Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2575433

EP2575433 - ENERGY SAVING BREWING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.08.2016
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 21.11.2018  [2018/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Carlsberg Breweries A/S
Ny Carlsberg Vej 100
1799 Copenhagen V / DK
For all designated states
Heineken Supply Chain B.V.
2de Weteringplantsoen 21
1017 ZD Amsterdam / NL
[2013/15]
Inventor(s)01 / KNUDSEN, Søren
Bakkesvinget 18
DK-2760 Måløv / DK
02 / RIIS, Preben
Birkegården 65
DK-3500 Værløse / DK
03 / SKADHAUGE, Birgitte
Lindehøjvej 31 B
DK-3460 Birkerød / DK
04 / BECH, Lene, Mølskov
Liljehaven 83
DK-2765 Smørum / DK
05 / OLSEN, Ole
Holmbladsgade 102, 2.tv.
DK-2300 Copenhagen S / DK
 [2013/15]
Representative(s)Høiberg P/S
Adelgade 12
1304 Copenhagen K / DK
[N/P]
Former [2016/36]Høiberg A/S
Adelgade 12
1304 Copenhagen K / DK
Former [2013/15]Høiberg A/S
St. Kongensgade 59 A
1264 Copenhagen K / DK
Application number, filing date11729247.431.05.2011
[2016/36]
WO2011DK50186
Priority number, dateDK2010007024303.06.2010         Original published format: DK 201070243
[2013/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2011150933
Date:08.12.2011
Language:EN
[2011/49]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2575433
Date:10.04.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2011
[2013/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2575433
Date:07.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.06.2012
ClassificationInternational:A23L7/25, A01H5/10, C12C1/18, C12C12/00, A23L2/38, A23L7/20, C12N9/02, C12N15/82, C12N9/10
[2016/36]
Former International [2015/52]A23L1/186, A01H5/10, C12C1/18, C12C12/00, A23L2/38, A23L1/185, C12N9/02, C12N15/82, C12N9/10
Former International [2013/15]A01H5/10, C12C1/18, C12C7/00, C12C12/00, C12N9/10, C12N15/82
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/15]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ENERGIE SPARENDES BRAU VERFAHREN[2015/52]
English:ENERGY SAVING BREWING METHOD[2013/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE BRASSAGE ÉCONOMIQUE EN ÉNERGIE[2013/15]
Former [2013/15]BRAUVERFAHREN MIT NIEDRIGEM ENERGIEVERBRAUCH
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase03.01.2013National basic fee paid 
03.01.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
03.01.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.07.2012Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.01.2013Examination requested  [2013/15]
30.07.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.11.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.04.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.01.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.05.2016Fee for grant paid
10.05.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.05.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.11.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  01.06.2017   
Privatbrauerei Hirt Vertrieb GmbH / Braucommune Freistadt/ Privatbrauerei Zwettler karl Schwarz GmbH et al
Hirt 1
9322 Micheldorf / AT
Opponent's representative
Wagner, Leopold
Dr. Leopold Wagner
Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH.
Alter Platz 34/I
9020 Klagenfurt / AT
 02  06.06.2017   
Arbeitsgemeinsschaft bäuerliche Landwirtschaft (AbL)/Arbeitsgem. der Umweltbe. der Gliedkirchen der Evangelischen Kirche in DE
Heiligengeistr. 28
21335 Lüneburg / DE
 [2017/29]
23.11.2017Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
03.04.2018Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
03.08.2018Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
14.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
04.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
19.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL07.09.2016
AT07.09.2016
BE07.09.2016
CZ07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
IT07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
MC07.09.2016
PL07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SI07.09.2016
SM07.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
LU31.05.2017
MT31.05.2017
[2018/47]
Former [2018/43]AT07.09.2016
BE07.09.2016
CZ07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
IT07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
MC07.09.2016
PL07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SI07.09.2016
SM07.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
LU31.05.2017
MT31.05.2017
Former [2018/06]AT07.09.2016
BE07.09.2016
CZ07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
IT07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
MC07.09.2016
PL07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SI07.09.2016
SM07.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
LU31.05.2017
Former [2017/37]AT07.09.2016
BE07.09.2016
CZ07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
IT07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
PL07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SI07.09.2016
SM07.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
LU31.05.2017
Former [2017/36]AT07.09.2016
BE07.09.2016
CZ07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
IT07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
PL07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SM07.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
LU31.05.2017
Former [2017/32]AT07.09.2016
BE07.09.2016
CZ07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
IT07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
PL07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SM07.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
Former [2017/21]FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
NO07.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
NO07.12.2016
Former [2017/09]FI07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
NO07.12.2016
Former [2017/07]LT07.09.2016
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2004011591  (NOVOZYMES AS [DK], et al) [X] 50-57 * page 4, lines 6-15 * * page 5, lines 21-32 * * page 9, line 34 - page 10, line 8; examples 3-4; claims 16-17; tables 4,7 *;
 [X]US2009041890  (FESTERSEN RIKKE MONICA [DK], et al) [X] 50-57 * paragraphs [0005] , [0 15] *;
 [AD]US2005204437  (BREDDAM KLAUS [DK], et al) [AD] 1-57 * paragraph [0190]; claim - *;
 [YDP]WO2010063288  (CARLSBERG BREWERIES AS [DK], et al) [YDP] 1-57 * page 50, line 5 - line 23; claims 36, 49, 53-56 * * page 37, paragraph l *;
 [YDP]WO2010075860  (CARLSBERG BREWERIES AS [DK], et al) [YDP] 1-57 * example -; claim - *;
 [A]  - ROUCK G DE ET AL, "Sufficient formation and removal of dimethyl sulfide (DMS) without classic wort boiling", BREWING SCIENCE,, (20010101), vol. 63, ISSN 1613-2041, pages 31 - 40, XP009147905 [A] 1-57 * the whole document *
 [A]  - HIROTA N ET AL, "Brewing performance of malted lipoxygenase-1 null barley and effect on the flavor stability of beer", CEREAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF CEREAL CHEMISTS. MINNEAPOLIS, US, (20060501), vol. 83, no. 3, doi:DOI:10.1094/CC-83-0250, ISSN 0009-0352, pages 250 - 254, XP009124704 [A] 1-57 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1094/CC-83-0250
 [T]  - HOTZEL H ET AL, "Recovery and characterization of residual DNA from beer as a prerequisite for the detection of genetically modified ingredients", EUROPEAN FOOD RESEARCH AND TECHNOLOGY, SPRINGER VERLAG, HEIDELBERG, DE, (19990101), vol. 209, no. 3-4, doi:10.1007/S002170050478, ISSN 1438-2377, pages 192 - 196, XP002635202 [T] 50-57 * page 194 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s002170050478
by applicantWO02053721
 WO2005087934
 EP1609866
 AU3857893
 US2006057684
 US5242694
 US4683195
 US4800159
 US7420105
 WO2010075860
 WO2010063288
    - KUNZE, Technology Brewing and Malting, VLB BERLIN, (2004), pages 158 - 162,
    - Modern brewhouse technology, BRAUWELT INTERNATIONAL, (2004), pages 410 - 412,
    - Technology Brewing and Malting, VLB, (2004),
    - KUNZE, Technology Brewing and Malting, VLB, (2004), page 162,
    - KUNZE, Technology Brewing and Malting, VLB, (2004), page 160,
    - YANG, B. ET AL., "Factors involved in the formation of two precursors of dimethylsulphide during malting", J. AM. SOC. BREW. CHEM., (1998), vol. 56, pages 85 - 92, XP009143636
    - Approved methods of the American Association of Cereal Chemists., AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF CEREAL CHEMISTS, (1995),
    - Methods of analysis of the American Society of Brewing Chemists., AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BREWING CHEMISTS, (1992),
    - BAUR, C., GROSCH. W., "Investigation about the taste of di-, tri- and tetrahydroxy fatty acids.", Z. LEBENSM. UNTERS. FORSCH., (1977), vol. 165, pages 82 - 84,
    - BAUR, C. ET AL., "Enzymatic oxidation of linoleic acid: Formation of bittertasting fatty acids.", Z. LEBENSM. UNTERS. FORSCH., (1977), vol. 164, pages 171 - 176,
    - B. BONACCHELLI, C. DE BRACKELEIRE, F. HARMEGNIES, "Wort boiling - the Meura's concept with wortstripping", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 31 ST INTERNATIONAL CONGRESS OF THE EUROPEAN BREWERY CONVENTION VENICE, ITALY, (20070506),
    - BRIGGS, D.E. ET AL., Malting and brewing science. Volume I Malt and sweet wort., CHAPMAN AND HALL, (1981),
    - DURAI, S. ET AL., "Zinc finger nucleases: custom-designed molecular scissors for genome engineering of plant and mammalian cells.", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2005), vol. 33, doi:doi:10.1093/NAR/GKI912, pages 5978 - 5990, XP002511419

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/NAR/GKI912
    - "European Brewery Convention.", ANALYTICA - EBC., (1998),
    - GROENQVIST, A. ET AL., "Carbonyl compounds during beer production in beer.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 24TH EBC CONGRESS, (1993), pages 421 - 428,
    - HAMBERG, M., "Trihydroxyoctadecenoic acids in beer: Qualitative and quantitative analysis.", J. AGRIC. FOOD CHEM., (1991), vol. 39, pages 1568 - 1572,
    - HANSEN, M. ET AL., "Antisense-mediated suppression of C-hordein biosynthesis in the barley grain results in correlated changes in the transcriptome, protein profile, and amino acid composition.", J. EXP. BOT., (2007), vol. 58, pages 3987 - 3995,
    - HOUGH, J.S. ET AL., Malting and brewing science. Volume II Hopped wort and beer., CHAPMAN AND HALL, (1982),
    - LIDA, S., TERADA, R., "Modification of endogenous natural genes by gene targeting in rice and other higher plants", PLANT MOL. BIOL., (2005), vol. 59, doi:doi:10.1007/s11103-005-2162-x, pages 205 - 219, XP019262756

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11103-005-2162-x
    - "Institute of Brewing", INSTITUTE OF BREWING. METHODS OF ANALYSIS., (1997),
    - JAMIESON, A.M., VAN GHELUWE, J.E.A., "Identification of a compound responsible for cardboard flavor in beer.", PROC. AM. SOC. BREW. CHEM., (1970), vol. 29, pages 192 - 197,
    - KLEINHOFS, A. ET AL., "Induction and selection of specific gene mutations in Hordeum and Pisum.", MUT. RES., (1978), vol. 51, doi:doi:10.1016/0027-5107(78)90005-2, pages 29 - 35, XP023441314

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0027-5107(78)90005-2
    - KUMAR, S. ET AL., "Gene targeting in plants: fingers on the move.", TRENDS PLANT SCI., (2006), vol. 11, doi:doi:10.1016/j.tplants.2006.02.002, pages 159 - 161, XP028013270

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tplants.2006.02.002
    - KURODA, H. ET AL., "Characterization of factors involved in the production of 2(E)-nonenal during mashing.", BIOSCI. BIOTECHNOL. BIOCHEM., (2003), vol. 67, pages 691 - 697,
    - KURODA, H. ET AL., "Characterization of 9-fatty acid hydroperoxide lyase-like activity in germinating barley seeds that transforms 9(S)-hydroperoxy-10(E).12(Z)-octadecadienoic acid into 2(E)-nonenal.", BIOSCI. BIOTECHNOL. BIOCHEM., (2005), vol. 69, pages 1661 - 1668,
    - LERMUSIEAU, G. ET AL., "Nonoxidative mechanism for development of trans-2-nonenal in beer.", J. AM. SOC. BREW. CHEM., (1999), vol. 57, pages 29 - 33,
    - LIEGEOIS, C. ET AL., "Release of deuterated (E)-2-nonenal during beer aging from labeled precursors synthesized before boiling.", J. AGRIC. FOOD CHEM., (2002), vol. 50, pages 7634 - 7638,
    - MAQUAT, L.E., CARMICHAEL, G.G., "Quality control of mRNA function.", CELL, (2001), vol. 104, pages 173 - 176,
    - MEILGAARD, M.C., "Flavor chemistry of beer: Part 11: Flavor and threshold of 239 aroma volatiles.", TECH. Q. MBAA, (1975), vol. 12, pages 151 - 167,
    - MENDELL, J.T., DIETZ, H.C., "When the message goes awry: Disease-producing mutations that influence mRNA content and performance.", CELL, (2002), vol. 107, pages 411 - 414,
    - "Resources for Breeding of Wild Barley", NEVO, E., Barley: Genetics. Biochemistry. Molecular Biology and Biotechnology., C.A.B. INTERNATIONAL, (1992), pages 3 - 18,
    - NYBORG, M. ET AL., "Investigations of the protective mechanism of sulfite against beer staling and formation of adducts with trans-2-nonenal.", J. AM. SOC. BREW. CHEM., (1999), vol. 57, pages 24 - 28, XP002944190
    - RASMUSSEN, S.K., HATZACK, F., "Identification of two low-phytate barley (Hordeum vulgare L.) grain mutants by TLC and genetic analysis.", HEREDITAS, (1998), vol. 129, pages 107 - 112,
    - ROBBINS, M.P. ET AL., "Gene manipulation of condensed tannins in higher plants.", PLANT PHYSIOL., (1998), vol. 116, pages 1133 - 1144,
    - SAMBROOK, J., RUSSELL. D.W., Molecular Cloning. A Laboratory Manual., COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, (2001),
    - SCHMITT, N.F., VAN MECHELEN. J.R., "Expression of lipoxygenase isoenzymes in developing barley grains.", PLANT SCI., (1997), vol. 128, pages 141 - 150,
    - STAHL, Y. ET AL., "Antisense downregulation of the barley limit dextrinase inhibitor modulates starch granule sizes distribution. starch composition and amylopectin structure", PLANT J., (2004), vol. 39, doi:doi:10.1111/j.1365-313X.2004.02159.x, pages 599 - 611, XP002297308

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-313X.2004.02159.x
    - TZFIRA, T., WHITE. C., "Towards targeted mutagenesis and gene replacement in plants.", TRENDS BIOTECHNOL., (2005), vol. 23, doi:doi:10.1016/j.tibtech.2005.10.002, pages 567 - 569, XP025290730

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tibtech.2005.10.002
    - "Diversity in barley", VON BOTHMER, R. ET AL., Diversity in Barley, (2003), pages 129 - 136,
    - WACKERBAUER, K., MEYNA, S., "Freie und triglyceride-gebundene Hydroxyfettsauren in Gerste und Malz", MONATSSCHRIFTFUR BRAUWISSENSCHAFT, (2002), pages 52 - 57,
    - WU, J. ET AL., "Nonsense-mediated mRNA decay (NMD) silences the accumulation of aberrant trypsin proteinase inhibitor mRNA in Nicotiana attenuata.", PLANT J., (2007), vol. 51, pages 693 - 706,
 WO2009DK50355
 WO2009DK50315
OppositionEP2373154
 EP2384110
    - Europäischen Parlaments Und Des Rates, "Mitteilung der Kommission iiber bestimmte Artikel der Richtlinie 98/44/EG des Europaischen Parlaments und des Rates iiber den rechtlichen Schutz biotechnologischer Erfindungen (2016/C 411/03)", Amtsblatt der Europäischen Union, (20161108), pages C411/3 - C411/14, XP055405146