Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2608890

EP2608890 - SPRAY GUN WITH PAINT CARTRIDGE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.11.2015
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.10.2019New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SATA GmbH & Co. KG
Domertalstrasse 20
70806 Kornwestheim / DE
For all designated states
Fox, Jeffrey D.
10935 Kellogg Court
Nerstrand, MN 55053 / US
[2013/27]
Inventor(s)01 / FOX, Jeffrey D.
10935 Kellogg Court
Nerstrand, Minnesota 55053 / US
02 / BROSE, Jens
Kreuzäckerstr. 34
74354 Ottmarsheim / DE
03 / SCHMON, Ewald
Brunnenstr. 5/1
72661 Grafenberg / DE
 [2013/27]
Representative(s)Charrier Rapp & Liebau
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Fuggerstraße 20
86150 Augsburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/27]Charrier, Rapp & Liebau
Patentanwälte Fuggerstrasse 20
86150 Augsburg / DE
Application number, filing date11719543.812.05.2011
WO2011EP57655
Priority number, dateUS20111304201407.03.2011         Original published format: US201113042014
[2013/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012119664
Date:13.09.2012
Language:EN
[2012/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2608890
Date:03.07.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.2012
[2013/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.09.2012
ClassificationInternational:B05B1/30
[2013/27]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/27]
TitleGerman:SPRITZPISTOLE MIT FARBPATRONE[2013/27]
English:SPRAY GUN WITH PAINT CARTRIDGE[2013/27]
French:PISTOLET DE PULVÉRISATION AVEC CARTOUCHE DE PEINTURE[2013/27]
Entry into regional phase28.03.2013National basic fee paid 
28.03.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
28.03.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.03.2013Examination requested  [2013/27]
20.12.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
23.01.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.03.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.04.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.11.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.03.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination18.03.2016Appeal received No.  T1202/16
29.04.2016Statement of grounds filed
14.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.03.2015
Request for further processing for:24.01.2014Request for further processing filed
24.01.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
10.02.2014Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
22.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
27.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
31.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
31.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
01.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
21.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Cited inInternational search[X]US2007164129  (DONER AUGUST K [US], et al) [X] 1,3-17 * paragraphs [0036] - [0045]; figures 1-5 *;
 [X]US2005145724  (BLETTE RUSSELL E [US], et al) [X] 1,3-17 * paragraphs [0008] , [0 27] - [0035]; figure - *;
 [X]US2010187333  (ESCOTO JR JOHN I [US], et al) [X] 1,3-17 * paragraphs [0064] - [0120]; figure - *;
 [X]EP1964616  (RUDA MARTIN [DE]) [X] 13 * figure - *;
 [E]US2011168811  (FOX JEFFREY D [US], et al) [E] 1-17 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4562965  (IHMELS MANFRED [DE], et al) [A] 1,13 * column 3, lines 25-27; figure - *;
 [A]WO2009015260  (FOX JEFFREY D [US]) [A] 1,13 * the whole document *
by applicantWO2009015260