Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2566937

EP2566937 - USE OF SOLVENT TO DECREASE CAUSTIC SCRUBBER FOULING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.04.2016
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip08.04.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.05.2016  [2016/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Total Research & Technology Feluy
Zone Industrielle C
7181 Seneffe / BE
[2013/21]
Former [2013/11]For all designated states
Total Petrochemicals Research Feluy
Zone Industrielle C
7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE
Inventor(s)01 / THORET BAUCHET, Jean-Pierre
Rue de Calevoet 110H
B-1180 Bruxelles / BE
 [2013/11]
Representative(s)Raboin, Jean-Christophe , et al
Total Research & Technology Feluy
Zone Industrielle C
7181 Seneffe / BE
[N/P]
Former [2013/11]Leyder, Francis
Total Petrochemicals Reseach Feluy
Zone Industrielle C
7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE
Application number, filing date11716594.403.05.2011
WO2011EP57007
Priority number, dateEP2010016229007.05.2010         Original published format: EP 10162290
[2013/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2011138305
Date:10.11.2011
Language:EN
[2011/45]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2566937
Date:13.03.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2011
[2013/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.12.2012
ClassificationInternational:C10G3/00, C10G9/00, C10G19/02, C10G21/14, C10G70/06, C10G75/04, C07C1/20, C10G53/04, C10G53/12, C10G55/04
[2013/11]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/11]
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG VON LÖSUNGSMITTEL ZUR SENKUNG DER KAUSTISCHEN WÄSCHERFAULUNG[2013/11]
English:USE OF SOLVENT TO DECREASE CAUSTIC SCRUBBER FOULING[2013/11]
French:UTILISATION D'UN SOLVANT POUR RÉDUIRE L'ENCRASSEMENT D'UN ÉPURATEUR CAUSTIQUE[2013/11]
Entry into regional phase07.11.2012National basic fee paid 
07.11.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
07.11.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.11.2012Examination requested  [2013/11]
09.07.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.12.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/19]
08.01.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2016/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201505   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[I]WO0164609  (EXXONMOBIL CHEM PATENTS INC [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * figure 1; claim 1 * * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 3, paragraph 2 * * page 6, paragraph 2 *;
 [X]US5582808  (PATEK GARY [US]) [X] 1-14 * claims 1,8 * * column 1, line 25 - line 55 * * column 2, line 29 - line 32 * * column 3, line 6 - line 10 *;
 [X]US5770041  (LEWIS VINCENT E [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * column 5, line 46 - line 59; claims 1,8 *;
 [I]US3696162  (KNIEL LUDWIG) [I] 1-14 * column 2, line 16 - line 23; claims 1,2,4 * * column 1, line 8 - line 10 *;
 [I]WO03104170  (UOP LLC [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * page 17, line 7 - line 17; figure 4 *;
 [I]WO9943406  (STONE & WEBSTER ENG CORP [US]) [I] 1-14 * page 1 - page 6; figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [I]US4343777  (DANNHORN ERICH, et al) [I] 1-14 * figure 2; claim 1 *
by applicantUS5582808
 US5770041
 US5714055
 US5194143
 US6372121
 US4952301
 US5220104
 US4673489
 EP0264280