Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2561311

EP2561311 - OPERATION OF A COORDINATE MEASURING MACHINE OR A MACHINE TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2013/09]OPERATION OF A COORDINATE MEASURING MACHINE OR A MACHINE TOOL
[2014/44]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.10.2014
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Carl Zeiss Industrielle Messtechnik GmbH
Carl-Zeiss-Strasse 22
73447 Oberkochen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/09]For all designated states
Carl Zeiss Industrielle Messtechnik GmbH
Carl Zeiss Strasse 22
73447 Oberkochen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SCHON, Henning
Galgenbergstrasse 11
73431 Aalen / DE
02 / BURGER, Jochen
Bayernweg 23
89522 Heidenheim / DE
03 / GRUPP, Günter
Friedhofstrasse 32
89558 Böhmenkirch / DE
04 / RUCK, Otto
Nelkenstrasse 9
73479 Pfahlheim / DE
05 / AUBELE, Eugen
Poststrasse 5
89558 Böhmenkirch / DE
06 / BERNHARD, Ralf
Albstrasse 115
73432 Aalen / DE
 [2013/09]
Representative(s)Patentanwälte Bressel und Partner mbB
Potsdamer Platz 10
10785 Berlin / DE
[2014/44]
Former [2013/09]Patentanwälte Bressel und Partner
Potsdamer Platz 10
10785 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date11717500.018.04.2011
WO2011EP02103
Priority number, dateDE2010101578020.04.2010         Original published format: DE102010015780
[2013/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011131375
Date:27.10.2011
Language:DE
[2011/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2561311
Date:27.02.2013
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2011
[2013/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2561311
Date:29.10.2014
Language:DE
[2014/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.10.2011
ClassificationInternational:G01B5/008, G01B21/04
[2013/09]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/09]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:BETRIEB EINER KOORDINATENMESSMASCHINE ODER EINER WERKZEUGMASCHINE[2014/44]
English:OPERATION OF A COORDINATE MEASURING MACHINE OR A MACHINE TOOL[2014/44]
French:OPERATION D'UNE MACHINE DE MESURE DE COORDONNÉES OU D'UNE MACHINE OUTIL[2014/44]
Former [2013/09]BETRIEB EINER KOORDINATENMESSMASCHINE ODER EINER WERKZEUGMASCHINE
Former [2013/09]OPERATION OF A COORDINATE MEASURING MACHINE OR A MACHINE TOOL
Former [2013/09]FONCTIONNEMENT D'UNE MACHINE DE MESURE DE COORDONNÉES OU D'UNE MACHINE OUTIL
Entry into regional phase31.08.2012National basic fee paid 
31.08.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
31.08.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.12.2011Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
31.08.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.08.2012Examination requested  [2013/09]
22.05.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.09.2014Fee for grant paid
22.09.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.09.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.05.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  29.07.2015  11.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1
80333 München / DE
 [2017/41]
Former [2015/36]
Opponent(s)01  29.07.2015   
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
04.09.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
03.03.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
30.05.2017Date of oral proceedings
21.08.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
21.08.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition19.10.2017Appeal received No.  T2402/17
02.01.2018Statement of grounds filed
30.10.2017Appeal received No.  T2402/17
29.12.2017Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
25.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU18.04.2011
AL29.10.2014
BG29.10.2014
CY29.10.2014
CZ29.10.2014
DK29.10.2014
EE29.10.2014
ES29.10.2014
FI29.10.2014
HR29.10.2014
LT29.10.2014
LV29.10.2014
MC29.10.2014
MK29.10.2014
MT29.10.2014
NL29.10.2014
PL29.10.2014
RO29.10.2014
RS29.10.2014
SE29.10.2014
SI29.10.2014
SK29.10.2014
SM29.10.2014
TR29.10.2014
NO29.01.2015
GR30.01.2015
IS28.02.2015
PT02.03.2015
IE18.04.2015
LU18.04.2015
BE30.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
FR30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
AT18.04.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU18.04.2011
BG29.10.2014
CY29.10.2014
CZ29.10.2014
DK29.10.2014
EE29.10.2014
ES29.10.2014
FI29.10.2014
HR29.10.2014
LT29.10.2014
LV29.10.2014
MC29.10.2014
MK29.10.2014
MT29.10.2014
NL29.10.2014
PL29.10.2014
RO29.10.2014
RS29.10.2014
SE29.10.2014
SI29.10.2014
SK29.10.2014
SM29.10.2014
TR29.10.2014
NO29.01.2015
GR30.01.2015
IS28.02.2015
PT02.03.2015
IE18.04.2015
LU18.04.2015
BE30.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
FR30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
AT18.04.2016
Former [2017/38]HU18.04.2011
BG29.10.2014
CY29.10.2014
CZ29.10.2014
DK29.10.2014
EE29.10.2014
ES29.10.2014
FI29.10.2014
HR29.10.2014
LT29.10.2014
LV29.10.2014
MC29.10.2014
MT29.10.2014
NL29.10.2014
PL29.10.2014
RO29.10.2014
RS29.10.2014
SE29.10.2014
SI29.10.2014
SK29.10.2014
SM29.10.2014
TR29.10.2014
NO29.01.2015
GR30.01.2015
IS28.02.2015
PT02.03.2015
IE18.04.2015
LU18.04.2015
BE30.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
FR30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
AT18.04.2016
Former [2017/03]CY29.10.2014
CZ29.10.2014
DK29.10.2014
EE29.10.2014
ES29.10.2014
FI29.10.2014
HR29.10.2014
LT29.10.2014
LV29.10.2014
MC29.10.2014
MT29.10.2014
NL29.10.2014
PL29.10.2014
RO29.10.2014
RS29.10.2014
SE29.10.2014
SI29.10.2014
SK29.10.2014
NO29.01.2015
GR30.01.2015
IS28.02.2015
PT02.03.2015
IE18.04.2015
LU18.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
FR30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
Former [2016/20]CY29.10.2014
CZ29.10.2014
DK29.10.2014
EE29.10.2014
ES29.10.2014
FI29.10.2014
HR29.10.2014
LT29.10.2014
LV29.10.2014
MC29.10.2014
NL29.10.2014
PL29.10.2014
RO29.10.2014
RS29.10.2014
SE29.10.2014
SI29.10.2014
SK29.10.2014
NO29.01.2015
GR30.01.2015
IS28.02.2015
PT02.03.2015
IE18.04.2015
LU18.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
FR30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
Former [2016/12]CY29.10.2014
CZ29.10.2014
DK29.10.2014
EE29.10.2014
ES29.10.2014
FI29.10.2014
HR29.10.2014
LT29.10.2014
LV29.10.2014
MC29.10.2014
NL29.10.2014
PL29.10.2014
RO29.10.2014
RS29.10.2014
SE29.10.2014
SI29.10.2014
SK29.10.2014
NO29.01.2015
GR30.01.2015
IS28.02.2015
PT02.03.2015
LU18.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
FR30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
Former [2016/06]CY29.10.2014
CZ29.10.2014
DK29.10.2014
EE29.10.2014
ES29.10.2014
FI29.10.2014
HR29.10.2014
LT29.10.2014
LV29.10.2014
MC29.10.2014
NL29.10.2014
PL29.10.2014
RO29.10.2014
RS29.10.2014
SE29.10.2014
SK29.10.2014
NO29.01.2015
GR30.01.2015
IS28.02.2015
PT02.03.2015
LU18.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
Former [2016/01]CY29.10.2014
CZ29.10.2014
DK29.10.2014
EE29.10.2014
ES29.10.2014
FI29.10.2014
HR29.10.2014
LT29.10.2014
LV29.10.2014
MC29.10.2014
NL29.10.2014
PL29.10.2014
RO29.10.2014
RS29.10.2014
SE29.10.2014
SK29.10.2014
NO29.01.2015
GR30.01.2015
IS28.02.2015
PT02.03.2015
LU18.04.2015
Former [2015/52]CY29.10.2014
CZ29.10.2014
DK29.10.2014
EE29.10.2014
ES29.10.2014
FI29.10.2014
HR29.10.2014
LT29.10.2014
LV29.10.2014
NL29.10.2014
PL29.10.2014
RO29.10.2014
RS29.10.2014
SE29.10.2014
SK29.10.2014
NO29.01.2015
GR30.01.2015
IS28.02.2015
PT02.03.2015
LU18.04.2015
Former [2015/37]CY29.10.2014
CZ29.10.2014
DK29.10.2014
EE29.10.2014
ES29.10.2014
FI29.10.2014
HR29.10.2014
LT29.10.2014
LV29.10.2014
NL29.10.2014
PL29.10.2014
RO29.10.2014
RS29.10.2014
SE29.10.2014
SK29.10.2014
NO29.01.2015
GR30.01.2015
IS28.02.2015
PT02.03.2015
Former [2015/36]CY29.10.2014
CZ29.10.2014
DK29.10.2014
EE29.10.2014
ES29.10.2014
FI29.10.2014
HR29.10.2014
LT29.10.2014
LV29.10.2014
NL29.10.2014
PL29.10.2014
RO29.10.2014
RS29.10.2014
SE29.10.2014
NO29.01.2015
GR30.01.2015
IS28.02.2015
PT02.03.2015
Former [2015/35]CY29.10.2014
DK29.10.2014
EE29.10.2014
ES29.10.2014
FI29.10.2014
HR29.10.2014
LT29.10.2014
LV29.10.2014
NL29.10.2014
PL29.10.2014
RS29.10.2014
SE29.10.2014
NO29.01.2015
GR30.01.2015
IS28.02.2015
PT02.03.2015
Former [2015/26]CY29.10.2014
ES29.10.2014
FI29.10.2014
HR29.10.2014
LT29.10.2014
LV29.10.2014
NL29.10.2014
PL29.10.2014
RS29.10.2014
SE29.10.2014
NO29.01.2015
GR30.01.2015
IS28.02.2015
PT02.03.2015
Former [2015/24]ES29.10.2014
FI29.10.2014
HR29.10.2014
LT29.10.2014
LV29.10.2014
NL29.10.2014
PL29.10.2014
RS29.10.2014
SE29.10.2014
NO29.01.2015
GR30.01.2015
IS28.02.2015
PT02.03.2015
Former [2015/23]ES29.10.2014
FI29.10.2014
LT29.10.2014
NL29.10.2014
NO29.01.2015
IS28.02.2015
PT02.03.2015
Former [2015/22]LT29.10.2014
NO29.01.2015
PT02.03.2015
Former [2015/21]LT29.10.2014
NO29.01.2015
Former [2015/20]LT29.10.2014
Cited inInternational search[X]DE19960191  (ZEISS CARL [DE]) [X] 1-6 * paragraph [0002]; figure 1 *;
 [X]DE10229821  (ZEISS CARL [DE]) [X] 1-6 * column 2, line 29 - column 6, line 10; figures 1-4 *;
 [X]US2009055118  (MCLEAN IAN WILLIAM [GB], et al) [X] 1-6 * paragraph [0118] - paragraph [0118]; figures 1-18 *
by applicantDE10229821
 DE19960191
 US2009055118