Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2558643

EP2558643 - MONITORING APPARATUS FOR A SOIL-WORKING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.10.2017
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
25.10.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BOMAG GmbH
Hellerwald
56154 Boppard / DE
[2013/08]
Inventor(s)01 / WACHSMANN, Steffen
Kurfürstenstr. 17
56068 Koblenz / DE
02 / LAUX, Robert
Unterbüngstr. 15a
56566 Neuwied / DE
 [2013/08]
Representative(s)Heidler, Philipp , et al
Lang & Tomerius
Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Rosa-Bavarese-Strasse 5
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/52]Heidler, Philipp , et al
Lang & Tomerius
Patentanwälte
Rosa-Bavarese-Strasse 5
80639 München / DE
Former [2013/08]Heidler, Philipp , et al
Lang & Tomerius
Landsberger Straße 300
80687 München / DE
Application number, filing date11715663.814.04.2011
WO2011EP01910
Priority number, dateDE2010101490314.04.2010         Original published format: DE102010014903
[2013/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2011128105
Date:20.10.2011
Language:DE
[2011/42]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2558643
Date:20.02.2013
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2011
[2013/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2558643
Date:24.12.2014
Language:DE
[2014/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.07.2012
ClassificationInternational:E01C19/00, E01C19/48, E01C23/088, E01C23/01, E01C23/07
[2013/08]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/08]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ÜBERWACHUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE BODENBEARBEITUNGSMASCHINE[2013/08]
English:MONITORING APPARATUS FOR A SOIL-WORKING MACHINE[2013/08]
French:DISPOSITIF DE SURVEILLANCE POUR UNE MACHINE DE TRAVAIL DU SOL[2013/08]
Entry into regional phase01.10.2012National basic fee paid 
01.10.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
01.10.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.10.2012Examination requested  [2013/08]
25.02.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.07.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.11.2014Fee for grant paid
07.11.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.11.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.07.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  24.09.2015  30.09.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Wirtgen GmbH
Reinhard-Wirtgen-Strasse 2
53578 Windhagen / DE
Opponent's representative
Herrmann, Jochen
Herrmann
Patentanwälte
Königstrasse 30
70173 Stuttgart / DE
 [2016/45]
Former [2016/26]
Opponent(s)01  24.09.2015  30.09.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Wirtgen GmbH
Reinhard-Wirtgen-Strasse 2
53578 Windhagen / DE
Opponent's representative
Herrmann, Jochen
Patentanwalt
European Patent Attorney
Königstrasse 30
70173 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2015/45]
Opponent(s)01  24.09.2015  30.09.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Wirtgen GmbH
Reinhard-Wirtgen-Strasse 2
53578 Windhagen / DE
Opponent's representative
Herrmann, Jochen
Jeck - Fleck - Herrmann
Patentanwälte
Klingengasse 2
71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
29.10.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
26.02.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
22.06.2017Date of oral proceedings
13.10.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
13.10.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition06.12.2017Appeal received No.  T2682/17
13.07.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
11.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.04.2011
AL24.12.2014
BG24.12.2014
CY24.12.2014
CZ24.12.2014
DK24.12.2014
EE24.12.2014
ES24.12.2014
FI24.12.2014
HR24.12.2014
IT24.12.2014
LT24.12.2014
LV24.12.2014
MC24.12.2014
MK24.12.2014
MT24.12.2014
NL24.12.2014
PL24.12.2014
RO24.12.2014
RS24.12.2014
SE24.12.2014
SI24.12.2014
SK24.12.2014
SM24.12.2014
TR24.12.2014
NO24.03.2015
GR25.03.2015
GB14.04.2015
IE14.04.2015
LU14.04.2015
IS24.04.2015
PT24.04.2015
BE30.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
FR30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
AT14.04.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU14.04.2011
BG24.12.2014
CY24.12.2014
CZ24.12.2014
DK24.12.2014
EE24.12.2014
ES24.12.2014
FI24.12.2014
HR24.12.2014
IT24.12.2014
LT24.12.2014
LV24.12.2014
MC24.12.2014
MK24.12.2014
MT24.12.2014
NL24.12.2014
PL24.12.2014
RO24.12.2014
RS24.12.2014
SE24.12.2014
SI24.12.2014
SK24.12.2014
SM24.12.2014
TR24.12.2014
NO24.03.2015
GR25.03.2015
GB14.04.2015
IE14.04.2015
LU14.04.2015
IS24.04.2015
PT24.04.2015
BE30.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
FR30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
AT14.04.2016
Former [2017/38]HU14.04.2011
BG24.12.2014
CY24.12.2014
CZ24.12.2014
DK24.12.2014
EE24.12.2014
ES24.12.2014
FI24.12.2014
HR24.12.2014
IT24.12.2014
LT24.12.2014
LV24.12.2014
MC24.12.2014
MT24.12.2014
NL24.12.2014
PL24.12.2014
RO24.12.2014
RS24.12.2014
SE24.12.2014
SI24.12.2014
SK24.12.2014
SM24.12.2014
TR24.12.2014
NO24.03.2015
GR25.03.2015
GB14.04.2015
IE14.04.2015
LU14.04.2015
IS24.04.2015
PT24.04.2015
BE30.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
FR30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
AT14.04.2016
Former [2017/03]CZ24.12.2014
DK24.12.2014
EE24.12.2014
ES24.12.2014
FI24.12.2014
HR24.12.2014
IT24.12.2014
LT24.12.2014
LV24.12.2014
MC24.12.2014
MT24.12.2014
NL24.12.2014
PL24.12.2014
RO24.12.2014
RS24.12.2014
SE24.12.2014
SI24.12.2014
SK24.12.2014
NO24.03.2015
GR25.03.2015
GB14.04.2015
IE14.04.2015
LU14.04.2015
IS24.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
FR30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
Former [2016/20]CZ24.12.2014
DK24.12.2014
EE24.12.2014
ES24.12.2014
FI24.12.2014
HR24.12.2014
IT24.12.2014
LT24.12.2014
LV24.12.2014
MC24.12.2014
NL24.12.2014
PL24.12.2014
RO24.12.2014
RS24.12.2014
SE24.12.2014
SI24.12.2014
SK24.12.2014
NO24.03.2015
GR25.03.2015
GB14.04.2015
IE14.04.2015
LU14.04.2015
IS24.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
FR30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
Former [2016/12]CZ24.12.2014
DK24.12.2014
EE24.12.2014
ES24.12.2014
FI24.12.2014
HR24.12.2014
IT24.12.2014
LT24.12.2014
LV24.12.2014
MC24.12.2014
NL24.12.2014
PL24.12.2014
RO24.12.2014
RS24.12.2014
SE24.12.2014
SI24.12.2014
SK24.12.2014
NO24.03.2015
GR25.03.2015
GB14.04.2015
LU14.04.2015
IS24.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
FR30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
Former [2016/07]CZ24.12.2014
DK24.12.2014
EE24.12.2014
ES24.12.2014
FI24.12.2014
HR24.12.2014
IT24.12.2014
LT24.12.2014
LV24.12.2014
MC24.12.2014
NL24.12.2014
PL24.12.2014
RO24.12.2014
RS24.12.2014
SE24.12.2014
SK24.12.2014
NO24.03.2015
GR25.03.2015
GB14.04.2015
LU14.04.2015
IS24.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
Former [2016/06]CZ24.12.2014
DK24.12.2014
EE24.12.2014
ES24.12.2014
FI24.12.2014
HR24.12.2014
IT24.12.2014
LT24.12.2014
LV24.12.2014
MC24.12.2014
NL24.12.2014
PL24.12.2014
RO24.12.2014
RS24.12.2014
SE24.12.2014
SK24.12.2014
NO24.03.2015
GR25.03.2015
LU14.04.2015
IS24.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
Former [2016/03]CZ24.12.2014
DK24.12.2014
EE24.12.2014
ES24.12.2014
FI24.12.2014
HR24.12.2014
IT24.12.2014
LT24.12.2014
LV24.12.2014
MC24.12.2014
NL24.12.2014
PL24.12.2014
RO24.12.2014
RS24.12.2014
SE24.12.2014
SK24.12.2014
NO24.03.2015
GR25.03.2015
LU14.04.2015
IS24.04.2015
Former [2016/01]CZ24.12.2014
DK24.12.2014
EE24.12.2014
ES24.12.2014
FI24.12.2014
HR24.12.2014
LT24.12.2014
LV24.12.2014
MC24.12.2014
NL24.12.2014
PL24.12.2014
RO24.12.2014
RS24.12.2014
SE24.12.2014
SK24.12.2014
NO24.03.2015
GR25.03.2015
LU14.04.2015
IS24.04.2015
Former [2015/52]CZ24.12.2014
DK24.12.2014
EE24.12.2014
ES24.12.2014
FI24.12.2014
HR24.12.2014
LT24.12.2014
LV24.12.2014
NL24.12.2014
PL24.12.2014
RO24.12.2014
RS24.12.2014
SE24.12.2014
SK24.12.2014
NO24.03.2015
GR25.03.2015
LU14.04.2015
IS24.04.2015
Former [2015/50]CZ24.12.2014
DK24.12.2014
EE24.12.2014
ES24.12.2014
FI24.12.2014
HR24.12.2014
LT24.12.2014
LV24.12.2014
NL24.12.2014
PL24.12.2014
RO24.12.2014
RS24.12.2014
SE24.12.2014
SK24.12.2014
NO24.03.2015
GR25.03.2015
IS24.04.2015
Former [2015/38]CZ24.12.2014
EE24.12.2014
ES24.12.2014
FI24.12.2014
HR24.12.2014
LT24.12.2014
LV24.12.2014
NL24.12.2014
PL24.12.2014
RO24.12.2014
RS24.12.2014
SE24.12.2014
SK24.12.2014
NO24.03.2015
GR25.03.2015
IS24.04.2015
Former [2015/37]CZ24.12.2014
EE24.12.2014
ES24.12.2014
FI24.12.2014
HR24.12.2014
LT24.12.2014
LV24.12.2014
NL24.12.2014
PL24.12.2014
RO24.12.2014
RS24.12.2014
SE24.12.2014
SK24.12.2014
NO24.03.2015
GR25.03.2015
Former [2015/36]CZ24.12.2014
EE24.12.2014
ES24.12.2014
FI24.12.2014
HR24.12.2014
LT24.12.2014
LV24.12.2014
NL24.12.2014
RO24.12.2014
RS24.12.2014
SE24.12.2014
NO24.03.2015
GR25.03.2015
Former [2015/35]EE24.12.2014
ES24.12.2014
FI24.12.2014
HR24.12.2014
LT24.12.2014
LV24.12.2014
NL24.12.2014
RS24.12.2014
SE24.12.2014
NO24.03.2015
GR25.03.2015
Former [2015/33]ES24.12.2014
FI24.12.2014
HR24.12.2014
LT24.12.2014
LV24.12.2014
NL24.12.2014
RS24.12.2014
SE24.12.2014
NO24.03.2015
GR25.03.2015
Former [2015/29]FI24.12.2014
HR24.12.2014
LT24.12.2014
LV24.12.2014
NL24.12.2014
RS24.12.2014
SE24.12.2014
NO24.03.2015
GR25.03.2015
Former [2015/24]FI24.12.2014
HR24.12.2014
LT24.12.2014
LV24.12.2014
RS24.12.2014
SE24.12.2014
NO24.03.2015
GR25.03.2015
Former [2015/23]FI24.12.2014
LT24.12.2014
NO24.03.2015
Former [2015/21]LT24.12.2014
NO24.03.2015
Former [2015/20]LT24.12.2014
Cited inInternational search[XYI]WO0246533  (MOBA MOBILE AUTOMATION GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,10,12,15 * page 1, lines 9-11 * * page 5, lines 9-39 * * page 6, line 21 - page 7, line 8 * * page 9, line 15 - page 12, line 4 * * page 15, line 29 - page 16, line 12 * * figures 1,3,4 * [Y] 14 [I] 6;
 [X]EP2037042  (WIRTGEN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-6,10,12,13,15 * paragraphs [0001] - [0004] - [0009] - [0013] - [0026] , [0028] , [0030] , [0032] , [0036] , [0037] * * figures 2,4a-c *;
 [Y]WO2004074579  (SMITH JOHN PAUL [US]) [Y] 14 * page 5, lines 12 - 18 * * figure 1 *;
 [Y]WO03064770  (WIRTGEN GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-11,13-15 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP2161375  (WIRTGEN GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-11,13,15 * the whole document *
by applicantDE10203732
OppositionDE102007007970