blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2552261

EP2552261 - PLUG SPACE PLUG FILTER WITH FLAVOR BEAD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.07.2020
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.05.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.01.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.2022Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 10.08.2022  [2022/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Philip Morris Products S.A.
Quai Jeanrenaud 3
2000 Neuchâtel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2013/06]For all designated states
Philip Morris Products S.A.
Quai Jeanrenaud 3
2000 Neuchâtel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / ALLEN, Jeffrey, Lynn
18010 West County Line Road
Midlothian, VA 23112 / US
02 / WILLIAMS, Dwight, D.
1508 Swiftwood Drive
Powhatan, VA 23139 / US
03 / LONGEST, Cary
1506 Ableway Drive
Midlothian, VA 23114 / US
04 / LEE, Robert, E.
11802 Regent Prince Place
Richmond, VA 23238 / US
 [2013/06]
Representative(s)Millburn, Julie Elizabeth
Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building
10 Whitechapel High Street
London E1 8QS / GB
[2019/26]
Former [2013/06]Millburn, Julie Elizabeth
Reddie & Grose LLP
16 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date11725505.928.03.2011
[2019/26]
WO2011IB01107
Priority number, dateUS20100318248P26.03.2010         Original published format: US 318248 P
[2013/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2011117743
Date:29.09.2011
Language:EN
[2011/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2552261
Date:06.02.2013
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2013/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2552261
Date:26.06.2019
Language:EN
[2019/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.09.2011
ClassificationIPC:A24D3/06, A24D3/04
[2013/06]
CPC:
A24D3/04 (EP,US); A24D3/061 (EP,KR,US); A24D1/002 (KR);
A24D3/0216 (KR)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/06]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:FILTER MIT KAMMER MIT AROMAKÜGELCHEN[2013/06]
English:PLUG SPACE PLUG FILTER WITH FLAVOR BEAD[2013/06]
French:FILTRE À CHAMBRE AVEC PERLE DE PARFUM[2013/06]
Entry into regional phase22.10.2012National basic fee paid 
22.10.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
22.10.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.10.2012Examination requested  [2013/06]
12.06.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.01.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.05.2019Fee for grant paid
16.05.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.05.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP19176026.3  / EP3552502
EP21196612.2  / EP3942947
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.04.2018
Opposition(s)03.06.2020No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
21.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
24.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
25.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
24.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
23.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
26.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL26.06.2019
CY26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
MC26.06.2019
MK26.06.2019
MT26.06.2019
SM26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
IS26.10.2019
AT28.03.2020
LT28.03.2020
LU28.03.2020
LV28.03.2020
RS28.03.2020
DK31.03.2020
EE31.03.2020
NO31.03.2020
[2022/32]
Former [2022/27]AL26.06.2019
CY26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
MC26.06.2019
MT26.06.2019
SM26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
IS26.10.2019
AT28.03.2020
LT28.03.2020
LU28.03.2020
LV28.03.2020
RS28.03.2020
DK31.03.2020
EE31.03.2020
NO31.03.2020
Former [2021/37]AL26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
MC26.06.2019
SM26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
IS26.10.2019
AT28.03.2020
LT28.03.2020
LU28.03.2020
LV28.03.2020
RS28.03.2020
DK31.03.2020
EE31.03.2020
NO31.03.2020
Former [2021/20]AL26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
MC26.06.2019
SM26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
IS26.10.2019
LT28.03.2020
LU28.03.2020
LV28.03.2020
RS28.03.2020
DK31.03.2020
EE31.03.2020
NO31.03.2020
Former [2021/12]AL26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
MC26.06.2019
SM26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
IS26.10.2019
LT28.03.2020
LU28.03.2020
LV28.03.2020
RS28.03.2020
EE31.03.2020
NO31.03.2020
Former [2021/07]AL26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
MC26.06.2019
SM26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
IS26.10.2019
LT28.03.2020
LU28.03.2020
LV28.03.2020
NO31.03.2020
Former [2021/04]AL26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
MC26.06.2019
SM26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
IS26.10.2019
LU28.03.2020
LV28.03.2020
Former [2020/51]AL26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
MC26.06.2019
SM26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
IS26.10.2019
LV28.03.2020
Former [2020/49]AL26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
MC26.06.2019
SM26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
IS26.10.2019
Former [2020/36]AL26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
SM26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
IS26.10.2019
Former [2020/24]AL26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
SM26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
IS24.02.2020
Former [2020/14]AL26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
SM26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
IS26.10.2019
Former [2020/01]AL26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
Former [2019/50]AL26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
Former [2019/48]FI26.06.2019
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP0232166  (REYNOLDS TOBACCO CO R [US]) [Y] 1,4-14* column 3, line 26 - column 9, line 5 *;
 [Y]US2007000505  (ZHUANG SHUZHONG [US], et al) [Y] 1,4-14 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0081] *;
 [Y]US2007012327  (KARLES GEORGIOS D [US], et al) [Y] 1,4-14 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0104] *
by applicantUS5263999
 US5997691
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.