Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2564153

EP2564153 - OPTICAL DEVICE AND METHOD FOR INSPECTING STRUCTURED OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.11.2015
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
25.10.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fogale Nanotech
125 rue de l'Hostellerie
Bâtiment A - Ville Active
30900 Nîmes / FR
[2019/04]
Former [2019/03]For all designated states
Unity-SC
611 Avenue Aristide Bergès
38330 Montbonnot-Saint-Martin / FR
Former [2013/10]For all designated states
Nanotec Solution
237, chemin Puech du Teil
30900 Nîmes / FR
Inventor(s)01 / FRESQUET, Gilles
5324 Rue des Ormeaux
F-30190 Garrigues Sainte Eulalie / FR
 [2013/10]
Representative(s)IPAZ
Parc Les Algorithmes, Bâtiment Platon
CS 70003 Saint-Aubin
91192 Gif-sur-Yvette Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2013/31]Pontet Allano & Associes
Parc Orsay Université
25, rue Jean-Rostand
91893 Orsay Cedex / FR
Former [2013/10]Pontet, Bernard , et al
Pontet Allano & Associés Selarl
25, rue Jean Rostand
Parc Orsay Université
91893 Orsay Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date11721347.019.04.2011
WO2011FR50900
Priority number, dateFR2010005317326.04.2010         Original published format: FR 1053173
[2013/10]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011135231
Date:03.11.2011
Language:FR
[2011/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2564153
Date:06.03.2013
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2011
[2013/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.11.2011
ClassificationInternational:G01B9/02, G02B21/00
[2013/10]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/10]
Extension statesBA02.11.2012
ME02.11.2012
TitleGerman:OPTISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR INSPEKTION VON STRUKTURIERTEN OBJEKTEN[2013/10]
English:OPTICAL DEVICE AND METHOD FOR INSPECTING STRUCTURED OBJECTS[2013/10]
French:DISPOSITIF OPTIQUE ET PROCEDE D'INSPECTION D'OBJETS STRUCTURES[2013/10]
Entry into regional phase02.11.2012National basic fee paid 
02.11.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
02.11.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.11.2012Examination requested  [2013/10]
04.06.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.02.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.05.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.11.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.03.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.06.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.11.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.07.2016Date of oral proceedings
29.07.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
03.08.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination27.09.2016Appeal received No.  T2622/16
21.11.2016Statement of grounds filed
20.05.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.02.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
23.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
27.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
24.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
24.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
26.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
29.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2008062429  (LIANG RONGGUANG [US], et al) [X] 1-10,13-19 * paragraphs [0100] , [ 125] - [0134] * * figures 13A-13E * [Y] 11,12;
 [X]JPH06154228  (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] , [0020] , [0022] *;
 [Y]US7034271  (SINCLAIR MICHAEL B [US], et al) [Y] 11,12 * abstract * * figure 3A *;
 [AD]FR2718231  (SOFIE [FR]) [AD] 1-19 * the whole document *
by applicantFR2892188
 FR2718231