blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2558086
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2013079416Global Dossier 28.03.2013A1
Priority number Date
FR1052831 14.04.2010
WO2011EP55424 07.04.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2558086Global Dossier 20.02.2013A1
Priority number Date
FR1052831 14.04.2010
WO2011EP55424 07.04.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2011128245Global Dossier 20.10.2011A1
Priority number Date
FR1052831 14.04.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
FR2958849 21.10.2011A1
Priority number Date
FR1052831 14.04.2010