Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2558086


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
06.03.2015 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  08.04.2015  [2015/15]
26.11.2014 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
25.08.2014 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
22.08.2014 First examination report
30.05.2014 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
21.06.2013 Change - extension states published on  24.07.2013  [2013/30]
27.05.2013 Amendment by applicant
20.02.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.01.2013 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  20.02.2013  [2013/08]
18.01.2013 Request for examination filed published on  20.02.2013  [2013/08]
03.12.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
16.11.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
14.11.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
01.11.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
21.10.2011 PCT data prior to European publication