Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2558086

EP2558086 - HOMEOPATHIC MEDICAMENT COMPRISING PHENACETIN FOR THE TREATMENT OF CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.03.2015
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.03.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.04.2015  [2015/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BOIRON
20, rue de la Libération
69110 Sainte-Foy-Lès-Lyon / FR
[2013/08]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHNEIDER, Christophe
4 rue de la Belle Image
F-51170 Aubilly / FR
02 / LAHEURTE, Caroline
5 rue Romaine
F-70800 St-Loup Sur Semouse / FR
03 / MARTINY, Laurent
57 rue Roger Salengro
F-51100 Reims / FR
 [2013/08]
Representative(s)Cabinet Plasseraud
235 Cours Lafayette
69006 Lyon / FR
[2013/08]
Application number, filing date11713264.707.04.2011
WO2011EP55424
Priority number, dateFR2010005283114.04.2010         Original published format: FR 1052831
[2013/08]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011128245
Date:20.10.2011
Language:FR
[2011/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2558086
Date:20.02.2013
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2011
[2013/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.10.2011
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/167, A61P35/00, A61K9/08
[2013/08]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/08]
TitleGerman:HOMÖOPATHIKUM MIT PHENACETIN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS[2013/08]
English:HOMEOPATHIC MEDICAMENT COMPRISING PHENACETIN FOR THE TREATMENT OF CANCER[2013/08]
French:MEDICAMENT HOMEOPATHIQUE COMPRENANT DE LA PHENACETINE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER[2013/08]
Entry into regional phase13.11.2012National basic fee paid 
13.11.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
13.11.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.11.2012Examination requested  [2013/08]
22.05.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.08.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.11.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/15]
26.11.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2015/15]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.08.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201404   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]WO02098403  (UNIV GEORGETOWN [US], et al) [X] 1-8,10-14 * claims 1,3,8,10,13,15,20,22,26 *;
 [X]WO8707842  (BIOGEN NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8,10-14 * page 11, lines 3-7; figure 2; claims 7,9,19 *;
 [X]KR20020026743  ;
 [X]WO0040271  (ML LAB [GB], et al) [X] 1-8,10-14 * page 10, lines 25-30; claims 1,16-19,21 *;
 [X]US6620834  (TANIDA NORIFUMI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,10-14 * column 2, lines 24-60; claims 1,2 *;
 [X]WO2009140680  (ALS MOUNTAIN LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-8,10-14 * paragraphs [0012] , [0013] , [0051] - [0054] - [0066] , [0075] , [0082] , [0087]; claims 1.3-7 *
 [X]  - "Synergistic, anti-neoplastic composition for the treatment of cancerous tumors comprises arsenic and glutathione depleting compounds", DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2002, no. 75, Database accession no. 2002-695782, XP002593977 & KR20020026743 A 20020412 (LEW YOUNG SUK [KR]; NEWGENPHARM CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-8,10-14 * abstract *
Examination   - ZHANG S ET AL: "Liquid chromatography/tandem mass spectrometry method for simultaneous evaluation of activities of five cytochrome P450s using a five-drug cocktail and application to cytochrome P450 phenotyping studies in rats", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY B: BIOMEDICAL SCIENCES & APPLICATIONS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 871, no. 1, 1 August 2008 (2008-08-01), pages 78-89, XP023438102, ISSN: 1570-0232, DOI: 10.1016/J.JCHROMB.2008.06.034 [retrieved on 2008-06-27]

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jchromb.2008.06.034