesminister für Wirtschaft und Energie, dieser ve rtreten durch den Präsid
Für Materialforschung u. -prüfung (BAM)
Unter den Eichen 87, 12205 BERLIN / DE
Opponent's representative
Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 330 920
80069 München / DE
 [2017/48]
Former [2015/08]
Opponent(s)01  16.12.2014  12.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
 02  17.12.2014  12.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastrasse 27c
80686 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Stornebel, Kai
Gramm, Lins & Partner GbR
Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1
38122 Braunschweig / DE
 03  19.12.2014  14.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Bundesrepublik Deutschland, vertreten durch den Bu ndesminister für Wirtschaft und Energie, dieser ve rtreten durch den Präsid
Für Materialforschung u. -prüfung (BAM)
Unter den Eichen 87, 12205 BERLIN / DE
Opponent's representative
Zimmermann & Partner
Josephspitalstr. 15
80331 München / DE
27.01.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
27.05.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
16.12.2016Date of oral proceedings
23.01.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
23.01.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition27.03.2017Appeal received No.  T0784/17
24.05.2017Statement of grounds filed
07.04.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
01.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201303   M06   Fee paid on   13.02.2013
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
MK19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SM19.03.2014
IS19.07.2014
HU16.01.2015
MT15.01.2016
CZ15.01.2018
LT15.01.2018
SK15.01.2018
BG06.08.2018
HR15.01.2019
LV15.01.2019
SE16.01.2019
SI16.01.2019
EE31.01.2019
[2019/50]
Former [2019/49]AL19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
MK19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SM19.03.2014
IS19.07.2014
HU16.01.2015
MT15.01.2016
CZ15.01.2018
LT15.01.2018
SK15.01.2018
BG06.08.2018
HR15.01.2019
SE16.01.2019
SI16.01.2019
EE31.01.2019
Former [2019/48]AL19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
MK19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SM19.03.2014
IS19.07.2014
HU16.01.2015
MT15.01.2016
CZ15.01.2018
LT15.01.2018
SK15.01.2018
BG06.08.2018
SE16.01.2019
Former [2019/11]AL19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
MK19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SM19.03.2014
IS19.07.2014
HU16.01.2015
MT15.01.2016
CZ15.01.2018
LT15.01.2018
SK15.01.2018
BG06.08.2018
Former [2018/50]AL19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
MK19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SM19.03.2014
IS19.07.2014
HU16.01.2015
MT15.01.2016
CZ15.01.2018
LT15.01.2018
SK15.01.2018
Former [2018/46]AL19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
MK19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SM19.03.2014
IS19.07.2014
HU16.01.2015
MT15.01.2016
LT15.01.2018
Former [2018/43]CY19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
MK19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SM19.03.2014
IS19.07.2014
HU16.01.2015
MT15.01.2016
Former [2018/31]CY19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
MK19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SM19.03.2014
IS19.07.2014
HU16.01.2015
MT31.01.2016
Former [2017/47]CY19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SM19.03.2014
IS19.07.2014
HU16.01.2015
MT31.01.2016
Former [2017/38]CY19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SM19.03.2014
IS19.07.2014
HU16.01.2015
Former [2016/10]CY19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
IS19.07.2014
HU16.01.2015
Former [2015/51]CY19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
IS19.07.2014
HU16.01.2015
Former [2015/43]CY19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
IS19.07.2014
Former [2014/49]CY19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
IS19.07.2014
Former [2014/41]CY19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
Former [2014/37]CY19.03.2014
Cited inInternational search[XI]DE102007059502  (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [X] 1-5,7-9,11-15,19,20 * paragraphs [0007] , [0017] , [0021] , [0025] , [0026] , [0032] - [0035]; figure 1 * [I] 10;
 [X]US2005042102  (TEICHERT PAUL [DK]) [X] 1-5,11-14,16-18,20 * paragraphs [0022] , [0 28] , [0 35] - [0046] - [0085] , [0086] , [0108] - [0116] - [0146] - [0148]; figures 1-4 *;
 [XP]WO2010051278  (WILLIAMS SCOT I [US]) [XP] 1-5,8,11-14,20 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0023]; figures 1-4B *;
 [XP]DE102008053928  (HARTMANN DIRK [DE]) [XP] 1-5,11-14,20 * the whole document *
 [XI]  - MEINLSCHMIDT P ET AL, "Thermographic inspection of rotor blades", INTERNET CITATION, ISSN 1435-4934, (20060926), pages 1 - 9, URL: http://www.ndt.net/article/ecndt2006/doc/Tu.1.5.3.pdf, (20090429), XP002525987 [X] 1-5,7-15,19,20 * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 4, paragraph 2 * * page 7, paragraph 1; figures 1,6-10,17,18 * [I] 6
by applicant   - MEINLSCHMIDT P ET AL., "Thermographic inspection of rotor blades", ECNDT 2006, (20060926), pages 1 - 9, URL: http://www.ndt.net/article/ecndt2006/doc/Tu.1.5.3.pdf, XP002525987