Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2564230

EP2564230 - DEVICE FOR ROUND TRIP TIME MEASUREMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.07.2019
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.07.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.03.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip20.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 22.01.2020  [2020/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego CA 92121-1714 / US
[2013/10]
Inventor(s)01 / DAS, Saumitra Mohan
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / AGGARWAL, Alok
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
03 / NAGUIB, Ayman Fawzy
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
04 / HARDIE, Edward Thomas Lingham
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2013/10]
Representative(s)Loveless, Ian Mark
Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building
10 Whitechapel High Street
London E1 8QS / GB
[2018/35]
Former [2013/10]Loveless, Ian Mark
Reddie & Grose LLP
16 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date11720239.029.04.2011
[2018/35]
WO2011US34677
Priority number, dateUS2010077202930.04.2010         Original published format: US 772029
[2013/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011137396
Date:03.11.2011
Language:EN
[2011/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2564230
Date:06.03.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2011
[2013/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2564230
Date:29.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.11.2011
ClassificationInternational:G01S5/14, G01S13/46, G01S13/82, H04W24/10, H04W4/80, // H04W84/10, H04W64/00
[2018/13]
Former International [2013/10]G01S5/14
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/10]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ZEITMESSUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR HIN- UND RÜCKFAHRTEN[2013/10]
English:DEVICE FOR ROUND TRIP TIME MEASUREMENTS[2013/10]
French:DISPOSITIF DE MESURE DE TEMPS DE PROPAGATION EN BOUCLE[2013/10]
Entry into regional phase12.11.2012National basic fee paid 
12.11.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
12.11.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.10.2011Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.11.2012Examination requested  [2013/10]
22.07.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.01.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.05.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.03.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.07.2018Fee for grant paid
19.07.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.07.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.01.2017
Opposition(s)31.05.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
08.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
10.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
09.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL29.08.2018
AT29.08.2018
CZ29.08.2018
DK29.08.2018
EE29.08.2018
ES29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
IT29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
MC29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
PL29.08.2018
RO29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
SI29.08.2018
SK29.08.2018
SM29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
LU29.04.2019
[2020/04]
Former [2020/02]AL29.08.2018
AT29.08.2018
CZ29.08.2018
DK29.08.2018
EE29.08.2018
ES29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
IT29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
MC29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
PL29.08.2018
RO29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
SI29.08.2018
SK29.08.2018
SM29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/37]AL29.08.2018
AT29.08.2018
CZ29.08.2018
DK29.08.2018
EE29.08.2018
ES29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
IT29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
PL29.08.2018
RO29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
SI29.08.2018
SK29.08.2018
SM29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/26]AL29.08.2018
AT29.08.2018
CZ29.08.2018
DK29.08.2018
EE29.08.2018
ES29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
IT29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
PL29.08.2018
RO29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
SK29.08.2018
SM29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/23]AL29.08.2018
AT29.08.2018
CZ29.08.2018
EE29.08.2018
ES29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
IT29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
PL29.08.2018
RO29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
SK29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/22]AL29.08.2018
CZ29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
IT29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
PL29.08.2018
RO29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/21]AL29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
IT29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/11]FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/10]FI29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/09]FI29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
NO29.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
NO29.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT29.08.2018
Cited inInternational search[XP]WO2010059934  (QUALCOMM INC [US]; AGGARWAL ALOK [US]; NAGUIB AYMAN FAWZY [US]; SRIDHA) [XP] 1-29 * abstract * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0071] *
 [X]  - ANDRÉ GÜNTHER, CHRISTIAN HOENE, "Measuring Round Trip Times to Determine the Distance between WLAN Nodes", PROCEEDINGS OF NETWORKING 2005, Waterloo, Canada, (20050506), pages 1 - 12, XP002655207 [X] 1-29 * pages 1-6; figure 1 *
 [A]  - GOLDEN S A ET AL, "Sensor Measurements for Wi-Fi Location with Emphasis on Time-of-Arrival Ranging", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MOBILE COMPUTING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, US, (20071001), vol. 6, no. 10, doi:DOI:10.1109/TMC.2007.1002, ISSN 1536-1233, pages 1185 - 1198, XP011191150 [A] 1,12,21,26 * page 1189 - page 1191; figures 8-10 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TMC.2007.1002
by applicantUS20110228909