Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2694241

EP2694241 - METHOD OF , SYSTEM AND COMPUTER PROGRAM FOR MACHINE CUTTING SEVERAL PARTS OF A PIECE OF MATERIAL USING CONTROLLING RULES AND VARIABLES FOR CUTTING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/07]METHOD OF, SYSTEM AND COMPUTER PROGRAM FOR MACHINE CUTTING SEVERAL PARTS OF A PIECE OF MATERIAL USING CONTROLLING RULES AND VARIABLES FOR CUTTING
[2017/04]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.05.2017
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  19.04.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.05.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tomologic AB
Scheelegatan 1
c/o Jordbruksverket 1tr
112 23 Stockholm / SE
[2014/07]
Inventor(s)01 / NORBERG OHLSSON, Magnus
Hällum Skogshagen
S-534 95 Vara / SE
 [2014/07]
Representative(s)Ehrner & Delmar Patentbyrå AB
Drottninggatan 33, plan 4
111 51 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2014/07]Lilliehorn, Tobias
Bergenstråhle & Lindvall AB
P.O. Box 17704
118 93 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date11713764.607.04.2011
WO2011EP55438
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012136262
Date:11.10.2012
Language:EN
[2012/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2694241
Date:12.02.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2012
[2014/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.10.2012
ClassificationInternational:B23K7/00, B23K9/013, B23K10/00, B23K26/38, B23K31/10, G05B19/4093, B26F3/00
[2014/07]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/07]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN, SYSTEM UND COMPUTERPROGRAMM ZUM MASCHINENSCHNEIDEN MEHRERER TEILE EINES MATERIALSTÜCKS MIT STEUERREGELN UND -VARIABLEN FÜR DAS SCHNEIDVERFAHREN[2014/07]
English:METHOD OF , SYSTEM AND COMPUTER PROGRAM FOR MACHINE CUTTING SEVERAL PARTS OF A PIECE OF MATERIAL USING CONTROLLING RULES AND VARIABLES FOR CUTTING[2017/22]
French:PROCÉDÉ, SYSTÈME ET PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR POUR UNE MACHINE QUI DÉCOUPE PLUSIEURS MORCEAUX DANS UNE PIÈCE DE MATIÈRE EN UTILISANT DES RÈGLES DE COMMANDE ET DES VARIABLES POUR LE DÉCOUPAGE[2014/07]
Former [2014/07]METHOD OF, SYSTEM AND COMPUTER PROGRAM FOR MACHINE CUTTING SEVERAL PARTS OF A PIECE OF MATERIAL USING CONTROLLING RULES AND VARIABLES FOR CUTTING
Entry into regional phase26.09.2013National basic fee paid 
26.09.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
26.09.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.01.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.09.2013Examination requested  [2014/07]
15.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.01.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.06.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.04.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
12.05.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.01.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
16.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
20.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
20.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
24.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
07.11.201303   M06   Fee paid on   18.12.2013
Stay/Interruption10.05.2017Stay of proceedings[2017/26]
Cited inInternational search[E]WO2011042058  (TOMOLOGIC AB [SE], et al) [E] 1-47 * abstract *;
 [A]DE3832215  (GUENZBURGER WERKZEUGMASCH [DE]) [A] 1-47 * column 4, lines 31-36; figure - *;
 [A]WO8403647  (STYNER & BIENZ AG [CH]) [A] 1-47 * page 4, lines 2-33; figure - *;
 [A]US2008053977  (YAMAZAKI TSUNEHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1,24,47 * paragraphs [0038] - [0045]; figure - *
 [I]  - RICHARD O ET AL, "RIMBAUDD SOFTWARE FOR AUTOMATIC PART POSITIONING AND CUTTING OPTIMIZATION", ALSTHOM REVIEW, ALSTHOM, PARIS, FR, (19870101), no. 7, pages 63 - 70, XP000112000 [I] 1-47 * the whole document *