Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2558961

EP2558961 - PROVIDING MOBILE VERSIONS OF WEB RESOURCES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.09.2018
Database last updated on 26.06.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.05.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL, PT
published on 26.06.2019  [2019/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Afilias Technologies Limited
4th Floor, International House
3 Harbourmaster Place
IFSC
Dublin 1 / IE
[2018/42]
Former [2015/18]For all designated states
Afilias Technologies Limited
4th Floor, International House
3 Harbourmaster Place
IFSC
Dublin 1 / IE
Former [2013/08]For all designated states
Afilias Technologies Limited
2 La Touche House
IFSC
Dublin 1 / IE
Inventor(s)01 / CREMIN, Ronan
47 Heytesbury Street
Dublin 8 / IE
02 / HARVIN, Trey
1115 Willow Bend
Roswell, GA 30075 / US
03 / CETRARO, Francesco
Bangatan 4D
214 26 Malmö / SE
04 / SPIERS, Huw
17a Ailesbury Grove
Dundrum
Dublin 16 / IE
 [2018/42]
Former [2013/08]01 / CREMIN, Ronan
11 Holles Row
Dublin 2 / IE
02 / HARVIN, Trey
100 Avoca Park
Blackrock
Co. Dublin / IE
03 / CETRARO, Francesco
16a Zion Road
Dublin 6 / IE
04 / SPIERS, Huw
17a Ailesbury Grove
Dundrum
Dublin 16 / IE
Representative(s)Mathys & Squire
The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/42]Mathys & Squire LLP
The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
Former [2013/08]Phillips, Emily Elizabeth
Thompson Gray LLP
25 Southampton Buildings
London WC2A 1AL / GB
Application number, filing date11714557.314.04.2011
[2018/42]
WO2011EP55959
Priority number, dateGB2010000622914.04.2010         Original published format: GB 201006229
[2013/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011128417
Date:20.10.2011
Language:EN
[2011/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2558961
Date:20.02.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2011
[2013/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2558961
Date:17.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.10.2011
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/08, G06F17/30
[2018/17]
Former International [2013/08]G06F17/30
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/08]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:BEREITSTELLUNG VON MOBILEN VERSIONEN VON WEBRESSOURCEN[2013/08]
English:PROVIDING MOBILE VERSIONS OF WEB RESOURCES[2013/08]
French:COMMUNICATION DE VERSIONS MOBILES DE RESSOURCES WEB[2013/08]
Entry into regional phase19.10.2012National basic fee paid 
19.10.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
19.10.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.10.2012Examination requested  [2013/08]
31.01.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.04.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.11.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
26.01.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.05.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.09.2018Fee for grant paid
05.09.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.09.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.04.2017
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
26.01.2018Request for further processing filed
26.01.2018Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
07.02.2018Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
30.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
22.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
19.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
03.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
28.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201707   M06   Fee paid on   27.10.2017
30.04.201808   M06   Fee paid on   28.06.2018
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL17.10.2018
AT17.10.2018
ES17.10.2018
FI17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
LV17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
RS17.10.2018
SE17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
GR18.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
PT17.02.2019
[2019/26]
Former [2019/25]AT17.10.2018
ES17.10.2018
FI17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
LV17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
RS17.10.2018
SE17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
GR18.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
Former [2019/24]AT17.10.2018
ES17.10.2018
FI17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
LV17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
SE17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
GR18.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
Former [2019/23]AT17.10.2018
ES17.10.2018
FI17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
LV17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
Former [2019/22]FI17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
Former [2019/21]FI17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
NO17.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
Former [2019/20]LT17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
NO17.01.2019
Former [2019/17]NL17.10.2018
Cited inInternational search[I]US2009024698  (HO MATTHEW JONATHAN [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0028] *;
 [A]  - NOKIA, "Top-Level Domain for Mobile", 3GPP DRAFT; SP-020123, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20020308), vol. TSG SA, no. CHEJU; 20020308, XP050196373 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [A]  - SMITH J R ET AL, "Transcoding Internet content for heterogeneous client devices", CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, 1998. ISCAS '98. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1998 IEEE IN TERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON MONTEREY, CA, USA 31 MAY-3 JUNE 1998, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19980531), vol. 3, doi:DOI:10.1109/ISCAS.1998.704083, ISBN 978-0-7803-4455-6, pages 599 - 602, XP010289378 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 599, column r, line 33 - page 600, column l, line 22 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISCAS.1998.704083