Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2729821

EP2729821 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DETECTING AN ARC FAULT IN A PHOTOVOLTAIC POWER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.10.2018
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.11.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.07.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.04.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CH, LI
published on 22.05.2019  [2019/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SMA Solar Technology AG
Sonnenallee 1
34266 Niestetal / DE
[2017/50]
Former [2014/20]For all designated states
SMA Solar Technology AG
Sonnenallee 1
34266 Niestetal / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BEHRENDS, Holger
Denkmalstr. 1
26817 Rhauderfehn / DE
02 / BIENIEK, Sebastian
Sensensteiner Str. 27
34266 Niestetal / DE
03 / BÜLO, Thorsten
Uhlandstr. 18
34119 Kassel / DE
04 / HOPF, Markus
Gangloffsömmerner Ring 18
34314 Espenau / DE
05 / BETTENWORT, Gerd
Elfbuchenstr. 2
34119 Kassel / DE
06 / KRATOCHVIL, Marcel
Friedrich-Ebert-Str. 88
34119 Kassel / DE
07 / MERZ, Christopher
In den Gärten 16
56412 Daubach / DE
08 / PRIOR, Oliver
Kasseler Str. 90a
34431 Marsberg / DE
 [2014/20]
Representative(s)Lahnor, Peter
SMA Solar Technology AG
Corporate Intellectual Property Management
Sonnenallee 1
34266 Niestetal / DE
[2017/50]
Former [2014/20]Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date11729418.104.07.2011
[2017/50]
WO2011EP61251
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013004295
Date:10.01.2013
Language:EN
[2013/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2729821
Date:14.05.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2013
[2014/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2729821
Date:13.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.01.2013
ClassificationInternational:H02H1/00, H02H7/20, G01R31/02
[2017/30]
Former International [2014/20]G01R31/02, H02H1/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/20]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ERKENNUNG EINES LICHTBOGENS IN EINEM FOTOVOLTAIKSTROMSYSTEM[2014/20]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DETECTING AN ARC FAULT IN A PHOTOVOLTAIC POWER SYSTEM[2014/20]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE DÉTECTION DE DÉFAUT D'ARC DANS UN SYSTÈME D'ALIMENTATION PHOTOVOLTAÏQUE[2014/20]
Entry into regional phase29.01.2014National basic fee paid 
29.01.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
29.01.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.01.2014Examination requested  [2014/20]
28.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.06.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.01.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
13.03.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.07.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.11.2017Fee for grant paid
03.11.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.11.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.03.2016
Opposition(s)14.09.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
30.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
30.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
28.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
27.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT13.12.2017
CY13.12.2017
CZ13.12.2017
DK13.12.2017
EE13.12.2017
ES13.12.2017
FI13.12.2017
HR13.12.2017
LT13.12.2017
LV13.12.2017
MC13.12.2017
PL13.12.2017
RO13.12.2017
RS13.12.2017
SE13.12.2017
SI13.12.2017
SK13.12.2017
SM13.12.2017
BG13.03.2018
NO13.03.2018
GR14.03.2018
IS13.04.2018
IE04.07.2018
LU04.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
[2019/21]
Former [2019/19]AT13.12.2017
CY13.12.2017
CZ13.12.2017
DK13.12.2017
EE13.12.2017
ES13.12.2017
FI13.12.2017
HR13.12.2017
LT13.12.2017
LV13.12.2017
MC13.12.2017
PL13.12.2017
RO13.12.2017
RS13.12.2017
SE13.12.2017
SI13.12.2017
SK13.12.2017
SM13.12.2017
BG13.03.2018
NO13.03.2018
GR14.03.2018
IS13.04.2018
IE04.07.2018
LU04.07.2018
Former [2019/17]AT13.12.2017
CY13.12.2017
CZ13.12.2017
DK13.12.2017
EE13.12.2017
ES13.12.2017
FI13.12.2017
HR13.12.2017
LT13.12.2017
LV13.12.2017
MC13.12.2017
PL13.12.2017
RO13.12.2017
RS13.12.2017
SE13.12.2017
SI13.12.2017
SK13.12.2017
SM13.12.2017
BG13.03.2018
NO13.03.2018
GR14.03.2018
IS13.04.2018
LU04.07.2018
Former [2019/15]AT13.12.2017
CY13.12.2017
CZ13.12.2017
DK13.12.2017
EE13.12.2017
ES13.12.2017
FI13.12.2017
HR13.12.2017
LT13.12.2017
LV13.12.2017
MC13.12.2017
PL13.12.2017
RO13.12.2017
RS13.12.2017
SE13.12.2017
SI13.12.2017
SK13.12.2017
SM13.12.2017
BG13.03.2018
NO13.03.2018
GR14.03.2018
IS13.04.2018
Former [2019/13]AT13.12.2017
CY13.12.2017
CZ13.12.2017
DK13.12.2017
EE13.12.2017
ES13.12.2017
FI13.12.2017
HR13.12.2017
LT13.12.2017
LV13.12.2017
PL13.12.2017
RO13.12.2017
RS13.12.2017
SE13.12.2017
SI13.12.2017
SK13.12.2017
SM13.12.2017
BG13.03.2018
NO13.03.2018
GR14.03.2018
IS13.04.2018
Former [2018/51]AT13.12.2017
CY13.12.2017
CZ13.12.2017
DK13.12.2017
EE13.12.2017
ES13.12.2017
FI13.12.2017
HR13.12.2017
LT13.12.2017
LV13.12.2017
PL13.12.2017
RO13.12.2017
RS13.12.2017
SE13.12.2017
SK13.12.2017
SM13.12.2017
BG13.03.2018
NO13.03.2018
GR14.03.2018
IS13.04.2018
Former [2018/40]AT13.12.2017
CY13.12.2017
CZ13.12.2017
EE13.12.2017
ES13.12.2017
FI13.12.2017
HR13.12.2017
LT13.12.2017
LV13.12.2017
PL13.12.2017
RO13.12.2017
RS13.12.2017
SE13.12.2017
SK13.12.2017
SM13.12.2017
BG13.03.2018
NO13.03.2018
GR14.03.2018
IS13.04.2018
Former [2018/38]AT13.12.2017
CY13.12.2017
CZ13.12.2017
EE13.12.2017
ES13.12.2017
FI13.12.2017
HR13.12.2017
LT13.12.2017
LV13.12.2017
PL13.12.2017
RS13.12.2017
SE13.12.2017
SK13.12.2017
SM13.12.2017
BG13.03.2018
NO13.03.2018
GR14.03.2018
IS13.04.2018
Former [2018/37]CY13.12.2017
CZ13.12.2017
EE13.12.2017
ES13.12.2017
FI13.12.2017
HR13.12.2017
LT13.12.2017
LV13.12.2017
PL13.12.2017
RS13.12.2017
SE13.12.2017
SK13.12.2017
SM13.12.2017
BG13.03.2018
NO13.03.2018
GR14.03.2018
Former [2018/24]FI13.12.2017
HR13.12.2017
LT13.12.2017
LV13.12.2017
RS13.12.2017
SE13.12.2017
BG13.03.2018
NO13.03.2018
GR14.03.2018
Former [2018/23]FI13.12.2017
HR13.12.2017
LT13.12.2017
RS13.12.2017
SE13.12.2017
NO13.03.2018
GR14.03.2018
Former [2018/22]FI13.12.2017
LT13.12.2017
NO13.03.2018
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2011019444  (DARGATZ MARV [US] ET AL) [X] 1-3,6-8 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0047] * [I] 4,5,9;
 [A]US2011141644  (HASTINGS JEROME K [US] ET AL) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0004] , [0 16] , [0 17] * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0078] *
by applicantWO9525374