Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2576222


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
22.04.2016 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  25.05.2016  [2016/21]
07.01.2016 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
04.07.2015 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
20.06.2014 Change - representative published on  23.07.2014  [2014/30]
11.03.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.08.2013 Change - extension states published on  04.09.2013  [2013/36]
07.06.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.03.2013 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.04.2013  [2013/15]
08.03.2013 Request for examination filed published on  10.04.2013  [2013/15]
15.02.2013 Amendment by applicant
29.01.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
11.01.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
08.01.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
05.04.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
20.12.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
09.12.2011 PCT data prior to European publication