Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2561016

EP2561016 - PROPYLENE/1-HEXENE COPOLYMER COMPOSITION WITH LOW SEALING TEMPERATURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.12.2017
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.12.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
04.12.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Borealis AG
IZD Tower Wagramerstraße 17-19
1220 Vienna / AT
[2013/09]
Inventor(s)01 / PAAVILAINEN, Juha
Aleksis Kivenkatu 56 B 53
FI-00510 Helsinki / FI
02 / DOSHEV, Petar
Hagenau 8
A-4040 Linz / AT
03 / REICHELT, Kristin
Dambachstrasse 13
A-4501 Neuhofen/Krems / AT
 [2015/01]
Former [2013/09]01 / PAAVILAINEN, Juha
Aleksis Kivenkatu 56 B 53
FI-00510 Helsinki / FI
02 / DOSHEV, Petar
Am Herzog Wilhelm Weg 9 Top II
A-4040 Linz / AT
03 / REICHELT, Kristin
Dambachstrasse 13
A-4501 Neuhofen/Krems / AT
Representative(s)Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/09]Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date11715525.918.04.2011
WO2011EP56181
Priority number, dateEP2010016063121.04.2010         Original published format: EP 10160631
[2013/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011131639
Date:27.10.2011
Language:EN
[2011/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2561016
Date:27.02.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2011
[2013/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2561016
Date:03.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.10.2011
ClassificationInternational:C08L23/14, C08J5/18
[2013/09]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/09]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:PROPYLEN-/1-HEXEN-COPOLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT WEIT GEFASSTER ABDICHTTEMPERATUR[2015/23]
English:PROPYLENE/1-HEXENE COPOLYMER COMPOSITION WITH LOW SEALING TEMPERATURE[2013/09]
French:COMPOSITION COPOLYMÈRE DE PROPYLÈNE/1-HEXÈNE AVEC UNE FAIBLE TEMPÉRATURE DE SCELLAGE[2015/23]
Former [2013/09]PROPYLEN-/1-HEXEN-COPOLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT NIEDRIGER SIEGELTEMPERATUR
Former [2013/09]COMPOSITION COPOLYMÈRE PROPYLÈNE/1-HEXÈNE AYANT UNE BASSE TEMPÉRATURE DE SCELLEMENT
Entry into regional phase09.11.2012National basic fee paid 
09.11.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
09.11.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.02.2012Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
09.11.2012Examination requested  [2013/09]
28.05.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.12.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.03.2015Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
16.03.2015Fee for grant paid
16.03.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.04.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.04.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.12.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  01.03.2016   
SABIC Global Technologies B.V. / SABIC Petrochemicals B.V.
Plasticlaan 1 / Europaboulevard 1
4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / 6135 LD Sittard / NL
Opponent's representative
Heijman, Renske Harriët, et al
SABIC Petrochemicals B.V.
Intellectual Property Group
P.O. Box 3008
6160 GA Geleen / NL
 [2016/14]
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
12.04.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
10.10.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
14.12.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition26.01.2018Appeal received No.  T0271/18
19.04.2018Statement of grounds filed
09.11.2017Date of oral proceedings
04.06.2018Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
08.09.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
25.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
21.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU18.04.2011
AL03.06.2015
AT03.06.2015
CY03.06.2015
CZ03.06.2015
DK03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
MC03.06.2015
MK03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
RS03.06.2015
SI03.06.2015
SK03.06.2015
SM03.06.2015
BG03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
PT06.10.2015
LU18.04.2016
MT30.04.2016
[2018/47]
Former [2018/31]HU18.04.2011
AT03.06.2015
CY03.06.2015
CZ03.06.2015
DK03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
MC03.06.2015
MK03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
RS03.06.2015
SI03.06.2015
SK03.06.2015
SM03.06.2015
BG03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
PT06.10.2015
LU18.04.2016
MT30.04.2016
Former [2018/28]HU18.04.2011
AT03.06.2015
CY03.06.2015
CZ03.06.2015
DK03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
MC03.06.2015
MK03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
RS03.06.2015
SI03.06.2015
SK03.06.2015
SM03.06.2015
BG03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
PT06.10.2015
LU18.04.2016
Former [2017/04]AT03.06.2015
CZ03.06.2015
DK03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
RS03.06.2015
SI03.06.2015
SK03.06.2015
BG03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
PT06.10.2015
LU18.04.2016
Former [2016/24]AT03.06.2015
CZ03.06.2015
DK03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
RS03.06.2015
SI03.06.2015
SK03.06.2015
BG03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
PT06.10.2015
Former [2016/20]AT03.06.2015
CZ03.06.2015
DK03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
RS03.06.2015
SK03.06.2015
BG03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
PT06.10.2015
Former [2016/10]AT03.06.2015
CZ03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
RS03.06.2015
SK03.06.2015
BG03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
PT06.10.2015
Former [2016/09]AT03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
RS03.06.2015
BG03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
Former [2015/51]AT03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
RS03.06.2015
BG03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
Former [2015/50]HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
RS03.06.2015
BG03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
Former [2015/49]HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
RS03.06.2015
GR04.09.2015
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP0560326  (HIMONT INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document * * page 2 * [Y] 1-15;
 [XY]EP0556815  (HIMONT INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document * * pages 2-3 * [Y] 1-15;
 [Y]WO2009144166  (BOREALIS AG [AT], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP1788023  (BOREALIS TECH OY [FI]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [YD]WO9858976  (BOREALIS AS [DK], et al) [YD] 1-15 * the whole document *
by applicantEP0887379
 WO9212182
 WO9858976
 WO03051934
 WO2006069733
 WO0148034
 EP1741725
    - PURE APPL. CHEM., (1996), vol. 68, no. 8, pages 1591 - 1595
    - RESCONI ET AL., CHEMICAL REVIEWS, (2000), vol. 100, no. 4, page 1263
    - POLLARD, M., KLIMKE, K., GRAF, R., SPIESS, H.W., WILHELM, M., SPERBER, O., PIEL, C., KAMINSKY, W., MACROMOLECULES, (2004), vol. 37, page 813
    - KLIMKE, K., PARKINSON, M., PIEL, C., KAMINSKY, W., SPIESS, H.W., WILHELM, M., MACROMOL. CHEM. PHYS., (2006), vol. 207, page 382
    - FILIP, X., TRIPON, C., FILIP, C., J. MAG. RESN., (2005), vol. 176, page 239
    - GRIFFIN, J.M., TRIPON, C., SAMOSON, A., FILIP, C., BROWN, S.P., MAG. RES. IN CHEM., (2007), vol. 45, page S1,S198
    - BUSICO, V., CIPULLO, R., PROG. POLYM. SCI., (2001), vol. 26, page 443
    - BUSICO, V., CIPULLO, R., MONACO, G., VACATELLO, M., SEGRE, A.L., MACROMOLECULES, (1997), vol. 30, no. 6251
    - RESCONI, L., CAVALLO, L., FAIT, A., PIEMONTESI, F., CHEM. REV., (2000), vol. 100, page 1253
OppositionEP2487203
 WO2011131637
 WO2009007132
 WO2006002778
 WO0011076
 WO9611216
 WO9710300
 WO03002625
 EP1270628
 WO9532235
 WO2010057841
 WO2004101673
 WO2009077287
 WO2009068577
 WO0144367
 WO9212182
 EP0887379
 WO9858976
 WO2010052263