Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2533655

EP2533655 - METHOD OF MASS FLOW CONTROL AND DEVICE FOR MASS FLOW CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  31.03.2017
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  05.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
International Tobacco Machinery Poland Sp. z o.o.
Ul. Warsztatowa 19A
26-600 Radom / PL
[2012/51]
Inventor(s)01 / CIESLIKOWSKI, Bartosz
ul. Wiejska 16
PL-26-400 Przysucha / PL
 [2012/51]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/18]Przykorski, Andrzej , et al
Kancelaria Patentowa
ul. Malawskiego 5/108
PL-02-641 Warszawa / PL
Former [2012/51]Przykorski, Andrzej , et al
Kancelaria Patentowa ul. Malawskiego 5/108
PL-02-641 Warszawa / PL
Application number, filing date11710578.308.02.2011
[2017/18]
WO2011PL00012
Priority number, datePL2010039041310.02.2010         Original published format: PL 39041310
[2012/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011099880
Date:18.08.2011
Language:EN
[2011/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2533655
Date:19.12.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.2011
[2012/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2533655
Date:03.05.2017
Language:EN
[2017/18]
Type: B9 Corrected patent specification 
No.:EP2533655
Date:24.04.2019
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.08.2011
ClassificationInternational:A24C5/35
[2012/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/51]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR GÜTERFLUSSKONTROLLE[2017/06]
English:METHOD OF MASS FLOW CONTROL AND DEVICE FOR MASS FLOW CONTROL[2012/51]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGULATION DE DÉBIT MASSIQUE ET DISPOSITIF POUR RÉGULATION DE DÉBIT MASSIQUE[2012/51]
Former [2012/51]VERFAHREN ZUR MASSENDURCHFLUSSREGELUNG UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR MASSENDURCHFLUSSREGELUNG
Entry into regional phase30.07.2012National basic fee paid 
30.07.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
30.07.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.07.2012Examination requested  [2012/51]
25.02.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.09.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.03.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
27.03.2017Fee for grant paid
27.03.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.06.2016
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  02.02.2018  07.02.2018  ADMISSIBLE
G.D S.p.A.
Via Battindarno, 91
40133 Bologna / IT
Opponent's representative
Bianciardi, Ezio
Bugnion S.p.A. Via di Corticella, 87
40128 Bologna / IT
 [2018/11]
16.02.2018Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
22.06.2018Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
14.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
29.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
26.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
19.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
23.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT03.05.2017
DK03.05.2017
EE03.05.2017
ES03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
MC03.05.2017
PL03.05.2017
RO03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
SI03.05.2017
SK03.05.2017
SM03.05.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
IE08.02.2018
LU08.02.2018
MT08.02.2018
BE28.02.2018
[2020/08]
Former [2019/12]AT03.05.2017
DK03.05.2017
EE03.05.2017
ES03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
MC03.05.2017
PL03.05.2017
RO03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
SI03.05.2017
SK03.05.2017
SM03.05.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
IE08.02.2018
LU08.02.2018
BE28.02.2018
Former [2019/09]AT03.05.2017
DK03.05.2017
EE03.05.2017
ES03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
MC03.05.2017
PL03.05.2017
RO03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
SI03.05.2017
SK03.05.2017
SM03.05.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
IE08.02.2018
LU08.02.2018
Former [2018/52]AT03.05.2017
DK03.05.2017
EE03.05.2017
ES03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
MC03.05.2017
PL03.05.2017
RO03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
SI03.05.2017
SK03.05.2017
SM03.05.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
LU08.02.2018
Former [2018/44]AT03.05.2017
DK03.05.2017
EE03.05.2017
ES03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
MC03.05.2017
PL03.05.2017
RO03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
SI03.05.2017
SK03.05.2017
SM03.05.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
Former [2018/25]AT03.05.2017
DK03.05.2017
EE03.05.2017
ES03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
PL03.05.2017
RO03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
SI03.05.2017
SK03.05.2017
SM03.05.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
Former [2018/11]AT03.05.2017
DK03.05.2017
EE03.05.2017
ES03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
PL03.05.2017
RO03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
SK03.05.2017
SM03.05.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
Former [2018/10]AT03.05.2017
DK03.05.2017
EE03.05.2017
ES03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
PL03.05.2017
RO03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
SK03.05.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
Former [2018/09]AT03.05.2017
DK03.05.2017
EE03.05.2017
ES03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
PL03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
Former [2017/50]AT03.05.2017
ES03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
PL03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
Former [2017/49]AT03.05.2017
ES03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
Cited inInternational search[X]EP1989945  (HAUNI MASCHINENBAU AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,6-8 * paragraphs [0001] , [0007] - [0010]; figure - *;
 [X]GB2179614  (KOERBER AG) [X] 1,2,4,8 * page 2, lines 38-99; figures 1-3 *;
 [X]EP1795076  (GD SPA [IT]) [X] 1,4,8 * paragraphs [0042] - [0048]; figures 1,2 *;
 [X]EP2022348  (FOCKE & CO [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,8 * paragraphs [0031] - [0034]; figures 1,7,8 *;
 [A]WO02096227  (INT TOBACCO MACHINERY POLAND [PL], et al) [A] 1-21 * abstract *
by applicantUS5217101
 US5529164
 US4986408
 US4553660
 US7044286
OppositionUS4691848
 US3646971
 US3498022
 US2006237336
 US2004231961