EP2564361 - FIBER INLAY FORMED IN A SINGLE LAYER AND EQUIPPED WITH A CONTACTLESS ELECTRONIC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/10] | FIBROUS INSERT CONSISTING OF A SINGLE LAYER AND PROVIDED WITH AN ELECTRONIC DEVICE HAVING CONTACTLESS COMMUNICATION | ||
[2017/17] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.08.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HID Global CID SAS 31-33 rue de Verdun 92150 Suresnes / FR | [2019/48] |
Former [2017/38] | For all designated states ARJO SYSTEMS 32 Avenue Pierre Grenier 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2017/12] | For all designated states ARJO SYSTEMS 32 Avenue Pierre Grenier 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2013/10] | For all designated states ARJOWIGGINS SECURITY 32 avenue Pierre Grenier 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LE LOARER, Thibaut 1426 route du Bas F-38260 Pommier de Beaurepaire / FR | 02 /
MARLIN, Pascal 86 avenue de Rebais F-77120 Coulommiers / FR | [2013/10] | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/38] | Andrieux, Benoît LLR 11 Boulevard de Sébastopol 75001 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2013/10] | Sartorius, Jérome Cabinet Nony 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 11722902.1 | 21.04.2011 | [2017/38] | WO2011IB51752 | Priority number, date | FR20100001815 | 28.04.2010 Original published format: FR 1001815 | [2013/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011135497 | Date: | 03.11.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2564361 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2564361 | Date: | 20.09.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/077, B31F1/07 | [2013/10] | CPC: |
G06K19/025 (EP,US);
B42D15/00 (US);
G06K19/07749 (EP,US);
H05K13/00 (US);
H05K13/046 (US);
Y10T29/49002 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FASERARTIG INLET GEBILDET IN EINE EINZIGE SCHICHT UND AUSGESTATTET MIT EINEM KONTAKTLOSEN ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2017/17] | English: | FIBER INLAY FORMED IN A SINGLE LAYER AND EQUIPPED WITH A CONTACTLESS ELECTRONIC | [2017/17] | French: | INSERT FIBREUX CONSTITUÉ EN UNE SEULE COUCHE ET ÉQUIPÉ D'UN DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE À COMMUNICATION SANS CONTACT | [2017/19] |
Former [2013/10] | FASEREINSATZ AUS EINER EINZIGEN SCHICHT MIT EINER ELEKTRONISCHEN VORRICHTUNG MIT KONTAKTLOSER KOMMUNIKATION | ||
Former [2013/10] | FIBROUS INSERT CONSISTING OF A SINGLE LAYER AND PROVIDED WITH AN ELECTRONIC DEVICE HAVING CONTACTLESS COMMUNICATION | ||
Former [2013/10] | INSERT FIBREUX CONSTITUÉ EN UNE SEULE COUCHE ET ÉQUIPÉ D'UN DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE A COMMUNICATION SANS CONTACT | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/10] | 29.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.04.2017 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.06.2018
ADMISSIBLE Bundesdruckerei GmbH Kommandantenstrasse 18 10969 Berlin / DE Opponent's representative Patentanwälte Bressel und Partner mbB Potsdamer Platz 10 10785 Berlin / DE | [2018/30] | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 04.07.2018 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 02.11.2018 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.11.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.02.2020 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 14.02.2020 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Appeal following opposition | 14.04.2020 | Appeal received No. T0979/20 | 12.06.2020 | Statement of grounds filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.04.2011 | AL | 20.09.2017 | AT | 20.09.2017 | CY | 20.09.2017 | CZ | 20.09.2017 | DK | 20.09.2017 | EE | 20.09.2017 | ES | 20.09.2017 | FI | 20.09.2017 | HR | 20.09.2017 | IT | 20.09.2017 | LT | 20.09.2017 | LV | 20.09.2017 | MC | 20.09.2017 | MK | 20.09.2017 | MT | 20.09.2017 | NL | 20.09.2017 | PT | 20.09.2017 | RO | 20.09.2017 | RS | 20.09.2017 | SE | 20.09.2017 | SI | 20.09.2017 | SK | 20.09.2017 | SM | 20.09.2017 | TR | 20.09.2017 | BG | 20.12.2017 | NO | 20.12.2017 | GR | 21.12.2017 | IS | 20.01.2018 | LU | 21.04.2018 | BE | 30.04.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 21.04.2011 | |
AT | 20.09.2017 | ||
CY | 20.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
MK | 20.09.2017 | ||
MT | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PT | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
TR | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
LU | 21.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 21.04.2011 | |
AT | 20.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
MT | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PT | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
TR | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
LU | 21.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
MT | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
TR | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
LU | 21.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
MT | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
LU | 21.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
MT | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
LU | 21.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
MT | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MT | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 20.09.2017 | |
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/15] | FI | 20.09.2017 | |
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | FI | 20.09.2017 | |
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | FI | 20.09.2017 | |
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 20.09.2017 | |
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 20.09.2017 | |
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 20.09.2017 | |
NO | 20.12.2017 | Cited in | International search | [I]WO0145040 (GEMPLUS CARD INT [FR], et al) [I] 1-23 * the whole document * * page 2, line 22 - line 26 * * page 9, line 11 - line 14 *; | [A]WO2007046974 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US], et al) [A] 1-23* abstract *; | [A]US2008073800 (FINN DAVID [IE]) [A] 1-23 * paragraph [0209] - paragraph [0213]; figure 6b *; | [I]US2009315320 (FINN DAVID [IE]) [I] 1-23 * paragraphs [0281] , [0293]; figure 2j * | by applicant | WO2005073907 | WO2009046791 | Opposition | DE3528686 | EP0128822 | DE4403513 | EP0789323 | DE10325604 | EP1559832 | WO2007147727 | US2009091424 | DE102007058547 | FR2929962 | US2009315320 | US2011056638 | - Anonymous, "Synthec - Das Banknotenpapier für lange Umlaufzeiten", (20050000), page 6pp, URL: https://www.louisenthal.com/wp-content/uploads/2015/04/Synthec_de.pdf, XP055510892 | - Anonymous, "Faser / Wikipedia", (20100330), pages 1 - 9, URL: https://de.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Faser&oldid=72529736, XP055510898 | - Anonymous, "MF1MOB6S50 Contactless chip card module specification / Product data sheet addendum", NXP, (20091214), page 7pp, XP055510900 | - Anonyous, "AN10841 MIFARE Plus Card Coil Design / NXP Application note", (20170404), page 12pp, XP055510902 | - Anonymous, "Smart eID optimized for single-application contactless smart cards", NXP Smart elD: fixed functionality secure IC solution, (20090900), page 2pp, XP055510906 | - Anonymous, "MF1S5009 Mainstream contactless smart card IC for fast and easy solution development / NXP Product data sheet", (20100727), page 32pp, XP055510910 |