EP2563614 - DISPATCH CONTROLLER FOR A DISTRIBUTED ELECTRICAL POWER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.11.2013 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DONG Energy A/S Kraftværksvej 53 Skærbæk 7000 Fredericia / DK | [2013/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANSEN, Lars, Henrik Stendyssevej 9 Gundso̸magle DK-4000 Roskilde / DK | [2013/10] | Representative(s) | Zacco Denmark A/S Arne Jacobsens Allé 15 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2013/10] | Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | Application number, filing date | 11716877.3 | 20.04.2011 | WO2011EP56328 | Priority number, date | DK20100070169 | 26.04.2010 Original published format: DK 201070169 | [2013/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011134861 | Date: | 03.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2563614 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B60L11/18, H02J3/14, H02J7/00 | [2013/10] | CPC: |
B60L53/30 (EP,US);
H02J3/144 (EP,US);
H02J7/0013 (EP,US);
B60L2240/70 (EP,US);
H02J2310/54 (EP);
H02J2310/60 (EP);
H02J2310/64 (EP);
Y02B70/3225 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
Y02T10/7072 (EP,US);
Y02T10/72 (EP,US);
Y02T90/12 (EP,US);
Y02T90/14 (US);
Y02T90/16 (EP,US);
Y02T90/167 (EP,US);
Y04S20/222 (EP,US);
Y04S30/12 (EP,US);
Y04S30/14 (EP);
Y04S50/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/10] | Title | German: | LIEFERSTSTEUERUNG FÜR EIN VERTEILTES STROMSYSTEM | [2013/10] | English: | DISPATCH CONTROLLER FOR A DISTRIBUTED ELECTRICAL POWER SYSTEM | [2013/10] | French: | UNITÉ DE COMMANDE DE DISTRIBUTION POUR SYSTÈME D'ÉNERGIE ÉLECTRIQUE DISTRIBUÉ | [2013/10] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/10] | 15.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/50] | 23.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2013/50] | 24.07.2013 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH08116626 (NISSAN MOTOR) [Y] 1,5-18,21-27 * figures 1,2,6,7 *; | [A]US5594318 (NOR JIRI K [CA], et al) [A] 1-27 * column 12, line 32 - column 15, line 23; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]JPH1080071 (JAPAN STORAGE BATTERY CO LTD, et al) [Y] 1,5-18,21-27 * abstract *; | [A]US2009091291 (WOODY GEORGE R [US], et al) [A] 1-27* paragraphs [0044] - [0049] - [0054] , [0055]; figures 1,3,4 *; | [YA]WO2009069481 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1,5-18,21-27 * the whole document * [A] 2-4,19,20; | EP2219278 [ ] (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [ ] * used as translation document; paragraphs [0057] - [0064] - [0078] - [0088]; figures 1-10 * | by applicant | US2008039979 | US2009210357 |