Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2576222 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2576222



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 99
28.04.2016 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
15.04.2016 Closing of application Search / examination 1
08.01.2016 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
03.07.2015 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
16.10.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 5
20.06.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
03.06.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
13.03.2013 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
13.02.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.02.2013 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
13.02.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
13.02.2013 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
13.02.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
18.01.2013 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
16.01.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
02.01.2013 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
27.12.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
27.12.2012 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
27.12.2012 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
27.11.2012 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
12.10.2012 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
28.12.2011 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 17
08.12.2011 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
08.12.2011 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 13
19.08.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
19.08.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
19.08.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
10.06.2011 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
10.06.2011 Claims International Searching Authority 3
10.06.2011 Description International Searching Authority 8
10.06.2011 Drawings International Searching Authority 1