Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2561311 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2561311



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 554
24.07.2018 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
28.05.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.05.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
23.05.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
23.05.2018 Reply to appeal Appeal 8
24.01.2018 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
24.01.2018 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
04.01.2018 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 16
04.01.2018 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 3
02.01.2018 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 3
29.12.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
29.12.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
29.12.2017 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 3
06.11.2017 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
06.11.2017 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
02.11.2017 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
02.11.2017 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
30.10.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
30.10.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
30.10.2017 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
23.10.2017 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
19.10.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
19.10.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
19.10.2017 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
07.09.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.08.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
23.08.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.08.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.08.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
21.08.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
21.08.2017 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
21.08.2017 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
21.08.2017 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 18
21.08.2017 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 6
21.08.2017 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
21.08.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
21.08.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
21.08.2017 Means of redress Search / examination 2
21.08.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
21.08.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
21.08.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
21.08.2017 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
21.08.2017 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 4
30.05.2017 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 3
19.05.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
08.05.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 46
04.05.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
02.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
02.05.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 5
02.05.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
02.05.2017 Amended description with annotations Opposition 2
02.05.2017 Amended description with annotations Opposition 2
02.05.2017 Amended description with annotations Opposition 1
02.05.2017 Claims Opposition 5
02.05.2017 Description Opposition 2
02.05.2017 Description Opposition 1
02.05.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
02.05.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 7
02.05.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
02.05.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
28.04.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.04.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
28.03.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.11.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.11.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.11.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.11.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.11.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
02.11.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
02.11.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.11.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.10.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
25.10.2016 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.10.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Opposition 2
07.10.2016 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
10.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
03.03.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
03.03.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
03.03.2016 Claims Opposition 2
03.03.2016 Claims Opposition 2
03.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
03.03.2016 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 6
22.12.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
22.12.2015 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
16.12.2015 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
04.09.2015 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
04.09.2015 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 2
18.08.2015 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
31.07.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
31.07.2015 Non-scannable object Opposition 4
31.07.2015 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
31.07.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
31.07.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 42
31.07.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
29.07.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
29.07.2015 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
29.07.2015 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
31.10.2014 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
02.10.2014 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
22.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.09.2014 English translation of the claims Search / examination 2
22.09.2014 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
22.09.2014 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
22.09.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
22.05.2014 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
22.05.2014 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
22.05.2014 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
22.05.2014 Text intended for grant Search / examination 17
28.04.2014 Examination started Search / examination 1
17.12.2013 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
30.01.2013 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
18.01.2013 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
15.01.2013 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
10.12.2012 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
23.11.2012 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.11.2012 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.11.2012 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.11.2012 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.11.2012 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.11.2012 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
21.11.2012 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
21.11.2012 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 2
21.11.2012 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 6
31.10.2012 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 6
12.09.2012 Annex to International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 7
12.09.2012 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
12.09.2012 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
12.09.2012 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
12.09.2012 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
12.09.2012 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
12.09.2012 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
12.09.2012 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
12.09.2012 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
31.08.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
31.08.2012 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 3
31.08.2012 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
31.08.2012 Description Search / examination 3
31.08.2012 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
31.08.2012 Priority search results Search / examination 2
31.08.2012 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
20.07.2012 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
20.07.2012 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
20.07.2012 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
20.07.2012 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
20.07.2012 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
20.07.2012 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
20.07.2012 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
20.07.2012 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
26.03.2012 Document concerning fees and payments PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
08.03.2012 Invitation to pay prescribed fees together with late payment fee (Rule 58bis PCT) PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
08.03.2012 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
22.02.2012 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
09.02.2012 Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
26.01.2012 Republication of front page of international application with corrected bibliographic data Search / examination 2
13.01.2012 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
13.01.2012 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
22.12.2011 Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable Search / examination 1
22.12.2011 Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable PCT receiving Office 1
20.12.2011 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
20.12.2011 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
20.12.2011 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
16.11.2011 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 20
27.10.2011 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
27.10.2011 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
27.10.2011 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 18
25.08.2011 Notification relating to declaration under Rule 4.17 PCT (copy for ISA/EP) PCT receiving Office 1
10.08.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
10.08.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
10.08.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
09.08.2011 Document concerning representation PCT receiving Office 6
18.04.2011 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
18.04.2011 Claims PCT receiving Office 2
18.04.2011 Description PCT receiving Office 11
18.04.2011 Drawings PCT receiving Office 3