Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2556403

EP2556403 - MECHANICAL LAYER OF AN ELECTROMECHANICAL DEVICE AND METHODS OF FORMING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.11.2013
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.12.2013  [2013/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Mems Technologies, Inc.
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2013/07]
Inventor(s)01 / TAO, Yi
2581 Junction Avenue
San Jose, CA 95134-1923 / US
02 / ZHONG, Fan
2581 Junction Avenue
San Jose, CA 95134-1923 / US
03 / DE GROOT, Wilhelmus A
2581 Junction Avenue
San Jose, CA 95134-1923 / US
 [2013/07]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/07]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date11715633.101.04.2011
WO2011US31010
Priority number, dateUS20100322776P09.04.2010         Original published format: US 322776 P
[2013/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011126953
Date:13.10.2011
Language:EN
[2011/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2556403
Date:13.02.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2011
[2013/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.10.2011
ClassificationInternational:G02B26/00
[2013/07]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/07]
TitleGerman:MECHANISCHE SCHICHT EINER ELEKTROMECHANISCHEN VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG[2013/07]
English:MECHANICAL LAYER OF AN ELECTROMECHANICAL DEVICE AND METHODS OF FORMING THE SAME[2013/07]
French:COUCHE MÉCANIQUE D'UN DISPOSITIF ÉLECTROMÉCANIQUE ET SES PROCÉDÉS DE FORMATION[2013/07]
Entry into regional phase06.11.2012National basic fee paid 
06.11.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
06.11.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
03.02.2012Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
06.11.2012Examination requested  [2013/07]
25.06.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/51]
30.07.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time  [2013/51]
30.07.2013Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[I]US5835255  (MILES MARK W [US]) [I] 1-40 * column 13, line 59 - line 64 * * column 20, line 12 - column 21, line 65 * * column 17, line 64 - column 20, line 4 * * figures 20c,25-28 *;
 [I]US6574033  (CHUI CLARENCE [US] ET AL) [I] 1,28 * column 4, line 64 - column 5, line 30 * * figure 6 *;
 [I]WO9952006  (ETALON INC [US]; MILES MARK W [US]) [I] 1,28 * page 9, line 11 - line 26 * * figure 1a *;
 [I]US6055090  (MILES MARK W [US]) [I] 1,28 * column 3, line 38 - column 4, line 16 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US2006067028  (FLOYD PHILIP D [US]) [A] 1-40 * claims 14,15 *
by applicantUS19760613227