Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2547903


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
22.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.12.2019  [2019/52]
08.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.12.2019  [2019/50]
01.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.12.2019  [2019/49]
25.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.11.2019  [2019/48]
23.09.2019 Change: Date of oral proceedings
23.09.2019 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
08.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.03.2019  [2019/11]
16.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.12.2018  [2018/51]
09.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.12.2018  [2018/50]
19.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.11.2018  [2018/47]
12.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
21.09.2018 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
29.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.08.2018  [2018/31]
19.06.2018 Change - representative
17.11.2017 Change - applicant published on  20.12.2017  [2017/51]
15.11.2017 Change - representative
27.10.2017 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  29.11.2017  [2017/48]
20.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.11.2017  [2017/47]
18.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.09.2017  [2017/38]
30.05.2017 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
31.03.2017 Change: Appeal number
29.03.2017 New entry: Appeal number
29.03.2017 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
22.01.2017 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
22.01.2017 New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked
25.04.2016 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
20.04.2016 Deletion: Date of oral proceedings
20.04.2016 Deletion: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
20.04.2016 New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
05.04.2016 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
05.02.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.03.2016  [2016/10]
13.11.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.12.2015  [2015/51]
18.09.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.10.2015  [2015/43]
30.05.2015 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
12.03.2015 Change - representative
24.02.2015 Change - representative
13.02.2015 Change - applicant published on  18.03.2015  [2015/12]
10.02.2015 Change - representative
27.01.2015 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
16.01.2015 Opposition filed published on  18.02.2015  [2015/08]
19.12.2014 Change - applicant published on  21.01.2015  [2015/04]
19.12.2014 Change - inventor published on  21.01.2015  [2015/04]
31.10.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.12.2014  [2014/49]
05.09.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.10.2014  [2014/41]
08.08.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.09.2014  [2014/37]
07.03.2014 Change - applicant published on  09.04.2014  [2014/15]
14.02.2014 (Expected) grant published on  19.03.2014  [2014/12]
05.02.2014 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
05.02.2014 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
06.11.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.10.2013 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
10.04.2013 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
05.04.2013 Change - extension states published on  08.05.2013  [2013/19]
15.03.2013 Change - classification published on  17.04.2013  [2013/16]
15.03.2013 Change - classification published on  17.04.2013  [2013/16]
15.03.2013 Change - English title published on  17.04.2013  [2013/16]
15.02.2013 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
15.02.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.02.2013 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
21.12.2012 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  23.01.2013  [2013/04]
21.12.2012 Request for examination filed published on  23.01.2013  [2013/04]
12.10.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
06.10.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
05.10.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
23.09.2011 PCT data prior to European publication