Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2553531

EP2553531 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ENCODING THREE-DIMENSIONAL SCENES WHICH INCLUDE TRANSPARENT OBJECTS IN A HOLOGRAPHIC SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.09.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.09.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 16.10.2019 [2019/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SeeReal Technologies S.A.
212, Rue Principale
5366 Munsbach / LU
[2017/34]
Former [2013/06]For all designated states
SeeReal Technologies S.A.
6B, Parc d'Activités Syrdall
5365 Munsbach / LU
Inventor(s)01 / ZSCHAU, Enrico
Struppener Str. 93
01259 Dresden / DE
02 / PFEIFER, Nils
Voglerstr. 10
01277 Dresden / DE
 [2013/06]
Representative(s)Helbig, Nicole , et al
SeeReal Technologies GmbH
Sudhausweg 5
01099 Dresden / DE
[2019/42]
Former [2013/06]Bradl, Joachim
SeeReal Technologies GmbH
Sudhausweg 5
01099 Dresden / DE
Application number, filing date11716192.701.04.2011
[2019/42]
WO2011EP55144
Priority number, dateEP2010015899601.04.2010         Original published format: EP 10158996
[2013/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2011121130
Date:06.10.2011
Language:EN
[2011/40]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2553531
Date:06.02.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2011
[2013/06]
Type: B1  Patent specification
No.:EP2553531
Date:16.10.2019
Language:EN
[2019/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.12.2011
ClassificationInternational:G03H1/08, H04S5/00, H04S7/00
[2019/18]
Former International [2013/06]G03H1/08, G03H3/00, H04S5/00, H04S7/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/06]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR CODIERUNG DREIDIMENSIONALER SZENEN MT TRANSPARENTEN OBJEKTEN IN EINEM HOLOGRAFISCHEN SYSTEM[2013/06]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ENCODING THREE-DIMENSIONAL SCENES WHICH INCLUDE TRANSPARENT OBJECTS IN A HOLOGRAPHIC SYSTEM[2013/06]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE CODAGE DE SCÈNES TRIDIMENSIONNELLES QUI COMPRENNENT DES OBJETS TRANSPARENTS DANS UN SYSTÈME HOLOGRAPHIQUE[2013/06]
Entry into regional phase30.10.2012National basic fee paid 
30.10.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
30.10.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.10.2012Examination requested  [2013/06]
27.05.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.09.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
13.11.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.05.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.09.2019Fee for grant paid
04.09.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.09.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.09.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
14.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
28.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
11.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
27.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
11.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
11.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Cited inInternational search[XY]JPH10288938  (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) [X] 1,7 * the whole document * [Y] 2-6,10-13;
 [Y]US2010073744  (ZSCHAU ENRICO [DE] ET AL) [Y] 2,5,10-13 * paragraph [0028]; figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]US2007216978  (KITAMURA MITSURU [JP] ET AL) [Y] 6 * abstract *;
 [Y]  - YAMAGUCHI K ET AL, "Computer generated hologram with characteristics of reflection: reflectance distributions and reflected images", APPLIED OPTICS, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, (20091201), vol. 48, no. 34, doi:DOI:10.1364/AO.48.00H203, ISSN 0003-6935, pages H203 - H211, XP001550274 [Y] 3,4 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.48.00H203
 [A]  - EZURA K ET AL, "Computer-generated holograms considering multiple reflection,transmission, and shadow on object surfaces", PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE, SPIE, USA, (20031231), vol. 5290, doi:DOI:DOI:10.1117/12.526443, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 106 - 113, XP040254155 [A] 1-7 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/
by applicantDE10353439
 WO2006066919
 US7030887
    - HOFFMAN, D. M., GIRSHICK, A. R., AKELEY, K., BANKS, M. S., "Vergence-accommodation conflicts hinder visual performance and cause visual fatigue", J. VIS., vol. 8, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1167/8.3.33, (2008), pages 1 - 30, URL: http://journalofvision.org/8/3/33/, XP055327692

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1167/8.3.33
    - ST-HILAIRE, P., BENTON, S. A., LUCENTE, M. E., SUTTER, J. D., PLESNIAK, W. J., "Advances in holographic video", PROC. SPIE, (1993), pages 188 - 196, URL: http://link.aip.org/link/?PSI/1914/188/1
    - BURCKHARDT, C. B., "A Simplification of Lee's Method of Generating Holograms by Computer", APPL. OPT., vol. 9, no. 8, (1970), pages 1949 - 1949, URL: http://ao.osa.org/abstract.cfm?URI=ao-9-8-1949, XP009021043
    - HSUEH, C. K., SAWCHUK, A. A., "Computer-generated double-phase holograms", APPL. OPT., vol. 17, no. 24, doi:doi:10.1364/AO.17.003874, (1978), pages 3874 - 3883, URL: http://ao.osa.org/abstract.cfm?URI=ao-17-24-3874, XP007902454

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.17.003874
    - GREGORY, D. A., KIRSCH, J. C., TAM, E. C., "Full complex modulation using liquidcrystal televisions", APPL. OPT., vol. 31, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1364/AO.31.000163, (1992), pages 163 - 165, URL: http://ao.osa.org/abstract.cfrm?URI=ao-31-2-163, XP000246862

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.31.000163
    - N. LEISTER, A., SCHWERDTNER, G., FUTTERER, S., BUSCHBECK, J.-C., OLAYA, S. FLON, "Full-color interactive holographic projection system for large 3D scene reconstruction", PROC. SPIE, vol. 69110V, (2008), page 6911, URL: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.761713
    - HAUSSLER, R., REICHELT, S., LEISTER, N., ZSCHAU, E., MISSBACH, R., SCHWERDTNER, A., "Large real-time holographic displays: from prototypes to a consumer product", PROC. SPIE, vol. 7237, (2009), page 72370S, URL: http://link.aip.org/link/?PSI/7237/72370S/1