blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2697888

EP2697888 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE TOPOLOGY OF A LOW-VOLTAGE DISTRIBUTION GRID [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/08]LOW-VOLTAGE DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING THE SAME
[2019/16]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.07.2020
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.08.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.04.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.2022Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 10.08.2022  [2022/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1
80333 München / DE
[2017/35]
Former [2014/08]For all designated states
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / KUSSYK, Jaroslaw
Angergasse 14
A-1170 Wien / AT
 [2014/08]
Representative(s)Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/33]Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
Application number, filing date11714983.115.04.2011
[2019/36]
WO2011EP56020
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO2012139658
Date:18.10.2012
Language:DE
[2012/42]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2697888
Date:19.02.2014
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2014/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2697888
Date:04.09.2019
Language:DE
[2019/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.12.2012
ClassificationIPC:H02J13/00
[2019/16]
CPC:
H02J13/00034 (EP,US); G01R19/00 (US); H02J13/00002 (EP,US);
Y02E60/00 (EP); Y04S10/30 (EP)
Former IPC [2014/08]H02J13/00, G01D4/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/08]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER TOPOLOGIE EINES NIEDERSPANNUNGSNETZES[2019/16]
English:METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE TOPOLOGY OF A LOW-VOLTAGE DISTRIBUTION GRID[2019/16]
French:MÉTHODE DE DÉTERMINATION DE LA TOPOLOGIE D'UN RÉSEAU DE DISTRIBUTION BASSE TENSION[2019/16]
Former [2014/08]NIEDERSPANNUNGSVERTEILNETZ UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN BETRIEB
Former [2014/08]LOW-VOLTAGE DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING THE SAME
Former [2014/08]RÉSEAU DE DISTRIBUTION BASSE TENSION ET SON MODE DE FONCTIONNEMENT
Entry into regional phase25.07.2013National basic fee paid 
25.07.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
25.07.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.07.2013Examination requested  [2014/08]
23.05.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.05.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.07.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
26.07.2019Fee for grant paid
26.07.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.01.2018
Opposition(s)05.06.2020No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
17.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
20.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
21.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
19.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
19.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
16.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU15.04.2011
AL04.09.2019
CY04.09.2019
CZ04.09.2019
DK04.09.2019
EE04.09.2019
ES04.09.2019
FI04.09.2019
HR04.09.2019
LT04.09.2019
LV04.09.2019
MC04.09.2019
MK04.09.2019
MT04.09.2019
NL04.09.2019
PL04.09.2019
RO04.09.2019
RS04.09.2019
SE04.09.2019
SI04.09.2019
SK04.09.2019
SM04.09.2019
TR04.09.2019
BG04.12.2019
NO04.12.2019
GR05.12.2019
IS05.01.2020
PT06.01.2020
AT15.04.2020
IE15.04.2020
LU15.04.2020
BE30.04.2020
CH30.04.2020
FR30.04.2020
LI30.04.2020
[2022/32]
Former [2022/27]HU15.04.2011
AL04.09.2019
CY04.09.2019
CZ04.09.2019
DK04.09.2019
EE04.09.2019
ES04.09.2019
FI04.09.2019
HR04.09.2019
LT04.09.2019
LV04.09.2019
MC04.09.2019
MT04.09.2019
NL04.09.2019
PL04.09.2019
RO04.09.2019
RS04.09.2019
SE04.09.2019
SI04.09.2019
SK04.09.2019
SM04.09.2019
TR04.09.2019
BG04.12.2019
NO04.12.2019
GR05.12.2019
IS05.01.2020
PT06.01.2020
AT15.04.2020
IE15.04.2020
LU15.04.2020
BE30.04.2020
CH30.04.2020
FR30.04.2020
LI30.04.2020
Former [2022/26]AL04.09.2019
CZ04.09.2019
DK04.09.2019
EE04.09.2019
ES04.09.2019
FI04.09.2019
HR04.09.2019
LT04.09.2019
LV04.09.2019
MC04.09.2019
NL04.09.2019
PL04.09.2019
RO04.09.2019
RS04.09.2019
SE04.09.2019
SI04.09.2019
SK04.09.2019
SM04.09.2019
TR04.09.2019
BG04.12.2019
NO04.12.2019
GR05.12.2019
IS05.01.2020
PT06.01.2020
AT15.04.2020
IE15.04.2020
LU15.04.2020
BE30.04.2020
CH30.04.2020
FR30.04.2020
LI30.04.2020
Former [2021/37]AL04.09.2019
CZ04.09.2019
DK04.09.2019
EE04.09.2019
ES04.09.2019
FI04.09.2019
HR04.09.2019
LT04.09.2019
LV04.09.2019
MC04.09.2019
NL04.09.2019
PL04.09.2019
RO04.09.2019
RS04.09.2019
SE04.09.2019
SI04.09.2019
SK04.09.2019
SM04.09.2019
BG04.12.2019
NO04.12.2019
GR05.12.2019
IS05.01.2020
PT06.01.2020
AT15.04.2020
IE15.04.2020
LU15.04.2020
BE30.04.2020
CH30.04.2020
FR30.04.2020
LI30.04.2020
Former [2021/20]AL04.09.2019
CZ04.09.2019
DK04.09.2019
EE04.09.2019
ES04.09.2019
FI04.09.2019
HR04.09.2019
LT04.09.2019
LV04.09.2019
MC04.09.2019
NL04.09.2019
PL04.09.2019
RO04.09.2019
RS04.09.2019
SE04.09.2019
SI04.09.2019
SK04.09.2019
SM04.09.2019
BG04.12.2019
NO04.12.2019
GR05.12.2019
IS05.01.2020
PT06.01.2020
IE15.04.2020
LU15.04.2020
BE30.04.2020
CH30.04.2020
FR30.04.2020
LI30.04.2020
Former [2021/12]AL04.09.2019
CZ04.09.2019
DK04.09.2019
EE04.09.2019
ES04.09.2019
FI04.09.2019
HR04.09.2019
LT04.09.2019
LV04.09.2019
MC04.09.2019
NL04.09.2019
PL04.09.2019
RO04.09.2019
RS04.09.2019
SE04.09.2019
SI04.09.2019
SK04.09.2019
SM04.09.2019
BG04.12.2019
NO04.12.2019
GR05.12.2019
IS05.01.2020
PT06.01.2020
LU15.04.2020
BE30.04.2020
CH30.04.2020
FR30.04.2020
LI30.04.2020
Former [2021/08]AL04.09.2019
CZ04.09.2019
DK04.09.2019
EE04.09.2019
ES04.09.2019
FI04.09.2019
HR04.09.2019
LT04.09.2019
LV04.09.2019
MC04.09.2019
NL04.09.2019
PL04.09.2019
RO04.09.2019
RS04.09.2019
SE04.09.2019
SI04.09.2019
SK04.09.2019
SM04.09.2019
BG04.12.2019
NO04.12.2019
GR05.12.2019
IS05.01.2020
PT06.01.2020
LU15.04.2020
CH30.04.2020
LI30.04.2020
Former [2020/52]AL04.09.2019
CZ04.09.2019
DK04.09.2019
EE04.09.2019
ES04.09.2019
FI04.09.2019
HR04.09.2019
LT04.09.2019
LV04.09.2019
MC04.09.2019
NL04.09.2019
PL04.09.2019
RO04.09.2019
RS04.09.2019
SE04.09.2019
SI04.09.2019
SK04.09.2019
SM04.09.2019
BG04.12.2019
NO04.12.2019
GR05.12.2019
IS05.01.2020
PT06.01.2020
Former [2020/37]AL04.09.2019
CZ04.09.2019
DK04.09.2019
EE04.09.2019
ES04.09.2019
FI04.09.2019
HR04.09.2019
LT04.09.2019
LV04.09.2019
NL04.09.2019
PL04.09.2019
RO04.09.2019
RS04.09.2019
SE04.09.2019
SI04.09.2019
SK04.09.2019
SM04.09.2019
BG04.12.2019
NO04.12.2019
GR05.12.2019
IS05.01.2020
PT06.01.2020
Former [2020/36]AL04.09.2019
CZ04.09.2019
DK04.09.2019
EE04.09.2019
ES04.09.2019
FI04.09.2019
HR04.09.2019
LT04.09.2019
LV04.09.2019
NL04.09.2019
PL04.09.2019
RO04.09.2019
RS04.09.2019
SE04.09.2019
SK04.09.2019
SM04.09.2019
BG04.12.2019
NO04.12.2019
GR05.12.2019
IS05.01.2020
PT06.01.2020
Former [2020/27]AL04.09.2019
CZ04.09.2019
EE04.09.2019
ES04.09.2019
FI04.09.2019
HR04.09.2019
LT04.09.2019
LV04.09.2019
NL04.09.2019
PL04.09.2019
RO04.09.2019
RS04.09.2019
SE04.09.2019
SK04.09.2019
SM04.09.2019
BG04.12.2019
NO04.12.2019
GR05.12.2019
PT06.01.2020
IS24.02.2020
Former [2020/25]AL04.09.2019
CZ04.09.2019
EE04.09.2019
ES04.09.2019
FI04.09.2019
HR04.09.2019
LT04.09.2019
LV04.09.2019
NL04.09.2019
PL04.09.2019
RO04.09.2019
RS04.09.2019
SE04.09.2019
SK04.09.2019
BG04.12.2019
NO04.12.2019
GR05.12.2019
PT06.01.2020
IS24.02.2020
Former [2020/23]AL04.09.2019
EE04.09.2019
ES04.09.2019
FI04.09.2019
HR04.09.2019
LT04.09.2019
LV04.09.2019
NL04.09.2019
PL04.09.2019
RO04.09.2019
RS04.09.2019
SE04.09.2019
BG04.12.2019
NO04.12.2019
GR05.12.2019
PT06.01.2020
Former [2020/22]AL04.09.2019
EE04.09.2019
ES04.09.2019
FI04.09.2019
HR04.09.2019
LT04.09.2019
LV04.09.2019
NL04.09.2019
RS04.09.2019
SE04.09.2019
BG04.12.2019
NO04.12.2019
GR05.12.2019
PT06.01.2020
Former [2020/20]AL04.09.2019
ES04.09.2019
FI04.09.2019
HR04.09.2019
LT04.09.2019
LV04.09.2019
NL04.09.2019
RS04.09.2019
SE04.09.2019
BG04.12.2019
NO04.12.2019
GR05.12.2019
Former [2020/15]AL04.09.2019
ES04.09.2019
FI04.09.2019
HR04.09.2019
LT04.09.2019
LV04.09.2019
RS04.09.2019
SE04.09.2019
BG04.12.2019
NO04.12.2019
GR05.12.2019
Former [2020/11]ES04.09.2019
FI04.09.2019
HR04.09.2019
LT04.09.2019
LV04.09.2019
RS04.09.2019
SE04.09.2019
BG04.12.2019
NO04.12.2019
GR05.12.2019
Former [2020/10]FI04.09.2019
LT04.09.2019
SE04.09.2019
BG04.12.2019
NO04.12.2019
Former [2020/09]FI04.09.2019
LT04.09.2019
NO04.12.2019
Former [2020/08]LT04.09.2019
NO04.12.2019
Cited inInternational search[A]US2004130837  (PAPALLO THOMAS F [US], et al) [A] 1,7* paragraph [0095] *;
 [XYI]US2007005277  (BICKEL JON A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraphs [0063] , [0064] * * paragraph [0191] - paragraph [0193] * * figures 1,2,6-9,14-28 * [Y] 6,11-13 [I] 3-6,8-18;
 [XI]WO2009061291  (SQUARE D CO [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7 * paragraphs [0001] , [0025] - [0035] * * figures 1-9 * [I] 3-6,8-18;
 [XI]US2009300034  (HASAN AMJAD [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7 * the whole document * [I] 3-6,8-18;
 [A]WO2010027421  (SILVER SPRING NETWORKS INC [US], et al) [A] 1,7 * the whole document *;
 [XY]EP2246955  (MAGNANI SANDRA [IT]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0001] , [0007] , [0011] , [0025] , [0030] * * figures 1-6 * [Y] 6,11-13
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.