Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2553640

EP2553640 - DYNAMIC CURRENCY CONVERSION SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.11.2013
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.03.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Global Blue S.A.
Route de Crassier 7
1262 Eysins / CH
[2014/36]
Former [2013/06]For all designated states
Global Blue Currency Choice Holdings B.V.
Leidsevaartweg 99
2106 AS Heemstede / NL
Inventor(s)01 / TAN, Puay Hiang
73 Jalan Tua Kong 11-01
Park East Condominium 457266 / SG
 [2013/06]
Representative(s)D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/06]Harris, Ian Richard
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Application number, filing date11712498.217.03.2011
WO2011EP54035
Priority number, dateGB2010000512626.03.2010         Original published format: GB 201005126
[2013/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011117134
Date:29.09.2011
Language:EN
[2011/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2553640
Date:06.02.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2011
[2013/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.09.2011
ClassificationInternational:G06Q20/00
[2013/06]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/06]
TitleGerman:DYNAMISCHES WÄHRUNGSUMRECHNUNGSSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN[2013/06]
English:DYNAMIC CURRENCY CONVERSION SYSTEM AND METHOD[2013/06]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE CONVERSION DYNAMIQUE DE DEVISE[2013/06]
Entry into regional phase11.10.2012National basic fee paid 
11.10.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
11.10.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.01.2012Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.10.2012Examination requested  [2013/06]
10.05.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.07.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.10.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.03.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination25.03.2014Appeal received No.  T1595/14
02.07.2014Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.07.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
03.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
16.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
04.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
16.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
15.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
13.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Cited inInternational search[I]WO2009112812  (FIRST CURRENCY CHOICE HOLDINGS [NL], et al) [I] 1-36 * page 5 - page 26; figures 1-3 *;
 [I]WO2010017237  (VISA USA INC [US], et al) [I] 1-36 * page 4 - page 15 *;
 [I]US2008249908  (LORBERG DANA [US], et al) [I] 1-36 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0106] *;
 [I]WO2004008399  (MAINLINE CORPORATE HOLDINGS [IE], et al) [I] 1-36 * page 9 - page 15 *;
 [I]EP1018711  (MAINLINE CORPORATE HOLDINGS LI [IE]) [I] 1-36 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0082] *
by applicantWO0104846