Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2561311 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201180019809 EP11717500



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9207059Global Dossier 08.12.2015B2
US2013041497 14.02.2013A1
Priority number Date
DE102010015780 20.04.2010
WO2011EP02103 18.04.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN102859315BGlobal Dossier 20.04.2016B
CN102859315 02.01.2013A
Priority number Date
DE102010015780 20.04.2010
WO2011EP02103 18.04.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2561311Global Dossier 29.10.2014B1
EP2561311 27.02.2013A1
Priority number Date
DE102010015780 20.04.2010
WO2011EP02103 18.04.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2011131375Global Dossier 26.01.2012A8
WO2011131375 27.10.2011A1
Priority number Date
DE102010015780 20.04.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE102010015780 20.10.2011A1
Priority number Date
DE102010015780 20.04.2010