Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2547697

EP2547697 - IMMUNE THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Database last updated on 20.01.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.07.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.12.2017(Expected) grantpublished on 03.01.2018  [2018/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vaxxit Srl
Via dei Valeri 1
00184 Roma / IT
[2013/04]
Inventor(s)01 / ENSOLI, Barbara
Via Capo Sottile 25
00139 Roma / IT
 [2013/04]
Representative(s)Zvesper, Thomas , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
[2018/01]
Former [2013/04]Lord, Hilton David
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date11714488.121.03.2011
[2018/01]
WO2011EP01606
Priority number, dateGB2010000465619.03.2010         Original published format: GB 201004656
[2013/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011113618
Date:22.09.2011
Language:EN
[2011/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2547697
Date:23.01.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2011
[2013/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2547697
Date:03.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.09.2011
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/16, A61K39/21
[2013/04]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/04]
Extension statesBA01.10.2012
ME01.10.2012
TitleGerman:IMMUNTHERAPIE[2013/04]
English:IMMUNE THERAPY[2013/04]
French:IMMUNOTHÉRAPIE[2013/04]
Entry into regional phase01.10.2012National basic fee paid 
01.10.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
01.10.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.10.2012Examination requested  [2013/04]
15.02.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.02.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
30.03.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.04.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
22.05.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.07.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.11.2017Fee for grant paid
22.11.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.11.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.02.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
12.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
10.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
10.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
10.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9817309  (UNIV ERASMUS [NL], et al) [X] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO2005039631  (IST SUPERIORE SANITA [IT], et al) [X] 1-18 * the whole document *
 [XDP]  - ENSOLI BARBARA ET AL, "Therapeutic Immunization with HIV-1 Tat Reduces Immune Activation and Loss of Regulatory T-Cells and Improves Immune Function in Subjects on HAART", PLOS ONE, (201011), vol. 5, no. 11, ISSN 1932-6203, XP002655158 [XDP] 1-18 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0013540
 [X]  - ENSOLI ET AL, "Vaccines based on the native HIV Tat protein and on the combination of Tat and the structural HIV protein variant DELTAV2 Env", MICROBES AND INFECTION, ELSEVIER, PARIS, FR, (20051101), vol. 7, no. 14, doi:DOI:10.1016/J.MICINF.2005.07.016, ISSN 1286-4579, pages 1392 - 1399, XP005171712 [X] 1-18 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.micinf.2005.07.016
 [XD]  - MAGGIORELLA M T ET AL, "Long-term protection against SHIV89.6P replication in HIV-1 Tat vaccinated cynomolgus monkeys", VACCINE, ELSEVIER LTD, GB, (20040903), vol. 22, no. 25-26, doi:DOI:10.1016/J.VACCINE.2004.03.009, ISSN 0264-410X, pages 3258 - 3269, XP004526899 [XD] 1-18 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2004.03.009
 [AD]  - MARIA J BUZÓN ET AL, "HIV-1 replication and immune dynamics are affected by raltegravir intensification of HAART-suppressed subjects", NATURE MEDICINE, (20100314), vol. 16, no. 4, doi:10.1038/nm.2111, ISSN 1078-8956, pages 460 - 465, XP055003596 [AD] 1-18 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm.2111
 [AD]  - ENSOLI B ET AL, "The preventive phase I trial with the HIV-1 Tat-based vaccine", VACCINE, ELSEVIER LTD, GB, vol. 28, no. 2, ISSN 0264-410X, (20091211), pages 371 - 378, (20091029), XP026791373 [AD] 1-18 * abstract *
 [AD]  - REZZA GIOVANNI ET AL, "The presence of anti-Tat antibodies is predictive of long-term nonprogression to AIDS or severe immunodeficiency: findings in a cohort of HIV-1 seroconverters.", THE JOURNAL OF INFECTIOUS DISEASES 15 APR 2005 LNKD- PUBMED:15776379, (20050415), vol. 191, no. 8, ISSN 0022-1899, pages 1321 - 1324, XP002655160 [AD] 1-18 * abstract *
 [XD]  - GAVIOLI ET AL, "The Tat protein broadens T cell responses directed to the HIV-1 antigens Gag and Env: Implications for the design of new vaccination strategies against AIDS", VACCINE, ELSEVIER LTD, GB, (20071204), vol. 26, no. 5, ISSN 0264-410X, pages 727 - 737, XP022419784 [XD] 1-18 * abstract *
by applicantUS2009142319
 WO2005090391
    - J. H. ARNSTEN, R. FREEMAN, A. A. HOWARD, M. FLORIS-MOORE, Y. LO, R. S. KLEIN, "Decreased bone mineral density and increased fracture risk in aging men with or at risk for HIV infection", AIDS, (2007), vol. 21, pages 617 - 623,
    - J. V. BAKER, G. PENG, J. RAPKIN, D. I. ABRAMS, M. J. SILVERBERG, R. D. MACARTHUR, W. P. CAVERT, W. K. HENRY, J. D. NEATON, "CD4+ count and risk of non-AIDS diseases following initial treatment for HIV infection", AIDS, (2008), vol. 22, pages 841 - 848,
    - M. BATTEGAY, R. NUESCH, B. HIRSCHEL, G. R. KAUFINANN, "Immunological recovery and antiretroviral therapy in HIV- infection", LANCET INFECT. DIS., (2006), vol. 6, doi:doi:10.1016/S1473-3099(06)70463-7, pages 280 - 287, XP024968743

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1473-3099(06)70463-7
    - A. BURGI, S. BRODINE, S. WEGNER, M. MILAZZO, M. R. WALLACE, K. SPOONER, D. L. BLAZES, B. K. AGAN, A. ARMSTRONG, S. FRASER, "Incidence and risk factors for the occurrence of non-AIDS-defining cancers among human immunodeficiency virus-infected individuals", CANCER, (2005), vol. 104, pages 1505 - 1511,
    - A. A. BYRNES, D. M. HARRIS, S. F. ATABANI, B. P. SABUNDAYO, S. J. LANGAN, J. B. MARGOLICK, C. L. KARP, "Immune activation and IL-12 production during acute/early HIV infection in the absence and presence of highly active, antiretroviral therapy", J LEUKOC. BIOL., (2008), vol. 84, pages 1447 - 1453,
    - J. CHEHIMI, L. AZZONI, M. FARABAUGH, S. A. CREER, C. TOMESCU, A. HANCOCK, A. MACKIEWICZ, L. D'ALESSANDRO, S. GHANEKAR, A. S. FOULK, "Baseline viral load and immune activation determine the extent of reconstitution of innate immune effectors in HIV-1-infected subjects undergoing antiretroviral treatment", J IMMUNOL., (2007), vol. 179, pages 2642 - 2650,
    - S. G. DEEKS, A. N. PHILLIPS, "HIV infection, antiretroviral treatment, ageing, and non-AIDS related morbidity", BMJ, (2009), vol. 338, page A3172,
    - L. DESQUILBET, L. P. JACOBSON, L. P. FRIED, J. P. PHAIR, B. D. JAMIESON, M. HOLLOWAY, J. B. MARGOLICK, "HIV-1 infection is associated with an earlier occurrence of a phenotype related to frailty", J GERONTOL. A BIOL. SCI. MED. SCI., (2007), vol. 62, pages 1279 - 1286,
    - R. B. EFFROS, C. V. FLETCHER, K. GEBO, J. B. HALTER, W. R. HAZZARD, F. M. HORNE, R. E. HUEBNER, E. N. JANOFF, A. C. JUSTICE, D. KU, "Aging and infectious diseases: workshop on HIV infection and aging: what is known and future research directions", CLIN. INFECT. DIS., (2008), vol. 47, pages 542 - 553,
    - L. GIL, G. MARTINEZ, I. GONZALEZ, A. TARINAS, A. ALVAREZ, A. GIULIANI, R. MOLINA, R. TAPANES, J. PEREZ, O. S. LEON, "Contribution to characterisation of oxidative stress in HIV/AIDS patients", PHARMACOL. RES., (2003), vol. 47, pages 217 - 224,
    - D. K. GLENCROSS, G. JANOSSY, L. M. COETZEE, D. LAWRIE, L. E. SCOTT, I. SANNE, J. A. MCINTYRE, W. STEVENS, "CD8/CD38 activation yields important clinical information of effective antiretroviral therapy: findings from the first year of the CIPRA-SA cohort", CYTOMETRY B CLIN. CYTOM., (2008), vol. 74, no. 1, pages S131 - S140,
    - S. K. GRINSPOON, C. GRUNFELD, D. P. KOTLER, J. S. CURRIER, J. D. LUNDGREN, M. P. DUBE, S. E. LIPSHULTZ, P. Y. HSUE, K. SQUIRES, M., "State of the science conference: Initiative to decrease cardiovascular risk and increase quality of care for patients living with HIV/AIDS: executive summary", CIRCULATION, (2008), vol. 118, pages 198 - 210,
    - M. D. HAZENBERG, S. A. OTTO, B. H. VAN BENTHEM, M. T. ROOS, R. A. COUTINHO, J. M. LANGE, D. HAMANN, M. PRINS, F. MIEDEMA, "Persistent immune activation in HIV-1 infection is associated with progression to AIDS", AIDS, (2003), vol. 17, pages 1881 - 1888,
    - P. Y. HSUE, K. GIRI, S. ERICKSON, J. S. MACGREGOR, N. YOUNES, A. SHERGILL, D. D. WATERS, "Clinical features of acute coronary syndromes in patients with human immunodeficiency virus infection", CIRCULATION, (2004), vol. 109, pages 316 - 319,
    - P. W. HUNT, J. N. MARTIN, E. SINCLAIR, B. BREDT, E. HAGOS, H. LAMPIRIS, S. G. DEEKS, "T cell activation is associated with lower CD4+ T cell gains in human immunodeficiency virus-infected patients with sustained viral suppression during antiretroviral therapy", J. INFECT. DIS., (2003), vol. 187, pages 1534 - 1543,
    - P. W. HUNT, "Role of immune activation in HIV pathogenesis", CURR. HIV. /AIDS REP., (2007), vol. 4, pages 42 - 47,
    - C. F. KELLEY, C. M. KITCHEN, P. W. HUNT, B. RODRIGUEZ, F. M. HECHT, M. KITAHATA, H. M. CRANE, J. WILLIG, M. MUGAVERO, M. SAAG, "Incomplete peripheral CD4+ cell count restoration in HIV-infected patients receiving long-term antiretroviral treatment", CLIN. INFECT. DIS., (2009), vol. 48, pages 787 - 794,
    - G. D. KIRK, C. MERLO, P. 0' DRISCOLL, S. H. MEHTA, N. GALAI, D. VLAHOV, J. SAMET, E. A. ENGELS, "HIV infection is associated with an increased risk for lung cancer, independent of smoking", CLIN. INFECT. DIS., (2007), vol. 45, pages 103 - 110,
    - A. MONFORTE, D. ABRAMS, C. PRADIER, R. WEBER, P. REISS, F. BONNET, O. KIRK, M. LAW, W. S. DE, N. FRIIS-MOLLER, "HIV-induced immunodeficiency and mortality from AIDS-defining and non-AIDS-defining malignancies", AIDS, (2008), vol. 22, pages 2143 - 2153,
    - M. C. ODDEN, R. SCHERZER, P. BACCHETTI, L. A. SZCZECH, S. SIDNEY, C. GRUNFELD, M. G. SHLIPAK, "Cystatin C level as a marker of kidney function in human immunodeficiency virus infection: the FRAM study", ARCH. INTERN. MED., (2007), vol. 167, pages 2213 - 2219,
    - D. E. SMITH, B. D. WALKER, D. A. COOPER, E. S. ROSENBERG, J. M. KALDOR, "Is antiretroviral treatment of primary HIV infection clinically justified on the basis of current evidence?", AIDS, (2004), vol. 18, pages 709 - 718,
    - H. VALDEZ, E. CONNICK, K. Y. SMITH, M. M. LEDERMAN, R. J. BOSCH, R. S. KIM, C. M. ST, D. R. KURITZKES, H. KESSLER, L. FOX, "Limited immune restoration after 3 years' suppression of HIV-1 replication in patients with moderately advanced disease", AIDS, (2002), vol. 16, pages 1859 - 1866,
    - R. WEBER, C. A. SABIN, N. FRIIS-MOLLER, P. REISS, W. M. EL-SADR, O. KIRK, F. DABIS, M. G. LAW, C. PRADIER, W. S. DE, "Liver-related deaths in persons infected with the human immunodeficiency virus: the D:A:D study", ARCH. INTERN. MED., (2006), vol. 166, pages 1632 - 1641,
    - ZHU T, MUTHUI D, HOLTE S, NICKLE D, FENG F ET AL., "Evidence for human immunodeficiency virus type 1 replication in vivo in CD14(+) monocytes and its potential role as a source of virus in patients on highly active antiretroviral therapy", J VIROL, (2002), vol. 76, pages 707 - 716,
    - LAMBOTTE 0, TAOUFIK Y, DE GOER MG, WALLON C, GOUJARD C ET AL., "Detection of infectious HIV in circulating monocytes from patients on prolonged highly active antiretroviral therapy", J ACQUIR IMMUNE DEFIC SYNDR, (2000), vol. 23, pages 114 - 119,
    - KELLY J, BEDDALL MH, YU D, IYER SR, MARSH JW ET AL., "Human macrophages support persistent transcription from unintegrated HIV-1 DNA", VIROLOGY, (2008), vol. 372, doi:doi:10.1016/j.virol.2007.11.007, pages 300 - 312, XP022496347

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.virol.2007.11.007
    - WU Y, MARSH JW, "Selective transcription and modulation of resting T cell activity by preintegrated HIV DNA", SCIENCE, (2001), vol. 293, pages 1503 - 1506,
    - LASSEN KG, BAILEY JR, SILICIANO RF, "Analysis of human immunodeficiency virus type 1 transcriptional elongation in resting CD4+ T cells in vivo", J VIROL, (2004), vol. 78, pages 9105 - 9114,
    - LASSEN KG, RAMYAR KX, BAILEY JR, ZHOU Y, SILICIANO RF, "Nuclear retention of multiply spliced HIV-1 RNA in resting CD4+ T cells", PLOS PATHOG, (2006), vol. 2, page E68,
    - FURTADO MR, CALLAWAY DS, PHAIR JP, KUNSTMAN KJ, STANTON JL ET AL., "Persistence of HIV-1 transcription in peripheral-blood mononuclear cells in patients receiving potent antiretroviral therapy", N ENGL J MED, (1999), vol. 340, pages 1614 - 1622,
    - ZHANG L, RAMRATNAM B, TENNER-RACZ K, HE Y, VESANEN M ET AL., "Quantifying residual HIV-1 replication in patients receiving combination antiretroviral therapy", N ENGL J MED, (1999), vol. 340, pages 1605 - 1613,
    - NATARAJAN V, BOSCHE M, METCALF JA, WARD DJ, LANE HC ET AL., "HIV-1 replication in patients with undetectable plasma virus receiving HAART. Highly active antiretroviral therapy", LANCET, (1999), vol. 353, pages 119 - 120,
    - WU Y, MARSH JW, "Early transcription from nonintegrated DNA in human immunodeficiency virus infection", J VIROL, (2003), vol. 77, pages 10376 - 10382,
    - DEEKS SG, "Immune dysfunction, inflammation, and accelerated aging in patients on antiretroviral therapy", TOP HIV MED, (2009), vol. 17, pages 118 - 123,
    - MARGOLIS D.M., "Eradication therapies for HIV infection: time to begin again", AIDS RES HUM RETROVIRUSES, (2011),
    - N. CHOMONT, M. EL-FAR, P. ANCUTA, L. TRAUTMANN, F. A. PROCOPIO, B. YASSINE-DIAB, G. BOUCHER, M.R. BOULASSEL, G. GHATTAS, J.M. BREN, "HIV reservoir size and persistence are driven by T cell survival and homeostatic proliferation", NAT MED., (2009), vol. 15, pages 893 - 900,
    - M.J. BUZON, M. MASSANELLA, J.M. LLIBRE, A. ESTEVE, V. DAHL, M.C. PUERTAS, J.M. GATELL, P. DOMINGO, R. PAREDES, M. SHARKEY, "HIV-1 replication and immune dynamics are affected by raltegravir intensification of HAART-suppressed subjects", NAT MED., (2010), vol. 16, doi:doi:10.1038/nm.2111, pages 460 - 5, XP055003596

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm.2111
    - JAVIER MARTINEZ-PICADO, "HIV- I Replication and Immune Dynamics Are Impacted by Raltegravir Intensification ofHAART-suppressed Patients", CROI, (2010),
    - E.H. GRAF, A.M. MEXAS, J,J. YU, F. SHAHEEN, M.K. LISZEWSKI, M. DI MASCIO, S.A. MIGUELES, M. CONNORS, O'DOHERTY U, "Elite Suppressors Harbor Low Levels of Integrated HIV DNA and High Levels of 2-LTR Circular HIV DNA Compared to HIV+ Patients On and Off HAART", PLOS PATHOG., (2011), vol. 7, page E1001300,
    - D. D. RICHMAN, D. M. MARGOLIS, M. DELANEY, W. C. GREENE, D. HAZUDA, R. J. POMERANTZ, "The challenge of finding a cure for HIV infection", SCIENCE, (2009), vol. 323, doi:doi:10.1126/science.1165706, pages 1304 - 1307, XP009159902

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1165706
    - D. L. BIRX, R. R. REDFIELD, K. TENCER, A. FOWLER, D. S. BURKE, G. TOSATO, "Induction of interleukin-6 during human immunodeficiency virus infection", BLOOD, (1990), vol. 76, pages 2303 - 2310,
    - D. EMILIE, M. PEUCHMAUR, M. C. MAILLOT, M. C. CREVON, N. BROUSSE, J. F. DELFRAISSY, J. DORMONT, P. GALANAUD, "Production of interleukins in human immunodeficiency virus-1-replicating lymph nodes", J. CLIN. INVEST, (1990), vol. 86, pages 148 - 159,
    - T. MATSUYAMA, N. KOBAYASHI, N. YAMAMOTO, "Cytokines and HIV infection: is AIDS a tumor necrosis factor disease?", AIDS, (1991), vol. 5, pages 1405 - 1417,
    - L. WEISS, N. HAEFFNER-CAVAILLON, M. LAUDE, J. GILQUIN, M. D. KAZATCHKINE, "HIV infection is associated with the spontaneous production of interleukin-1 (IL-1) in vivo and with an abnormal release of IL-1 alpha in vitro", AIDS, (1989), vol. 3, pages 695 - 699,
    - M. W. HULL, V. D. LIMA, R. S. HOGG, P. R. HARRIGAN, J. S. MONTANER, "Epidemiology of treatment failure: a focus on recent trends", CURR. OPIN. HIV. AIDS, (2009), vol. 4, pages 467 - 473,
    - P. W. HUNT, S. G. DEEKS, D. R. BANGSBERG, A. MOSS, E. SINCLAIR, T. LIEGLER, M. BATES, G. TSAO, H. LAMPIRIS, R. HOH, "The independent effect of drug resistance on T cell activation in HIV infection", AIDS, (2006), vol. 20, pages 691 - 699,
    - L. E. JONES, A. S. PERELSON, "Transient viremia, plasma viral load, and reservoir replenishment in HIV-infected patients on antiretroviral therapy", J. ACQUIR. IMMUNE. DEFIC. SYNDR., (2007), vol. 45, pages 483 - 493,
    - R. E. NETTLES, T. L. KIEFFER, "Update on HIV-1 viral load blips", CURR. OPIN. HIV. AIDS, (2006), vol. 1, pages 157 - 161,
    - S. PALMER, F. MALDARELLI, A. WIEGAND, B. BERNSTEIN, G. J. HANNA, S. C. BRUN, D. J. KEMPF, J. W. MELLORS, J. M. COFFIN, M. S. KING, "Low-level viremia persists for at least 7 years in patients on suppressive antiretroviral therapy", PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. U S. A, (2008), vol. 105, pages 3879 - 3884,
    - G. BARILLARI, L. BUONAGURO, V. FIORELLI, J. HOFFINAN, F. MICHAELS, R. C. GALLO, B. ENSOLI, "Effects of cytokines from activated immune cells on vascular cell growth and HIV-1 gene expression. Implications for AIDS-Kaposi's sarcoma pathogenesis", J. IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 149, pages 3727 - 3734,
    - L. BUONAGURO, G. BARILLARI, H. K. CHANG, C. A. BOHAN, V. KAO, R. MORGAN, R. C. GALLO, B. ENSOLI, "Effects of the human immunodeficiency virus type 1 Tat protein on the expression of inflammatory cytokines", J VIROL., (1992), vol. 66, pages 7159 - 7167,
    - L. BUONAGURO, F. M. BUONAGURO, G. GIRALDO, B. ENSOLI, "The human immunodeficiency virus type 1 Tat protein transactivates tumor necrosis factor beta gene expression through a TAR-like structure", J VIROL., (1994), vol. 68, pages 2677 - 2682,
    - H. K. CHANG, R. C. GALLO, B. ENSOLI, "Regulation of Cellular Gene Expression and Function by the Human Immunodeficiency Virus Type 1 Tat Protein", J BIOMED SCI., (1995), vol. 2, pages 189 - 202,
    - L. HOUZET, Z. MORICHAUD, M. MOUGEL, "Fully-spliced HIV-1 RNAs are reverse transcribed with similar efficiencies as the genomic RNA in virions and cells, but more efficiently in AZT-treated cells", RETROVIROLOGY, vol. 4, pages 30 - 2007,
    - C. LIANG, J. HU, R. S. RUSSELL, M. KAMEOKA, M. A. WAINBERG, "Spliced human immunodeficiency virus type 1 RNA is reverse transcribed into cDNA within infected cells", AIDS RES. HUM. RETROVIRUSES, (2004), vol. 20, pages 203 - 211,
    - S. G. DEEKS, "Immune dysfunction, inflammation, and accelerated aging in patients on antiretroviral therapy", TOP. HIV MED, (2009), vol. 17, pages 118 - 123,
    - B. ENSOLI, S. BELLINO, A. TRIPICIANO, O. LONGO, V. FRANCAVILLA, S. MARCOTULLIO, A. CAFARO, O. PICCONI, G. PANICCIA, A. SCOGLIO, "Therapeutic Immunization with HIV-1 Tat Reduces Immune Activation and Loss of Regulatory T-Cells and Improves Immune Function in Subjects on HAART", PLOS ONE, (2010), vol. 5, page E13540,
    - Y. ARIUMI, F. SERHAN, P. TURELLI, A. TELENTI, TRONO D, "The integrase interactor 1 (INI1) proteins facilitate Tat-mediated human immunodeficiency virus type 1 transcription", RETROVIROLOGY, (2006), vol. 3, doi:doi:10.1186/1742-4690-3-47, page 47, XP021019157

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1742-4690-3-47
    - GATHE, J., DIAZ, R., FATKENHEUER, G., ZEINECKER, J., MAK, C., VILCHEZ, R., GREAVES, W., KUMAR, S., ONYEBUCHI, C., DUNKLE, L., "Phase 3 Trials of Vicriviroc in Treatment-experienced Subjects Demonstrate Safety but Not Significantly Superior Efficacy over Potent Background Regimens Alone", ABSTRACT FROM THE 17TH CONFERENCE ON RETROVIRUSES AND OPPORTUNISTIC INFECTIONS, (2010),
    - TIMOTHY, W., LALAMA, C., TENORIO, A., LANDAY, A., RIBAUDO, H., MCKINNON, J., GANDHI, R., MELLORS, J., CURRIER, J., GULICK, R., "Maraviroc Intensification for Suboptimal CD4+ Cell Response Despite Sustained Virologic Suppression: ACTG 5256", ABSTRACT FROM THE 17TH CONFERENCE ON RETROVIRUSES AND OPPORTUNISTIC INFECTIONS, (2010),
    - WILKIN, T. ET AL., MARAVIROC INTENSIFICATION FOR SUBOPTIMAL CD4+ CELL RESPONSE DESPITE SUSTAINED VIROLOGIC SUPPRESSION: ACTG 5256, (20100225),
    - M. A. KOLBER, "CD38+CD8+ T-cells negatively correlate with CD4 central memory cells in virally suppressed HIV-1-infected individuals", AIDS, (2008), vol. 22, pages 1937 - 1941,
    - S. J. POTTER, C. LACABARATZ, O. LAMBOTTE, S. PEREZ-PATRIGEON, B. VINGERT, M. SINET, J. H. COLLE, A. URRUTIA, D. SCOTT-ALGARA, F. B, "Preserved central memory and activated effector memory CD4+ T-cell subsets in human immunodeficiency virus controllers: an ANRS EP36 study", J. VIROL., (2007), vol. 81, pages 13904 - 13915,
    - WANG FX, XU Y, SULLIVAN J, SOUDER E, ARGYRIS EG, ACHEAMPONG EA, FISHER J, SIERRA M, THOMSON MM, NAJERA R, "Pomerantz RJ, Nunnari G. IL-7 is a potent and proviral strain-specific inducer of latent HIV-1 cellular reservoirs of infected individuals on virally suppressive HAART", J CLIN INVEST., (2005), vol. 115, pages 128 - 37,
    - H. IMAMICHI, G. DEGRAY, D.M. ASMUTH, M.A. FISCHL, A.L. LANDAY, M.M. LEDERMAN, I. SERETI., "HIV-1 viruses detected during episodic blips following interleukin-7 administration are similar to the viruses present before and after interleukin-7 therapy", AIDS, (2011), vol. 25, pages 159 - 64,
    - T.J. FRY, C.L. MACKALL, "Interleukin-7: master regulator of peripheral T-cell homeostasis?", TRENDS IMMUNOL., (2001), vol. 22, doi:doi:10.1016/S1471-4906(01)02028-2, pages 564 - 71, XP004357505

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1471-4906(01)02028-2
    - R. MAZZUCCHELLI, J.A. HIXON, R. SPOLSKI, X. CHEN, W.Q. LI, V.L. HALL, J. WILLETTE-BROWN, A.A. HURWITZ, W.J. LEONARD, S.K. DURUM, "Development of regulatory T cells requires IL-7Ralpha stimulation by IL-7 or TSLP", BLOOD, (2008), vol. 112, doi:doi:10.1182/BLOOD-2008-02-137414, pages 3283 - 3292, XP002512470

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/BLOOD-2008-02-137414
    - B. RETHI, C. FLUUR, A. ATLAS, M. KRZYZOWSKA, F. MOWAFI, S. GRüTZMEIER, A. DE MILITO, R. BELLOCCO, KI FALK, E RAJNAVOLGYI, "Loss of IL-7Ralpha is associated with CD4 T-cell depletion, high interleukin-7 levels and CD28 down-regulation in HIV infected patients", AIDS, (2005), vol. 19, pages 2077 - 2086,
    - S.A. KOESTERS, J.B. ALIMONTI, C. WACHIHI, L. MATU, O. ANZALA, J. KIMANI, J.E. EMBREE, F.A. PLUMMER, "IL-7Ralpha expression on CD4+ T lymphocytes decreases with HIV disease progression and inversely correlates with immune activation", EUR J IMMUNOL., (2006), vol. 36, pages 336 - 444,
    - HO J, MOIR S, MALASPINA A, HOWELL ML, WANG W, DIPOTO AC, O'SHEA MA, ROBY GA, KWAN R, MICAN JM, "Two overrepresented B cell populations in HIV-infected individuals undergo apoptosis by different mechanisms", PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. U S A., (2006), vol. 103, pages 19436 - 41,
    - E. FALLER, J. KAKAL, R. KUMAR, P. MACPHERSON, "IL-7 and the HIV Tat protein act synergistically todown-regulate CD127 expression on CD8 T cells", INT IMMUNOL., (2009), vol. 21, pages 203 - 16,
    - M. A. CUROTTO DE LAFAILLE, J. J. LAFAILLE, "Natural and adaptive foxp3+ regulatory T cells: more of the same or a division of labor?", IMMUNITY, (2009), vol. 30, doi:doi:10.1016/j.immuni.2009.05.002, pages 626 - 635, XP055233361

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.immuni.2009.05.002
    - B. T. ROUSE, P. P. SARANGI, S. SUVAS, "Regulatory T cells in virus infections", IMMUNOL. REV., (2006), vol. 212, pages 272 - 286,
    - S. ABGRALL, C. RABAUD, D. COSTAGLIOLA, "Clinical Epidemiology Group of the French Hospital Database on HIV., Incidence and risk factors for toxoplasmic encephalitis in HIV-infected patients before and during the HAART era", CLIN INFECT DIS, (2001), vol. 33, pages 1747 - 1755,
    - BONNET F C. LEWDEN, T. MAY, L. HERIPRET, E. JOUGLA, S. BEVILACQUA, D. COSTAGLIOLA, D. SALMON, G. CHENE, P. MORLAT, "Mortalite 2000 Study Group. Opportunistic Infections as causes of death in HIV-infected patients in the HAART era in France", SCAND J INFECT DIS, (2005), vol. 37, pages 482 - 487,
    - C. HOFFMANN, M. ERNST, P. MEYER, E. WOLF, T. ROSENKRANZ, A. PLETTENBERG, A. STOEHR, H.A. HORST, K. MARIENFELD, C. LANGE, "Evolving characteristics of toxoplasmosis in patients infected with human immunodeficiency virus-1: clinical course and Toxoplasma gondii-specific immune responses", CLIN MICROBIOL INFECT., (2007), vol. 13, pages 510 - 5,
    - FURCO A, CARMAGNAT M, CHEVRET S, GARIN YJ, PAVIE J, DE CASTRO N, CHARRON D, DEROUIN F, RABIAN C, MOLINA JM, "Restoration of Toxoplasma gondii-specific immune responses in patients with AIDS starting HAART", AIDS, (20071218), vol. 22, no. 16, pages 2087 - 96,
    - H. C. CHANG, F. SAMANIEGO, B. C. NAIR, L. BUONAGURO, B. ENSOLI, "HIV-1 Tat protein exits from cells via a leaderless secretory pathway and binds to extracellular matrix-associated heparan sulfate proteoglycans through its basic region", AIDS, (1997), vol. 11, pages 1421 - 1431, XP002364046
    - B. ENSOLI, G. BARILLARI, NATURE, (1990), vol. 345, pages 84 - 86,
    - B. ENSOLI, L. BUONAGURO, G. BARILLARI, V. FIORELLI, R. GENDELMAN, R. A. MORGAN, P. WINGFIELD, R. C. GALLO, "Release, uptake, and effects of extracellular human immunodeficiency virus type 1 Tat protein on cell growth and viral transactivation", J. VIROL., (1993), vol. 67, pages 277 - 287, XP000946397
    - B. ENSOLI, R. GENDELMAN, P. MARKHAM, V. FIORELLI, S. COLOMBINI, M. RAFFELD, A. CAFARO, H. K. CHANG, J. N. BRADY, R. C. GALLO, "Synergy between basic fibroblast growth factor and HIV-1 Tat protein in induction of Kaposi's sarcoma", NATURE, (1994), vol. 371, pages 674 - 680,
    - G. GOLDSTEIN, "HIV-1 Tat protein as a potential AIDS vaccine", NAT. MED., (1996), vol. 2, doi:doi:10.1038/nm0996-960, pages 960 - 964, XP002129594

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm0996-960
    - F. RAYNE, S. DEBAISIEUX, H. YEZID, Y. L. LIN, C. METTLING, K. KONATE, N. CHAZAL, S. T. AROLD, M. PUGNIERE, F. SANCHEZ, "Phosphatidylinositol-(4,5)-bisphosphate enables efficient secretion of HIV-1 Tat by infected T-cells", EMBO J, (2010),
    - E. TOSCHI, G. BARILLARI, C. SGADARI, I. BACIGALUPO, A. CERESETO, D. CARLEI, C. PALLADINO, C. ZIETZ, P. LEONE, M. STURZL, "Activation of matrix- metalloproteinase-2 and membrane-type-1-matrix-metalloproteinase in endothelial cells and induction of vascular permeability in vivo by human immunodeficiency virus-1 Tat protein and basic fibroblast growth factor", MOL. BIOL. CELL, (2001), vol. 12, pages 2934 - 2946,
    - Y. WU, J. W. MARSH, "Selective transcription and modulation of resting T cell activity by preintegrated HIV DNA", SCIENCE, (2001), vol. 293, pages 1503 - 1506,
    - M. C. RE, M. VIGNOLI, G. FURLINI, D. GIBELLINI, V. COLANGELI, F. VITONE, P. M. LA, "Antibodies against full-length Tat protein and some low-molecular-weight Tat-peptides correlate with low or undetectable viral load in HIV-1 seropositive patients", J. CLIN. VIROL., (2001), vol. 21, pages 81 - 89,
    - P. REISS, J. M. LANGE, R. A. DE, W. F. DE, J. DEKKER, C. DEBOUCK, J. GOUDSMIT, "Speed of progression to AIDS and degree of antibody response to accessory gene products of HIV-1", J MED. VIROL., (1990), vol. 30, pages 163 - 168,
    - G. REZZA, V. FIORELLI, M. DORRUCCI, M. CICCOZZI, A. TRIPICIANO, A. SCOGLIO, B. COLLACCHI, M. RUIZ-ALVAREZ, C. GIANNETTO, A. CAPUTO, "The presence of anti-Tat antibodies is predictive of long-term nonprogression to AIDS or severe immunodeficiency: findings in a cohort of HIV- seroconverters", J INFECT. DIS., (2005), vol. 191, pages 1321 - 1324, XP002655160
    - T. C. RODMAN, S. E. TO, H. HASHISH, K. MANCHESTER, "Epitopes for natural antibodies of human immunodeficiency virus (HIV)-negative (normal) and HIV-positive sera are coincident with two key functional sequences of HIV Tat protein", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U S. A, (1993), vol. 90, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.90.16.7719, pages 7719 - 7723, XP002073182

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.90.16.7719
    - J. F. ZAGURY, A. SILL, W. BLATTNER, A. LACHGAR, B. H. LE, M. RICHARDSON, J. RAPPAPORT, H. HENDEL, B. BIZZINI, A. GRINGERI, "Antibodies to the HIV-1 Tat protein correlated with nonprogression to AIDS: a rationale for the use of Tat toxoid as an HIV- vaccine", J HUM. VIROL., (1998), vol. 1, pages 282 - 292, XP002923455
    - S. BUTTO, V. FIORELLI, A. TRIPICIANO, M. J. RUIZ-ALVAREZ, A. SCOGLIO, F. ENSOLI, M. CICCOZZI, B. COLLACCHI, M. SABBATUCCI, A. CAFA, "Sequence conservation and antibody cross-recognition of clade B human immunodeficiency virus (HIV) type 1 Tat protein in HIV-1-infected Italians, Ugandans, and South Africans", J. INFECT. DIS., (2003), vol. 188, pages 1171 - 1180, XP002604150
    - P. REISS, W. F. DE, C. L. KUIKEN, R. A. DE, J. DEKKER, C. A. BOUCHER, C. DEBOUCK, J. M. LANGE, J. GOUDSMIT, "Contribution of antibody response to recombinant HIV-1 gene-encoded products nef, rev, tat, and protease in predicting development of AIDS in HIV-1-infected individuals", J ACQUIR. IMMUNE. DEFIC. SYNDR., (1991), vol. 4, pages 165 - 172, XP008012586
    - E. FANALES-BELASIO, S. MORETTI, F. NAPPI, G. BARILLARI, F. MICHELETTI, A. CAFARO, B. ENSOLI, "Native HIV-1 Tat protein targets monocyte-derived dendritic cells and enhances their maturation, function, and antigen-specific T cell responses", J. IMMUNOL., (2002), vol. 168, pages 197 - 206,
    - E. FANALES-BELASIO, S. MORETTI, V. FIORELLI, A. TRIPICIANO, M. R. PAVONE COSSUT, A. SCOGLIO, B. COLLACCHI, F. NAPPI, I. MACCHIA, S, "HIV-1 Tat addresses dendritic cells to induce a predominant Thl-type adaptive immune response that appears prevalent in the asymptomatic stage of infection", J. IMMUNOL., (2009), vol. 182, pages 2888 - 2897,
    - T. M. ALLEN, D. H. O'CONNOR, P. JING, J. L. DZURIS, B. R. MOTHE, T. U. VOGEL, E. DUNPHY, M. E. LIEBL, C. EMERSON, N. WILSON, "Tat-specific cytotoxic T lymphocytes select for SIV escape variants during resolution of primary viraemia", NATURE, (2000), vol. 407, doi:doi:10.1038/35036559, pages 386 - 390, XP002186658

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/35036559
    - D. H. O'CONNOR, T. M. ALLEN, T. U. VOGEL, P. JING, I. P. DESOUZA, E. DODDS, E. J. DUNPHY, C. MELSAETHER, B. MOTHE, H. YAMAMOTO, "Acute phase cytotoxic T lymphocyte escape is a hallmark of simian immunodeficiency virus infection", NAT. MED., (2002), vol. 8, pages 493 - 499,
    - M. C. RE, G. FURLINI, M. VIGNOLI, E. RAMAZZOTTI, G. RODERIGO, R. DE, V, G. ZAULI, S. LOLLI, S. CAPITANI, P. M. LA, "Effect of antibody to HIV-1 Tat protein on viral replication in vitro and progression of HIV-1 disease in vivo", J. ACQUIR. IMMUNE. DEFIC. SYNDR. HUM. RETROVIROL., (1995), vol. 10, pages 408 - 416,
    - C. A. VAN BAALEN, O. PONTESILLI, R. C. HUISMAN, A. M. GERETTI, M. R. KLEIN, W. F. DE, F. MIEDEMA, R. A. GRUTERS, A. D. OSTERHAUS, "Human immunodeficiency virus type 1 Rev- and Tat-specific cytotoxic T lymphocyte frequencies inversely correlate with rapid progression to AIDS", J. GEN. VIROL., (1997), vol. 78, pages 1913 - 1918, XP002112914
    - A. VENET, I. BOURGAULT, A. M. AUBERTIN, M. P. KIENY, J. P. LEVY, "Cytotoxic T lymphocyte response against multiple simian immunodeficiency virusA (SIV) proteins in SIV-infected macaques", J IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 148, pages 2899 - 2908,
    - B. ENSOLI, V. FIORELLI, F. ENSOLI, A. CAFARO, F. TITTI, S. BUTTO, P. MONINI, M. MAGNANI, A. CAPUTO, E. GARACI, "Candidate HIV-1 Tat vaccine development: from basic science to clinical trials", AIDS, (2006), vol. 20, pages 2245 - 2261,
    - R. GAVIOLI, E. GALLERANI, C. FORTINI, M. FABRIS, A. BOTTONI, A. CANELLA, A. BONACCORSI, M. MARASTONI, F. MICHELETTI, A. CAFARO, "HIV-1 tat protein modulates the generation of cytotoxic T cell epitopes by modifying proteasome composition and enzymatic activity", J. IMMUNOL., (2004), vol. 173, pages 3838 - 3843,
    - R. GAVIOLI, S. CELLINI, A. CASTALDELLO, R. VOLTAN, E. GALLERANI, F. GAGLIARDONI, C. FORTINI, E. B. COFANO, C. TRIULZI, A. CAFARO, "The Tat protein broadens T cell responses directed to the HIV-1 antigens Gag and Env: implications for the design of new vaccination strategies against AIDS", VACCINE, (2008), vol. 26, pages 727 - 737,
    - A. L. REMOLI, G. MARSILI, E. PERROTTI, E. GALLERANI, R. ILARI, F. NAPPI, A. CAFARO, B. ENSOLI, R. GAVIOLI, A. BATTISTINI, "Intracellular HIV-1 Tat protein represses constitutive LMP2 transcription increasing proteasome activity by interfering with the binding of IRF-1 to STATl", BIOCHEM. J, (2006), vol. 396, pages 371 - 380,
    - B. LEE, M. SHARRON, C. BLANPAIN, B. J. DORANZ, J. VAKILI, P. SETOH, E. BERG, G. LIU, H. R. GUY, S. R. DURELL, "Epitope mapping of CCR5 reveals multiple conformational states and distinct but overlapping structures involved in chemokine and coreceptor function", J. BIOL. CHEM., (1999), vol. 274, doi:doi:10.1074/jbc.274.14.9617, pages 9617 - 9626, XP002944587

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.274.14.9617
    - A. BORSETTI, S. BARONCELLI, M. T. MAGGIORELLA, S. MORETTI, E. FANALES-BELASIO, L. SERNICOLA, A. TRIPICIANO, I. MACCHIA, Z. MICHELI, "Containment of infection in tat vaccinated monkeys after rechallenge with a higher dose of SHIV89.6P(cy243)", VIRAL IMMUNOL., (2009), vol. 22, pages 117 - 124,
    - A. CAFARO, A. CAPUTO, C. FRACASSO, M. T. MAGGIORELLA, D. GOLETTI, S. BARONCELLI, M. PACE, L. SEMICOLA, M. L. KOANGA-MOGTOMO, M. BE, "Control of SHIV-89.6P-infection of cynomolgus monkeys by HIV-1 Tat protein vaccine", NAT. MED., (1999), vol. 5, doi:doi:10.1038/9488, pages 643 - 650, XP002254323

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/9488
    - A. CAFARO, A. CAPUTO, M. T. MAGGIORELLA, S. BARONCELLI, C. FRACASSO, M. PACE, A. BORSETTI, L. SERNICOLA, D. R. NEGRI, H. P. TEN, "SHIV89.6P pathogenicity in cynomolgus monkeys and control of viral replication and disease onset by human immunodeficiency virus type 1 Tat vaccine", J MED PRIMATOL., (2000), vol. 29, pages 193 - 208,
    - A. CAFARO, F. TITTI, C. FRACASSO, M. T. MAGGIORELLA, S. BARONCELLI, A. CAPUTO, D. GOLETTI, A. BORSETTI, M. PACE, E. FANALES-BELASI, "Vaccination with DNA containing tat coding sequences and unmethylated CpG motifs protects cynomolgus monkeys upon infection with simian/human immunodeficiency virus (SHIV89.6P)", VACCINE, (2001), vol. 19, doi:doi:10.1016/S0264-410X(01)00002-0, pages 2862 - 2877, XP004231802

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0264-410X(01)00002-0
    - M. T. MAGGIORELLA, S. BARONCELLI, Z. MICHELINI, E. FANALES-BELASIO, S. MORETTI, L. SEMICOLA, A. CARA, D. R. NEGRI, S. BUTTO, V. FI, "Long-term protection against SHIV89.6P replication in HIV-1 Tat vaccinated cynomolgus monkeys", VACCINE, (2004), vol. 22, doi:doi:10.1016/j.vaccine.2004.03.009, pages 3258 - 3269, XP004526899

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2004.03.009
    - A. CAFARO, S. BELLINO, F. TITTI, M.T. MAGGIORELLA, L. SERNICOLA, W.R. WISEMAN, D. VENSON, A. J. KARL., D. O'CONNOR, P. MONINI, "Impact of Viral Dose and Major Histocompatibility Complex Class IB Haplotype on Viral Outcome in Tat-vaccinated MauritianCynomolgus Monkeys upon Challenge with SHIV89.6P", J VIROL., (2010), vol. 84, pages 8953 - 8,
    - BELLINO, S., FRANCAVILLA, V., TRIPICIANO, A., PANICCIA, G., ARANCIO, A., FIORELLI, V., SCOGLIO, A., COLLACCHI, B., CAMPAGNA, M., L, "Parallel conduction of the phase I preventive and therapeutic trials based on the Tat vaccine candidate", REVIEWS ON RECENT CLINICAL TRIALS, (2009), vol. 4, pages 195 - 204,
    - A. CAPUTO, R. GAVIOLI, S. BELLINO, O. LONGO, A. TRIPICIANO, V. FRANCAVILLA, C. SGADARI, G. PANICCIA, F. TITTI, A. CAFARO, "HIV-1 Tat-based vaccines: an overview and perspectives in the field of HIV/AIDS vaccine development", INT. REV. IMMUNOL., (2009), vol. 28, pages 285 - 334,
    - B. ENSOLI, V. FIORELLI, F. ENSOLI, A. LAZZARIN, R. VISINTINI, P. NARCISO, C. A. DI, P. MONINI, M. MAGNANI, E. GARACI, "The therapeutic phase I trial of the recombinant native HIV-1 Tat protein", AIDS, (2008), vol. 22, pages 2207 - 2209,
    - B. ENSOLI, V. FIORELLI, F. ENSOLI, A. LAZZARIN, R. VISINTINI, P. NARCISO, C. A. DI, A. TRIPICIANO, O. LONGO, S. BELLINO, "The preventive phase I trial with the HIV-1 Tat-based vaccine", VACCINE, (2009), vol. 28, pages 371 - 378, XP026791373
    - O. LONGO, A. TRIPICIANO, V. FIORELLI, S. BELLINO, A. SCOGLIO, B. COLLACCHI, M. J. ALVAREZ, V. FRANCAVILLA, A. ARANCIO, G. PANICCIA, "Phase I therapeutic trial of the HIV-1 Tat protein and long term follow-up", VACCINE, (2009), vol. 27, doi:doi:10.1016/j.vaccine.2009.01.090, pages 3306 - 3312, XP026122455

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2009.01.090
    - T. H. FINKEL, G. TUDOR-WILLIAMS, N. K. BANDA, M. F. COTTON, T. CURIEL, C. MONKS, T. W. BABA, R. M. RUPRECHT, A. KUPFER, "Apoptosis occurs predominantly in bystander cells and not in productively infected cells of HIV- and SIV-infected lymph nodes", NAT. MED, (1995), vol. 1, pages 129 - 134,
    - M. L. GOUGEON, "Apoptosis as an HIV strategy to escape immune attack", NAT. REV. IMMUNOL., (2003), vol. 3, pages 392 - 404,
    - N. OYAIZU, T. W. MCCLOSKEY, M. CORONESI, N. CHIRMULE, V. S. KALYANARAMAN, S. PAHWA, "Accelerated apoptosis in peripheral blood mononuclear cells (PBMCs) from human immunodeficiency virus type-1 infected patients and in CD4 cross-linked PBMCs from normal individuals", BLOOD, (1993), vol. 82, pages 3392 - 3400,
    - H. N. HO, L. E. HULTIN, R. T. MITSUYASU, J. L. MATUD, M. A. HAUSNER, D. BOCKSTOCE, C. C. CHOU, S. O'ROURKE, J. M. TAYLOR, J. V. GI, "Circulating HIV-specific CD8+ cytotoxic T cells express CD38 and HLA-DR antigens", J. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 150, pages 3070 - 3079,
    - A. SAEZ-CIRION, C. LACABARATZ, O. LAMBOTTE, P. VERSMISSE, A. URRUTIA, F. BOUFASSA, F. BARRE-SINOUSSI, J. F. DELFRAISSY, M. SINET,, "HIV controllers exhibit potent CD8 T cell capacity to suppress HIV infection ex vivo and peculiar cytotoxic T lymphocyte activation phenotype", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U S. A, (2007), vol. 104, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.0611244104, pages 6776 - 6781, XP055035451

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0611244104
    - A. SAVARINO, F. BOTTAREL, L. CALOSSO, M. J. FEITO, T. BENSI, M. BRAGARDO, J. M. ROJO, A. PUGLIESE, I. ABBATE, M. R. CAPOBIANCHI, "Effects of the human CD38 glycoprotein on the early stages of the HIV- replication cycle", FASEB J., (1999), vol. 13, pages 2265 - 2276, XP002261700
    - A. BIANCOTTO, S. J. IGLEHART, C. VANPOUILLE, C. E. CONDACK, A. LISCO, E. RUECKER, I. HIRSCH, L. B. MARGOLIS, J. C. GRIVEL, "HIV- induced activation of CD4+ T cells creates new targets for HIV- I infection in human lymphoid tissue ex vivo", BLOOD, (2008), vol. 111, pages 699 - 704,
    - J. ANDERSSON, A. BOASSO, J. NILSSON, R. ZHANG, N. J. SHIRE, S. LINDBACK, G. M. SHEARER, C. A. CHOUGNET, "The prevalence of regulatory T cells in lymphoid tissue is correlated with viral load in HIV-infected patients", J IMMUNOL., (2005), vol. 174, pages 3143 - 3147,
    - P. A. APOIL, B. PUISSANT, F. ROUBINET, M. ABBAL, P. MASSIP, A. BLANCHER, "FOXP3 mRNA levels are decreased in peripheral blood CD4+ lymphocytes from HIV-positive patients", J. ACQUIR. IMMUNE. DEFIC. SYNDR., (2005), vol. 39, pages 381 - 385,
    - M. P. EGGENA, B. BARUGAHARE, N. JONES, M. OKELLO, S. MUTALYA, C. KITYO, P. MUGYENYI, H. CAO, "Depletion of regulatory T cells in HIV infection is associated with immune activation", J. IMMUNOL., (2005), vol. 174, pages 4407 - 4414,
    - Y. JIAO, J. FU, S. XING, B. FU, Z. ZHANG, M. SHI, X. WANG, J. ZHANG, L. JIN, F. KANG, "The decrease of regulatory T cells correlates with excessive activation and apoptosis of CD8+ T cells in HIV-1-infected typical progressors, but not in long-term non-progressors", IMMUNOLOGY, (2009), vol. 128, pages E366 - E375,
    - A. MOZOS, M. GARRIDO, J. CARRERAS, M. PLANA, A. DIAZ, L. ALOS, E. CAMPO, F. GARCIA, A. MARTINEZ, "Redistribution of FOXP3-positive regulatory T cells from lymphoid tissues to peripheral blood in HIV-infected patients", J. ACQUIR. IMMUNE. DEFIC. SYNDR., (2007), vol. 46, pages 529 - 537,
    - K. OSWALD-RICHTER, S. M. GRILL, N. SHARIAT, M. LEELAWONG, M. S. SUNDRUD, D. W. HAAS, D. UNUTMAZ, "HIV infection of naturally occurring and genetically reprogrammed human regulatory T-cells", PLOS. BIOL., (2004), vol. 2, page E198,
    - J. D. AHLERS, I. M. BELYAKOV, "Memories that last forever: strategies for optimizing vaccine T-cell memory", BLOOD, (2010), vol. 115, pages 1678 - 1689,
    - J. D. MILLER, R. G. VAN DER MOST, R. S. AKONDY, J. T. GLIDEWELL, S. ALBOTT, D. MASOPUST, K. MURALI-KRISHNA, P. L. MAHAR, S. EDUPUG, "Human effector and memory CD8+ T cell responses to smallpox and yellow fever vaccines", IMMUNITY, (2008), vol. 28, pages 710 - 722,
    - B.J. LUFT, J.S. REMINGTON, "Toxoplasmic encephalitis in AIDS", CLIN INFECT DIS., (1992), vol. 15, pages 211 - 22,
    - K. SCHROECKSNADEL, M. SARCLETTI, C. WINKLER, B. MUMELTER, G. WEISS, D. FUCHS, G. KEMMLER, R. ZANGERLE, "Quality of life and immune activation in patients with HIV-infection", BRAIN BEHAV. IMMUN., (2008), vol. 22, doi:doi:10.1016/j.bbi.2007.12.011, pages 881 - 889, XP022819262

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbi.2007.12.011
    - BURTIS, C. A., ASWHOOD, E. R., Tietz Textbook of Clinical Chemistry, W.B.SAUNDERS, (1994),
    - K. B. MULLIS, F. A. FALOONA, "Specific synthesis of DNA in vitro via a polymerase-catalyzed chain reaction", METHODS ENZYMOL., (1987), vol. 155, doi:doi:10.1016/0076-6879(87)55023-6, pages 335 - 350, XP009003171

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0076-6879(87)55023-6
    - J. W. POLLARD, "The in vivo isotopic labeling of proteins for polyacrylamide gel electrophoresis", METHODS MOL. BIOL., (1994), vol. 32, pages 67 - 72,
    - S. E. SZABO, S. L. MONROE, S. FIORINO, J. BITZAN, K. LOPER, "Evaluation of an automated instrument for viability and concentration measurements of cryopreserved hematopoietic cells", LAB HEMATOL., (2004), vol. 10, pages 109 - 111,
    - S. L. WELLES, J. B. JACKSON, B. YEN-LIEBERMAN, L. DEMETER, A. J. JAPOUR, L. M. SMEATON, V. A. JOHNSON, D. R. KURITZKES, R. T. D'AQ, "Prognostic value of plasma human immunodeficiency virus type 1 (HIV-1) RNA levels in patients with advanced HIV-1 disease and with little or no prior zidovudine therapy. AIDS Clinical Trials Group Protocol 116A/116B/117 Team", J. INFECT. DIS., (1996), vol. 174, pages 696 - 703,
    - S. REIGADAS, M.-L. ANDR6OLA, L. WITTKOP, O. COSNEFROY, G. ANIES, P. RECORDON-PINSON, R. THIéBAUT, B. MASQUELIER, H.FLEURY, "Evolution of 2-long terminal repeat (2-LTR) episomal HIV-1 DNA in raltegravir-treated patients and in in vitro infected cells", JANTIMICROB CHEMOTHER., (2010), vol. 65, pages 434 - 7,
    - R.T. GANDHI, L. ZHENG, R.J. BOSCH, E.S. CHAN, D.M. MARGOLIS, S. READ, B. KALLUNGAL, S.PALMER, K. MEDVIK, M.M. LEDERMAN, "AIDS Clinical Trials Group A5244 team. The effect of raltegravir intensification on low-level residual viremia in HIV-infected patients on antiretroviral therapy: a randomized controlled trial.", PLOS MED., (2010), vol. 7, page E1000321,
    - C. DELAUGERRE, I. CHARREAU, J. BRAUN, M.-L. NERE, N. DE CASTRO, P. YENI, J. GHOSN, J.P.ABOULKER, J.M. MOLINA, F. SIMON, "ANRS 138 study group. Time course of total HIV-1 DNA and 2-long-terminal repeat circles in patients with controlled plasma viremia switching to a raltegravir-containing regimen", AIDS, (2010), vol. 24, pages 2391 - 5,
    - M. EIGEN, R. WINKLER-OSWATITSCH, A. DRESS, "Statistical geometry in sequence space: a method of quantitative comparative sequence analysis", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1988), vol. 85, pages 5913 - 7,
    - S.W. BARNETT, S. LU, I. SRIVASTAVA, S. CHERPELIS, A. GETTIE, J. BLANCHARD, S. WANG, I. MBOUDJEKA, L. LEUNG, Y. LIAN, "The ability of an oligomeric human immunodeficiency virus type 1 (HIV-1) envelope antigen to elicit neutralizing antibodies against primary HIV-1 isolates is improved following partial deletion of the second hypervariable region", J VIROL, (2001), vol. 75, pages 5526 - 5540, XP002309575
    - I.K. SRIVASTAVA, L. STAMATATOS, E. KAN, M. VAJDY, Y. LIAN, S. HILT, L. MARTIN, C. VITA, P. ZHU, K.H. ROUX, "Purification, characterization, and immunogenicity of a soluble trimeric envelope protein containing a partial deletion of the V2 loop derived from SF162, an R5-tropic human immunodeficiency virus type 1 isolate", J VIROL, (2003), vol. 77, doi:doi:10.1128/JVI.77.20.11244-11259.2003, pages 11244 - 11259, XP002332880

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.77.20.11244-11259.2003
 WO2005EP03043