blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2558086 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2558086



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 134
27.02.2015 Closing of application Search / examination 1
26.11.2014 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
26.08.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
26.08.2014 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
04.08.2014 Examination started Search / examination 1
04.06.2014 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
22.05.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.05.2013 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
22.05.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
22.05.2013 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
22.05.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.01.2013 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
23.11.2012 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
21.11.2012 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
21.11.2012 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
21.11.2012 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
16.11.2012 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 7
13.11.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.11.2012 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
31.10.2012 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
24.08.2012 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
08.11.2011 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 27
20.10.2011 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
20.10.2011 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
20.10.2011 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 21
03.05.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
03.05.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
03.05.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
07.04.2011 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
07.04.2011 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
07.04.2011 Claims PCT receiving Office 2
07.04.2011 Description PCT receiving Office 14
07.04.2011 Drawings PCT receiving Office 4