Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2561311


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
29.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.08.2018  [2018/31]
19.01.2018 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
31.10.2017 New entry: Appeal number
31.10.2017 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
27.10.2017 Change: Appeal number
23.10.2017 New entry: Appeal number
23.10.2017 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
13.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.11.2017  [2017/46]
06.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.11.2017  [2017/45]
08.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.10.2017  [2017/41]
08.09.2017 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  11.10.2017  [2017/41]
01.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.10.2017  [2017/40]
25.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.09.2017  [2017/39]
20.08.2017 New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision
20.08.2017 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
18.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.09.2017  [2017/38]
16.12.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.01.2017  [2017/03]
01.11.2016 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
15.04.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.05.2016  [2016/20]
07.03.2016 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
19.02.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.03.2016  [2016/12]
08.01.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.02.2016  [2016/06]
18.12.2015 Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
04.12.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.01.2016  [2016/01]
20.11.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.12.2015  [2015/52]
03.09.2015 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
07.08.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.09.2015  [2015/37]
31.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.09.2015  [2015/36]
31.07.2015 Opposition filed published on  02.09.2015  [2015/36]
24.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.08.2015  [2015/35]
22.05.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.06.2015  [2015/26]
08.05.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.06.2015  [2015/24]
01.05.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.06.2015  [2015/23]
24.04.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.05.2015  [2015/22]
17.04.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.05.2015  [2015/21]
10.04.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.05.2015  [2015/20]
03.10.2014 (Expected) grant published on  29.10.2014  [2014/44]
24.09.2014 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
24.09.2014 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
24.09.2014 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
21.05.2014 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
02.05.2014 Change - French title published on  04.06.2014  [2014/23]
28.03.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.06.2013 Change - extension states published on  24.07.2013  [2013/30]
26.04.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.01.2013 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  27.02.2013  [2013/09]
25.01.2013 Request for examination filed published on  27.02.2013  [2013/09]
07.09.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
07.09.2012 Amendment by applicant
23.02.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
14.02.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
04.02.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
11.11.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
28.10.2011 PCT data prior to European publication