Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2608890 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2608890



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 259
08.11.2019 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 1
08.11.2019 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 6
25.10.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
24.10.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
21.10.2019 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
16.10.2019 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
02.10.2019 F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
29.09.2016 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
01.06.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
01.06.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
25.05.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
24.05.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
23.05.2016 F3045 Inadmissibility of the appeal: missing address / missing name Appeal 2
23.05.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
10.05.2016 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
29.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
29.04.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
29.04.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
29.04.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
29.04.2016 Claims Appeal 1
29.04.2016 Claims Appeal 4
29.04.2016 Claims Appeal 1
29.04.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
29.04.2016 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 9
18.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
18.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
18.03.2016 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
11.03.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
09.03.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
08.03.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
08.03.2016 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
08.03.2016 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
08.03.2016 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 5
08.03.2016 Means of redress Search / examination 2
05.11.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.11.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
05.11.2015 Claims Search / examination 4
05.11.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.11.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
29.07.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
29.07.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
27.05.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
17.04.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
17.04.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
17.04.2015 Claims Search / examination 4
17.04.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
17.04.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
30.03.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
30.03.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
24.03.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
22.05.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
10.02.2014 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
31.01.2014 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
31.01.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
29.01.2014 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
24.01.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
24.01.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
24.01.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
24.01.2014 Description Search / examination 10
24.01.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
23.01.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
23.01.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
23.01.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
23.01.2014 Description Search / examination 10
20.12.2013 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 1
11.10.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.10.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.10.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
24.09.2013 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
05.06.2013 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
06.05.2013 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
28.03.2013 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
25.03.2013 Information regarding early processing Search / examination 2
19.03.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.03.2013 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
02.10.2012 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 33
13.09.2012 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
13.09.2012 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 20
27.12.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
27.12.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
27.12.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
12.05.2011 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
12.05.2011 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
12.05.2011 Claims PCT receiving Office 3
12.05.2011 Description PCT receiving Office 9
12.05.2011 Drawings PCT receiving Office 7