Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2577649

EP2577649 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR IMPROVING THE RESPONSE TIME OF LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.07.2014
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.03.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Johnson Controls Automotive Electronics GmbH
Benzstraße 6
75196 Remchingen / DE
[2013/15]
Inventor(s)01 / RAWER, Marc
Augsburgerstr. 439
70327 Stuttgart / DE
 [2013/15]
Representative(s)Wolff, Felix , et al
Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner
Waidmarkt 11
50676 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/15]Wolff, Felix , et al
Kutzenberger & Wolff Anwaltssozietät Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23
50668 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date11716171.128.03.2011
WO2011EP01536
Priority number, dateDE2010104842315.10.2010         Original published format: DE102010048423
DE2010102149526.05.2010         Original published format: DE102010021495
[2013/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011147500
Date:01.12.2011
Language:DE
[2011/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2577649
Date:10.04.2013
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2011
[2013/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.12.2011
ClassificationInternational:G09G3/34
[2013/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/15]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER REAKTIONSZEIT VON FLÜSSIGKRISTALL-DISPLAYS[2013/15]
English:DEVICE AND METHOD FOR IMPROVING THE RESPONSE TIME OF LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAYS[2013/15]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT D'AMÉLIORER LE TEMPS DE RÉACTION D'ÉCRANS À CRISTAUX LIQUIDES[2013/15]
Entry into regional phase02.01.2013National basic fee paid 
02.01.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
02.01.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.01.2013Examination requested  [2013/15]
01.08.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.03.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.07.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.12.2015Date of oral proceedings
20.01.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
20.01.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination18.03.2016Appeal received No.  T1496/16
20.05.2016Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.03.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
24.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
23.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
26.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP1372022  (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 1-5,7,8 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0031]; figures 1,2 * [Y] 6,9,10;
 [XY]US6133979  (KOMATSU HIROSHI [KR], et al) [X] 1-5,7,8 * column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 62; figures 4,6 * [Y] 6,9,10;
 [Y]US2002021292  (SAKASHITA YUKIHIKO [JP]) [Y] 6,9,10 * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0071] * * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0081]; figure 2 *;
 [Y]US2006127081  (LEE SANG-JIN [KR], et al) [Y] 6,9,10 * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0068]; figure 1 *
by applicantEP1973092
 EP0438093