Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2608890


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
20.10.2019 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
24.05.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.06.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.06.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.06.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.05.2016 Change: Appeal number
04.05.2016 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of appeal
22.03.2016 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
22.03.2016 New entry: Appeal number
07.03.2016 New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused
06.11.2015 New entry: Reply to examination report
07.08.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
02.06.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.04.2015 New entry: Reply to examination report
10.04.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
27.03.2015 First examination report
29.05.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.05.2014 Change - extension states published on  11.06.2014  [2014/24]
05.02.2014 New entry: Decision on request for further processing
05.02.2014 Amendment by applicant
05.02.2014 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
01.02.2014 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
20.12.2013 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
05.06.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
31.05.2013 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  03.07.2013  [2013/27]
31.05.2013 Request for examination filed published on  03.07.2013  [2013/27]
19.04.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
12.04.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
20.03.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
26.09.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
14.09.2012 PCT data prior to European publication