Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2547503

EP2547503 - DIES FOR COEXTRUDING A PLURALITY OF FLUID LAYERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  30.10.2019
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip30.10.2019New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cryovac, Inc.
100 Rogers Bridge Rd. Post Office Box 464
Duncan, South Carolina 29334 / US
[2013/04]
Inventor(s)01 / ROBERTS, Lawrence, C.
23 Carlow Court
Spartanburg, SC 29301 / US
02 / TIMMONS, Anton, L.
921 Fargo Street
Mauldin, SC 29662 / US
03 / WEBSTER, Bradford, E.
206 Edge Road
Moore, SC 29369 / US
 [2013/04]
Representative(s)Uexküll & Stolberg
Partnerschaft von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Beselerstraße 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/04]Ahme, Johannes
Uexküll & Stolberg Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date11710606.211.03.2011
WO2011US28018
Priority number, dateUS2010066134116.03.2010         Original published format: US 661341
[2013/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012115663
Date:30.08.2012
Language:EN
[2012/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2547503
Date:23.01.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2012
[2013/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.08.2012
ClassificationInternational:B29C47/06
[2013/04]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/04]
TitleGerman:GIESSFORMEN ZUR KOEXTRUSION MEHRERER FLUIDSCHICHTEN[2013/04]
English:DIES FOR COEXTRUDING A PLURALITY OF FLUID LAYERS[2013/04]
French:FILIÈRES POUR COEXTRUDER UNE PLURALITÉ DE COUCHES DE FLUIDES[2013/04]
Entry into regional phase13.09.2012National basic fee paid 
13.09.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
13.09.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.09.2012Examination requested  [2013/04]
24.04.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.10.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
27.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
27.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201909   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US2003020204  (DAVIDSON RANDOLPH L [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,17 * paragraphs [0024] - [0030] - [0040] , [0045] , [0049] - [0058]; figures 1-3,5,6 *
by applicantUS5076776
 US4832589
 US6409953
 US20080284510